Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-00121
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2021
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:20-cv-02683
Last checked: Monday Jul 19, 2021 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
CASIANO ALCARAZ, JR.
Represented By
VINCE C REUTER
Eckland & Blando - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
JEFF H ECKLAND
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
JARED M REAMS
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/09 5:20 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CASIANO ALCARAZ, JR. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/09 5:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of CASIANO ALCARAZ, JR (REUTER, VINCE)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/09 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of CASIANO ALCARAZ, JR (REAMS, JARED)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/09 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of CASIANO ALCARAZ, JR (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
12 12 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 01/20 3:38 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 2/9/2021 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
11 11 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 01/20 3:15 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-02683. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
10 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-90) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
9 9 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Holding LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.]
Related: [-]
8 8 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Intermediate LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.]
Related: [-]
6 6 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE by Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC, Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal, CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-2683 JRT/KMM. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8351135) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 1/20/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet