New York Southern District Court
Judge:Colleen Mcmahon
Case #: 1:21-cv-00533
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 21, 2021 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
NYPD Officer Kevin Argo
Represented By
Dara Lynn Weiss
City Of New York Law Department
contact info
Defendant
NYPD Officer Talha Ahmad
Represented By
Dara Lynn Weiss
City Of New York Law Department
contact info
Defendant
NYPD Detective Edward Carrasco
Represented By
Dara Lynn Weiss
City Of New York Law Department
contact info
Defendant
City Of New York
Represented By
Elissa Beth Jacobs
New York City Law Department
contact info
Amy Robinson
New York City Law Department
contact info
Dara Lynn Weiss
City Of New York Law Department
contact info
Defendant
NYPD Officers John and Jane Does
Defendant
Mayor Bill de Blasio
Represented By
Elissa Beth Jacobs
New York City Law Department
contact info
Dara Lynn Weiss
City Of New York Law Department
contact info
Interested Party
Sergeants Benevolent Association
Plaintiff
Dara Pluchino
Represented By
Deema Azizi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Masai Lord
Lord & Schewel PLLC
contact info
David Bruce Rankin
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Elena Louisa Cohen
Cohen Green PLLC
contact info
Masai I Lord
Lord Law Group PLLC
contact info
Katherine Adams
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Remy Green
Cohen&green
contact info
Jessica Massimi
Jessica Massimi, Esq.
contact info
Gideon Orion Oliver
Gideon Orion Oliver
contact info
Wylie M. Stecklow
Wylie Stecklow PLLC
contact info
Marc Arena
Beldock Levine & Hoffman
contact info
Luna Droubi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Moore
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Regina Powers
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Oscar Rios
Represented By
Deema Azizi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Masai Lord
Lord & Schewel PLLC
contact info
David Bruce Rankin
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Elena Louisa Cohen
Cohen Green PLLC
contact info
Masai I Lord
Lord Law Group PLLC
contact info
Katherine Adams
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Remy Green
Cohen&green
contact info
Jessica Massimi
Jessica Massimi, Esq.
contact info
Gideon Orion Oliver
Gideon Orion Oliver
contact info
Wylie M. Stecklow
Wylie Stecklow PLLC
contact info
Marc Arena
Beldock Levine & Hoffman
contact info
Luna Droubi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Moore
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Regina Powers
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Barbara Ross
Represented By
Deema Azizi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Masai Lord
Lord & Schewel PLLC
contact info
David Bruce Rankin
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Elena Louisa Cohen
Cohen Green PLLC
contact info
Masai I Lord
Lord Law Group PLLC
contact info
Katherine Adams
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Remy Green
Cohen&green
contact info
Jessica Massimi
Jessica Massimi, Esq.
contact info
Gideon Orion Oliver
Gideon Orion Oliver
contact info
Wylie M. Stecklow
Wylie Stecklow PLLC
contact info
Marc Arena
Beldock Levine & Hoffman
contact info
Luna Droubi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Moore
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Regina Powers
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Salazar
Represented By
Deema Azizi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Masai Lord
Lord & Schewel PLLC
contact info
David Bruce Rankin
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Elena Louisa Cohen
Cohen Green PLLC
contact info
Masai I Lord
Lord Law Group PLLC
contact info
Katherine Adams
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Remy Green
Cohen&green
contact info
Jessica Massimi
Jessica Massimi, Esq.
contact info
Gideon Orion Oliver
Gideon Orion Oliver
contact info
Wylie M. Stecklow
Wylie Stecklow PLLC
contact info
Marc Arena
Beldock Levine & Hoffman
contact info
Luna Droubi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Moore
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Regina Powers
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Jaklevic
Represented By
Deema Azizi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Masai Lord
Lord & Schewel PLLC
contact info
David Bruce Rankin
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Elena Louisa Cohen
Cohen Green PLLC
contact info
Masai I Lord
Lord Law Group PLLC
contact info
Katherine Adams
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Remy Green
Cohen&green
contact info
Jessica Massimi
Jessica Massimi, Esq.
contact info
Gideon Orion Oliver
Gideon Orion Oliver
contact info
Wylie M. Stecklow
Wylie Stecklow PLLC
contact info
Marc Arena
Beldock Levine & Hoffman
contact info
Luna Droubi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Moore
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Regina Powers
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Adama Sow
Represented By
Deema Azizi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Masai Lord
Lord & Schewel PLLC
contact info
David Bruce Rankin
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Elena Louisa Cohen
Cohen Green PLLC
contact info
Masai I Lord
Lord Law Group PLLC
contact info
Katherine Adams
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Remy Green
Cohen&green
contact info
Jessica Massimi
Jessica Massimi, Esq.
