Arizona District Court
Judge:John J Tuchi
Case #: 2:21-cv-00109
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2021
Terminated:May 25, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 20, 2021 1:54 AM MST
Defendant
Johnson Mark LLC
Represented By
Rhett Montgomery Flaming-Buschman
Johnson Mark LLC
contact info
Defendant
LVNV Funding LLC
Represented By
Rhett Montgomery Flaming-Buschman
Johnson Mark LLC
contact info
Manuel Harry Newburger
Barron & Newburger PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jake L Kemp
Represented By
Jesse S Johnson
Greenwald Davidson Radbil PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM MST
Tuesday, May 25, 2021
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 05/25 8:07 AM
ORDER - The matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk shall close this matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/24/21. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
19 19 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 04/22 8:49 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice 30 days after the docketing of this Order unless the parties file a stipulation to dismiss prior to that date. The settlement constitutes an accord that has extinguished the underlying claim. All pending hearings and motions are deemed moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9:00 AM on April 22, 2021. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/21/2021. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
18 18 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 04/21 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement (Amended) by Jake L Kemp. (Johnson, Jesse)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 04/21 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Jake L Kemp. (Johnson, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
16 16 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Thu 04/15 6:34 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jake L Kemp. (Johnson, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/19 12:56 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Mark LLC. (Flaming-Buschman, Rhett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 18, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Thu 03/18 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel Harry Newburger on behalf of LVNV Funding LLC. (Newburger, Manuel)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 03/18 8:55 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Manuel Harry Newburger on behalf of Defendant LVNV Funding LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/09 12:48 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Johnson Mark LLC. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
12 12 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 03/08 2:58 PM
ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/8/2021. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 05, 2021
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/05 2:18 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LVNV Funding LLC. (Flaming-Buschman, Rhett)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/05 2:13 PM
LVNV ANSWER to1 Complaint by LVNV Funding LLC.(Flaming-Buschman, Rhett)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/05 2:11 PM
JOHNSON MARK LLC ANSWER to1 Complaint by Johnson Mark LLC.(Flaming-Buschman, Rhett)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
8 8 service Service Executed Fri 01/29 1:17 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jake L Kemp: Proof of Service re: Complaint, summons, and 1/21/21 Court order upon LVNV Funding, LLC on 01/28/2021. (Johnson, Jesse)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Service Executed Fri 01/29 1:16 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jake L Kemp: Proof of Service re: Complaint, summons, and 1/21/21 Court order upon Johnson Mark LLC on 01/26/2021. (Johnson, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 01/25 3:24 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jesse S Johnson on behalf of Plaintiff Jake L Kemp. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
6 6 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 01/22 8:34 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on April 22, 2021. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/21/2021. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/22 8:30 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/21/2021. (JAMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 01/21 2:59 PM
Summons Issued as to Johnson Mark LLC, LVNV Funding LLC.(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
3 3 misc New Case Opened Thu 01/21 2:46 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19080954. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-109-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Thu 01/21 2:44 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Jake L Kemp. (Johnson, Jesse)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 01/21 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19080954 filed by Jake L Kemp. (Johnson, Jesse)(MCO)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit