California Northern District Court
Case #: 5:21-cr-00023
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Jan 21, 2021 11:15 PM PST
Defendant
Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr. (1)
Represented By
Sophia Maria Whiting
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Tamara A Crepet
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 01/21/2021 11:44 PM PST
Friday, June 26, 2020
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr. (1), Jose Adrian Naranjo Ochoa (2). (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (cfeS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/20/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Motion to Seal Complaint and Arrest Warrant and ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 6/26/20. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (cfeS, COURT STAFF). [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 18, 2020
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr re Warrant Issued,1 Complaint (Sealed) Initial Appearance set for 8/19/2020 10:30 AM, by Zoom Video Conference, before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 19, 2020
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson: Defendant consents to proceed by Zoom Video Conference. Initial Appearance as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr held on 8/19/2020, Bond Hearing as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr held on 8/19/2020. Financial Affidavit to be submitted at next hearing. Govt moves to unseal entire case. Court so Orders entire case UNSEALED. Def. released: Bond-$50,000 Unsecured; Def/Co-signers Admonished re responsibilities; conditions of release and appearance. All agreed to have Court sign Bond on their behalf. Status: Bail Review set for 9/10/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Plaintiff's Attorney: Scott Simeon - by Zoom. Defendant's Attorney: Sophia Whiting (Provisionally apptd.) - by Zoom. Pretrial Officer: Pepper Friesen - by Zoom. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce - by Zoom. Total Time in Court : 11:26-11:42am(16 mins.). Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: Yes. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release $50,000 UNSECURED Bond Entered as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 8/19/20. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 21, 2020
5 5 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr (Crepet, Tamara) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2020
6 6 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending the Time for Indictment or Preliminary Hearing as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr filed by USA. (Simeon, Scott) Modified on 9/1/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
7 7 ORDER ON STIPULATION EXTENDING THE TIME FOR INDICTMENT OR PRELIMINARY HEARING, Granting 6 as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez Sr. (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 9/1/20. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/2/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 10, 2020
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Status Conference as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr held by Zoom on 9/10/2020. Parties agree with recommendation from Pretrial Services. Preliminary Examination set for 10/1/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Total Time in Court 5 minutes. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney: Scott Simeon. Defendant Attorney: Tamara Crepet. Pretrial Officer: Jalei Kinder. Defendant Present: Yes. Defendant in Custody: No. Attachment Minute Order. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 16, 2020
10 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Modify Conditions of Release and To Exclude Time as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (Declaration in Support of Stipulation)(Crepet, Tamara) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/17/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). [5:20-mj-70857-MAG] (Entered: 09/16/2020
11 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY CONDITIONS OF RELEASE AND TO EXCLUDE TIME, Granting 10 as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez Sr. (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 9/16/20. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 9/17/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Monday, September 21, 2020
12 12 NO Bail Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 8/18/20 as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 29, 2020
13 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION and [Proposed] Order Temporarily Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release by Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr. (Crepet, Tamara) Modified on 10/2/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TEMPORARILY MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF PRETRIAL RELEASE, Granting 13 as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez Sr. (1) . Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 9/29/20. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/2/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 30, 2020
Reset Hearing as to Defendant Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr. RE:16 . Preliminary Examination set for 10/1/2020 is continued to 11/5/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (lmh, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
15 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Preliminary Hearing and to Exclude Time as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr . (Crepet, Tamara) Modified on 10/2/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 STIPULATION to Continue Preliminary Hearing and to Exclude Time as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez Sr. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/30/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 04, 2020
17 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr to Continue Preliminary Hearing from November 5, 2020 to December 10, 2020 and to Exclude Time . (Crepet, Tamara) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
Set Hearing as to Defendant Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr re18 Order on Stipulation. Preliminary Examination set for 12/10/2020 10:30 AM in Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on the Consolidated Criminal Duty Calendar. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PRELIMINARY HEARING AND TO EXCLUDE TIME, Granting 17 Stipulation as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez Sr. (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 11/4/20. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr Preliminary Examination set for 1/21/2021 01:00 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
19 19 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Preliminary Hearing and to Exclude Time as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr . (Crepet, Tamara) Modified on 12/10/2020 (cfeS, COURT STAFF). [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
20 20 ORDER granting 19 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE PRELIMINARY HEARING AND TO EXCLUDE TIME as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez Sr. (1) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/8/20. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) [5:20-mj-70857-MAG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (cfeS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 FELONY INFORMATION as to Jimmy Dijose Lopez, Sr (1) count(s) 1. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (cfeS, COURT STAFF). (cfeS, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
Att: 2 (1/20/2021) Correct Information
Att: 3 (1/20/2021) Correct Criminal Cover Sheet