contact info
Gideon Orion Oliver
Gideon Orion Oliver
contact info
Wylie M. Stecklow
Wylie Stecklow PLLC
contact info
Marc Arena
Beldock Levine & Hoffman
contact info
Luna Droubi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Moore
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Regina Powers
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sabrina Zurkuhlen
Represented By
Deema Azizi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Masai Lord
Lord & Schewel PLLC
contact info
David Bruce Rankin
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Elena Louisa Cohen
Cohen Green PLLC
contact info
Masai I Lord
Lord Law Group PLLC
contact info
Katherine Adams
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Remy Green
Cohen&green
contact info
Jessica Massimi
Jessica Massimi, Esq.
contact info
Gideon Orion Oliver
Gideon Orion Oliver
contact info
Wylie M. Stecklow
Wylie Stecklow PLLC
contact info
Marc Arena
Beldock Levine & Hoffman
contact info
Luna Droubi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Moore
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Regina Powers
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Savitri Durkee
Represented By
Deema Azizi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Masai Lord
Lord & Schewel PLLC
contact info
David Bruce Rankin
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Elena Louisa Cohen
Cohen Green PLLC
contact info
Masai I Lord
Lord Law Group PLLC
contact info
Katherine Adams
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Remy Green
Cohen&green
contact info
Jessica Massimi
Jessica Massimi, Esq.
contact info
Gideon Orion Oliver
Gideon Orion Oliver
contact info
Wylie M. Stecklow
Wylie Stecklow PLLC
contact info
Marc Arena
Beldock Levine & Hoffman
contact info
Luna Droubi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Moore
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Regina Powers
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alexandra de Mucha Pino
Represented By
Deema Azizi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Masai Lord
Lord & Schewel PLLC
contact info
David Bruce Rankin
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Elena Louisa Cohen
Cohen Green PLLC
contact info
Masai I Lord
Lord Law Group PLLC
contact info
Katherine Adams
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Remy Green
Cohen&green
contact info
Jessica Massimi
Jessica Massimi, Esq.
contact info
Gideon Orion Oliver
Gideon Orion Oliver
contact info
Wylie M. Stecklow
Wylie Stecklow PLLC
contact info
Marc Arena
Beldock Levine & Hoffman
contact info
Luna Droubi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Moore
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Regina Powers
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Bredder
Represented By
Deema Azizi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Rebecca Leigh Pattiz
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Masai Lord
Lord & Schewel PLLC
contact info
David Bruce Rankin
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Elena Louisa Cohen
Cohen Green PLLC
contact info
Masai I Lord
Lord Law Group PLLC
contact info
Katherine Adams
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Remy Green
Cohen&green
contact info
Jessica Massimi
Jessica Massimi, Esq.
contact info
Gideon Orion Oliver
Gideon Orion Oliver
contact info
Wylie M. Stecklow
Wylie Stecklow PLLC
contact info
Marc Arena
Beldock Levine & Hoffman
contact info
Luna Droubi
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Jonathan C Moore
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
Regina Powers
Beldock Levine & Hoffman LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Dermot Shea
Terminated: 07/09/2021
Represented By
Elissa Beth Jacobs
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Terence Monahan
Terminated: 07/09/2021
Represented By
Elissa Beth Jacobs
New York City Law Department
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
