Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:19-bk-10512

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Joseph G Rosania Jr
Case #: 1:21-ap-01020
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2021
Terminated:Jul 26, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Two Rivers Water & Farming Company
Represented By
Two Rivers Water & Farming Company
contact info
Defendant
TR Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By
TR Capital Partners, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GrowCo, Inc.
335A Josephine St.
Denver, CO 80206
Represented By
David Wadsworth
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, July 26, 2021
court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/26 3:15 PM
Adversary Case Number 21-01020 JGR Closed. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
9 9 2 pgs court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/09 10:19 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/09/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, July 07, 2021
8 8 1 pgs order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 07/07 8:36 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (mjb)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 07/07 8:42 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 21-01020 JGR. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 7/21/2021 to review for closing. (mjb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 07, 2021
7 7 3 pgs court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/07 10:19 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/07/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Friday, March 05, 2021
6 6 2 pgs order Abeyance Fri 03/05 12:13 PM
Order Granting Motion To Hold Adversary Proceeding In Abeyance. This Adversary Proceeding shall be held in ABEYANCE pending the outcome of the US Trustee's motion to dismiss in the underlying bankruptcy case. Related [+]. (mjb)
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
5 5 4 pgs motion Abeyance Wed 02/10 4:32 PM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by Kelsey Jamie Buechler on behalf of TR Capital Partners, LLC, Two Rivers Water & Farming Company. (Buechler, Kelsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Thursday, January 21, 2021
4 4 1 pgs misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Thu 01/21 3:19 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Two Rivers Water and Farming Company and TR Capital Partners, LLC on January 21, 2021. Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of GrowCo, Inc.. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 01/21 3:14 PM
Summons Issued on TR Capital Partners, LLC Answer Due 02/22/2021; Two Rivers Water & Farming Company Answer Due 02/22/2021. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 01/21 3:12 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-01020 JGR] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A30178616. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 01/21 3:12 PM
Adversary case 21-01020 Complaint by GrowCo, Inc. against Two Rivers Water & Farming Company, TR Capital Partners, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 05/21/2021 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit 1
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit 2
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit 3