209 209 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 05/07 9:29 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Abigail B. Everdell in Support re: (187 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM, 1193 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 205 in 1:21-cv-00533-CM, 224 in 1:20-cv-10291-CM-GWG, 164 in 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 105 in 1:21-cv-02548-CM, 112 in 1:21-cv-01904-CM, 167 in 1:21-cv-06610-CM) MOTION for an Order Compelling the City to Implement Paragraph 89(h) of the Stipulated Order .. Document filed by Jason Donnelly,, Diana Zeyneb Alhindawi, Adam Gray, Amr Alfiky, Jemell D. Cole, KEVIN AGRO, TALHA AHMAD, Officer Stephanie Alba, Altamirano, Detective Robert Altieri, Natalie Baker, Sergeant William E. Balunas, Matthew Bredder, Jon Brodie, Bryan S. Rozanski, Michael Butler, EDWARD CARRASCO, Doe Caraballo, Hensley Caraballo, Officer Briana Carlo, Lieutenant Robert Cattani, Stephanie Chen, Stephanie Chen, Keith Cheng, Ethan Chiel, City of New York, Keith Clingman, Coordinated Case Plaintiffs, Taylor Corcoran, John D'Adamo, JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOE(S), Jonathan Davis, Joseph Deck, Dectectives Endowment Association of New York City, Julio Delgado, Robert Dixon, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 1-2, John Doe 1-26, John Doe 1-32, NYPD Officer John Doe White Shirt with Heomet Bearing Shield No. 15519, Gerard Dowling, Savitri Durkee, Doe Esposito, Fierro, Lars Frantzen, Jaime Fried, Lieutenant Keith Gallagher, Lieutenant Daniel Gallagher, Robert Gallitelli, Thomas Garguilo, Rafael-Lev Gilbert, Corey Gilzean, Camila Gini, Officer Leonel Giron, Alex Gutierrez, Vidal Guzman, Scott Haldeman, Thomas R Hardell, Michael Hernadez, Krystin Hernandez, Ismael Hernandez Carpio, Sergeant Christopher B. Hewitson, Lieutenant Keith Hockaday, David Holton, Christopher Husary, Doe Husband, Aaron Husbands, David Jaklevic, Andre Jeanpierre, Alfredo Jeff, Umid Karimov, Vivian Matthew King-Yarde, James Lauren, Kenneth Lehr, Kenneth C. Lehr, August Leinbach, Eduard Lucero, Andie Mali, Doe Manning, Thomas E Manning, Micaela Martinez, Debora Matias, Jalen Matney, Colleen McCormack-Maitland, John Migliaccio, Sarah Mills-Dirlam, Ryan Minett, Terence Monahan, Charlie Monlouis-Anderle, Thomas Mosher, Nicholas Mulder, Officer Adam Muniz, NYPD OFFICERS JOHN and JANE DOES # 1- 40, Ricardo Nigaglioni, Captain Gzim Palaj, Jarrett Payne, Jonathan Peck, People of The State of New York, Matthew L Perry, Julian Phillips, Fausto Pichardo, Gypsy Pichardo, Bryan Pizzimenti, Dara Pluchino, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Police Officer Wells, Officer Christopher Radzinski, Kyla Raskin, Kenneth Rice, Richardo, Oscar Rios, Damian Rivera, Doe Rivera, Officer Sean P. Robinson, Kayla Roland, Kayla Rolon, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Majer Saleh, Rex Santus, Sergeants Benevolent Association, Dermot Shea, Amali Sierra, Samira Sierra, Sergeant Daniel Slevin, Adama Sow, Matthew Tarangelo, Jakub Tarlecki, Officer Nicholas Terrett, The New York Police Department, Officer Luigi Tirro, Jacqueline Vargas, Harry Wedin, Charles Henry Wood, Cameron Yates, Roxanne Zech, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Talha Ahmad, Kevin Argo, Edward Carrasco, City Of New York, John and Jane Does, Terence Monahan, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Dermot Shea, Bill de Blasio, City of New York, John and Jane Does #1-10, Gerard Dowling, Ismael Hernandez Carpio, Kenneth Lehr, Terence Monahan, Dermot Shea, Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan, City Of New York, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, Mayor Bill de Blasio, People of The State of New York, Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea, John Doe ##1-5, New York City, Fausto Pichardo, Altamirano, Jon Brodie, N. Canale, City of New York, Sgt Miguel Cruz (Shield No 181), Bill DeBlasio, Robert Dixson, Fierro, Lars Frantzen, Patrick Gross (Shield 21147), Shield No 665 Hemme, Michael Hernandez, John and Jane Does 1-20, John and Jane Does 1-38, Luis E. Oritz (Shield No. 1133), New York Police Department, Britney Owens (Shield 26613), Pichardo, Anthony Polanco (Shield 11613), Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Erik Rodriguez (Shield No. 16334), Joseph A. Taylor, Theodore Wells, City of New York, Terence A. Monahan, Thomas Mosher, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Dermot F. Shea, Bill de Blasio, Officer Brianna Carlo, John Doe 1, NYPD Officer John Doe White Shirt with Helmet Bearing Shield No. 15519, Jane Doe 1, John Does 1-7, Lieutenant Richard Mack, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Deputy Inspector Stephen Spataro.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 1192 .(Balin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - March 10, 2025 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - March 28, 2025 Cover Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Media_Press_Powerpoint.pptx,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - NYPDU Media_Press.docx,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Final Draft Day 1 Module 8 1.22.2025 - edited.docx,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - PG 212-49.pdf,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - April 8, 2025 email correspondence,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Letter of Intent to File Motion,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - December 15, 2022 Correspondence regarding Mediation Settlement,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - December 23, 2022 Correspondence regarding Mediation Settlement
208 208 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 05/07 9:22 PM
DECLARATION of Abigail B. Everdell in Support re: (187 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM, 1193 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 205 in 1:21-cv-00533-CM, 224 in 1:20-cv-10291-CM-GWG, 164 in 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 105 in 1:21-cv-02548-CM, 112 in 1:21-cv-01904-CM, 167 in 1:21-cv-06610-CM) MOTION for an Order Compelling the City to Implement Paragraph 89(h) of the Stipulated Order .. Document filed by Amr Alfiky, Diana Zeyneb Alhindawi, Jemell D. Cole, Jason Donnelly, Adam Gray.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(Balin, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - March 10, 2025 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - March 28, 2025 Cover Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Media_Press_Powerpoint.pptx,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - NYPDU Media_Press.docx,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Final Draft Day 1 Module 8 1.22.2025 - edited.docx,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - PG 212-49.pdf,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - April 8, 2025 email correspondence,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Letter of Intent to File Motion,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - December 15, 2022 Correspondence regarding Mediation Settlement [FILED UNDER SEAL],
Att: 10 Exhibit J - December 23, 2022 Correspondence regarding Mediation Settlement [FILED UNDER SEAL]
207 207 respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 05/07 9:12 PM
***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (187 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM, 1193 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 205 in 1:21-cv-00533-CM, 224 in 1:20-cv-10291-CM-GWG, 164 in 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 105 in 1:21-cv-02548-CM, 112 in 1:21-cv-01904-CM, 167 in 1:21-cv-06610-CM) MOTION for an Order Compelling the City to Implement Paragraph 89(h) of the Stipulated Order . . Document filed by Jason Donnelly,, Diana Zeyneb Alhindawi, Adam Gray, Amr Alfiky, Jemell D. Cole, KEVIN AGRO, TALHA AHMAD, Officer Stephanie Alba, Altamirano, Detective Robert Altieri, Natalie Baker, Sergeant William E. Balunas, Matthew Bredder, Jon Brodie, Bryan S. Rozanski, Michael Butler, EDWARD CARRASCO, Doe Caraballo, Hensley Caraballo, Officer Briana Carlo, Lieutenant Robert Cattani, Stephanie Chen, Stephanie Chen, Keith Cheng, Ethan Chiel, City of New York, Keith Clingman, Coordinated Case Plaintiffs, Taylor Corcoran, John D'Adamo, JOHN/JANE 1-10 DOE(S), Jonathan Davis, Joseph Deck, Dectectives Endowment Association of New York City, Julio Delgado, Robert Dixon, Jane Doe 1, John Doe 1, Jane Doe 1-2, John Doe 1-26, John Doe 1-32, NYPD Officer John Doe White Shirt with Heomet Bearing Shield No. 15519, Gerard Dowling, Savitri Durkee, Doe Esposito, Fierro, Lars Frantzen, Jaime Fried, Lieutenant Keith Gallagher, Lieutenant Daniel Gallagher, Robert Gallitelli, Thomas Garguilo, Rafael-Lev Gilbert, Corey Gilzean, Camila Gini, Officer Leonel Giron, Alex Gutierrez, Vidal Guzman, Scott Haldeman, Thomas R Hardell, Michael Hernadez, Krystin Hernandez, Ismael Hernandez Carpio, Sergeant Christopher B. Hewitson, Lieutenant Keith Hockaday, David Holton, Christopher Husary, Doe Husband, Aaron Husbands, David Jaklevic, Andre Jeanpierre, Alfredo Jeff, Umid Karimov, Vivian Matthew King-Yarde, James Lauren, Kenneth Lehr, Kenneth C. Lehr, August Leinbach, Eduard Lucero, Andie Mali, Doe Manning, Thomas E Manning, Micaela Martinez, Debora Matias, Jalen Matney, Colleen McCormack-Maitland, John Migliaccio, Sarah Mills-Dirlam, Ryan Minett, Terence Monahan, Charlie Monlouis-Anderle, Thomas Mosher, Nicholas Mulder, Officer Adam Muniz, NYPD OFFICERS JOHN and JANE DOES # 1- 40, Ricardo Nigaglioni, Captain Gzim Palaj, Jarrett Payne, Jonathan Peck, People of The State of New York, Matthew L Perry, Julian Phillips, Fausto Pichardo, Gypsy Pichardo, Bryan Pizzimenti, Dara Pluchino, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Police Officer Wells, Officer Christopher Radzinski, Kyla Raskin, Kenneth Rice, Richardo, Oscar Rios, Damian Rivera, Doe Rivera, Officer Sean P. Robinson, Kayla Roland, Kayla Rolon, Barbara Ross, Maria Salazar, Majer Saleh, Rex Santus, Sergeants Benevolent Association, Dermot Shea, Amali Sierra, Samira Sierra, Sergeant Daniel Slevin, Adama Sow, Matthew Tarangelo, Jakub Tarlecki, Officer Nicholas Terrett, The New York Police Department, Officer Luigi Tirro, Jacqueline Vargas, Harry Wedin, Charles Henry Wood, Cameron Yates, Roxanne Zech, Sabrina Zurkuhlen, Alexandra de Mucha Pino, Talha Ahmad, Kevin Argo, Edward Carrasco, City Of New York, John and Jane Does, Terence Monahan, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Dermot Shea, Bill de Blasio, City of New York, John and Jane Does #1-10, Gerard Dowling, Ismael Hernandez Carpio, Kenneth Lehr, Terence Monahan, Dermot Shea, Chief of Department Terence A. Monahan, City Of New York, Detectives Endowment Association of New York City, Mayor Bill de Blasio, People of The State of New York, Police Commissioner Dermot F. Shea, John Doe ##1-5, New York City, Fausto Pichardo, Altamirano, Jon Brodie, N. Canale, City of New York, Sgt Miguel Cruz (Shield No 181), Bill DeBlasio, Robert Dixson, Fierro, Lars Frantzen, Patrick Gross (Shield 21147), Shield No 665 Hemme, Michael Hernandez, John and Jane Does 1-20, John and Jane Does 1-38, Luis E. Oritz (Shield No. 1133), New York Police Department, Britney Owens (Shield 26613), Pichardo, Anthony Polanco (Shield 11613), Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Erik Rodriguez (Shield No. 16334), Joseph A. Taylor, Theodore Wells, City of New York, Terence A. Monahan, Thomas Mosher, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Dermot F. Shea, Bill de Blasio, Officer Brianna Carlo, John Doe 1, NYPD Officer John Doe White Shirt with Helmet Bearing Shield No. 15519, Jane Doe 1, John Does 1-7, Lieutenant Richard Mack, Police Benevolent Association of the City of New York, Inc., Deputy Inspector Stephen Spataro. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: 1192 .(Balin, Robert)
Related: [-]
206 206 24 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 05/07 9:02 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (187 in 1:21-cv-00322-CM, 1193 in 1:20-cv-08924-CM, 205 in 1:21-cv-00533-CM, 224 in 1:20-cv-10291-CM-GWG, 164 in 1:20-cv-10541-CM, 105 in 1:21-cv-02548-CM, 112 in 1:21-cv-01904-CM, 167 in 1:21-cv-06610-CM) MOTION for an Order Compelling the City to Implement Paragraph 89(h) of the Stipulated Order . [REDACTED] . Document filed by Amr Alfiky, Diana Zeyneb Alhindawi, Jemell D. Cole, Jason Donnelly, Adam Gray. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(Balin, Robert)
Related: [-]
205 205 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/07 8:57 PM
MOTION for an Order Compelling the City to Implement Paragraph 89(h) of the Stipulated Order . Document filed by Amr Alfiky, Diana Zeyneb Alhindawi, Jemell D. Cole, Jason Donnelly, Adam Gray.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(Balin, Robert)
Related: [-]
204 204 motion Seal Wed 05/07 8:50 PM
LETTER MOTION to Seal Materials in connection with Plaintiffs' Motion for an Order Compelling the City to Implement Paragraph 89(h) of the Stipulated Order addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Abigail B. Everdell dated May 7, 2025. Document filed by Amr Alfiky, Diana Zeyneb Alhindawi, Jemell D. Cole, Jason Donnelly, Adam Gray.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(Everdell, Abigail)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
203 203 misc Letter Tue 05/06 12:31 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Tobias E. Zimmerman dated May 6, 2025 re: Previously Submitted Proposed Orders. Document filed by City of New York.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-08924-CM et al..(Zimmerman, Tobias)
Related: [-]