New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Allyne R Ross
Referred: A Kathleen Tomlinson
Case #: 2:21-cv-00379
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Case Filed:Jan 22, 2021
Terminated:Apr 21, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 21, 2021 4:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Chabad Lubavitch of Midtown Manhattan, Inc.
Represented By
Adam Bialek
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Michael Barer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Celena R. Mayo
Wilson Elser Moscowitz Edelman&dicker
contact info
Defendant
Chai Foundation, Inc.
Represented By
Adam Bialek
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Michael Barer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Celena R. Mayo
Wilson Elser Moscowitz Edelman&dicker
contact info
Defendant
Yitzchak Cohn
Represented By
Adam Bialek
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Michael Barer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Celena R. Mayo
Wilson Elser Moscowitz Edelman&dicker
contact info
Defendant
Lambro Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Adam Bialek
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Michael Barer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Celena R. Mayo
Wilson Elser Moscowitz Edelman&dicker
contact info
Defendant
Lambro-West, Inc.
Represented By
Adam Bialek
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Michael Barer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Celena R. Mayo
Wilson Elser Moscowitz Edelman&dicker
contact info
Defendant
Nachman Mazurek
Represented By
Adam Bialek
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Michael Barer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Celena R. Mayo
Wilson Elser Moscowitz Edelman&dicker
contact info
Defendant
David Tessel
Represented By
Adam Bialek
Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker, LLP
contact info
Michael Barer
Wilson Elser Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Celena R. Mayo
Wilson Elser Moscowitz Edelman&dicker
contact info
Plaintiff
Shivraj Anand
Represented By
Howard E. Gilbert
contact info
Jason A Gilbert
Gilbert Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 85 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 04/21 12:36 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), the above-captioned action is discontinued and withdrawn without prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 4/21/2021 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 04/20 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Shivraj Anand Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(i) (Gilbert, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
14 14 misc Letter Thu 04/15 2:46 PM
Letter to Notify Court of Plaintiff's Intentions by Shivraj Anand (Gilbert, Jason)
Related: [-]
notice Notice(Other) Thu 04/15 3:32 PM
NOTICE: The court has received plaintiff's14 letter notifying the court that plaintiff intends to file a stipulation to voluntarily dismiss this action, rather than amend the complaint. Plaintiff is free to so file per Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a). (Karr, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
13 13 minutes Pre Motion Conference Fri 04/09 1:35 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Allyne R. Ross: Telephonic Pre-Motion Conference held on 4/9/2021. On April 9, 2021, the court held a telephonic conference to discuss the parties' pre-motion letters regarding defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss. As set forth in the record of today's proceeding, the court has granted plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff's counsel will confer with his client and notify the court by April 15, 2021 whether his client intends to file an amended complaint. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Karr, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
notice Notice of Hearing Thu 04/08 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic pre-motion conference set for April 9, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge Allyne R. Ross. ATT TOLL FREE NUMBER 888-684-8852; ACCESS CODE 3055199. The parties will receive additional instructions regarding telephonic conferences via e-mail. (Karr, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
order Scheduling Order Mon 03/29 9:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict, the Court needs to move the date and time of the Initial Conference. The Conference will now go forward on April 30, 2021 at 11 a.m. (instead of the original date of April 26, 2021). Counsel are requested to mark their calendars accordingly.Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/29/2021. (Tomlinson, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
12 12 misc Letter Wed 03/24 3:30 PM
Letter in Opposition to Defendants' Request for a Pre-Motion Conference by Shivraj Anand (Gilbert, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
11 11 misc Letter Mon 03/15 4:50 PM
Letter to Hon. Ross dated 3-15-21 by Chabad Lubavitch of Midtown Manhattan, Inc., Chai Foundation, Inc., Yitzchak Cohn, Lambro Industries, Inc., Lambro-West, Inc., Nachman Mazurek, David Tessel (Bialek, Adam)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/15 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Celena R. Mayo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Mayo, Celena)
Related: [-]
notice Notice(Other) Mon 03/15 6:14 PM
NOTICE: Defendants have submitted a11 letter requesting a pre-motion conference regarding an anticipated motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded that, under Judge Ross's Individual Practices and Rules, plaintiff is required to file a responsive letter addressing the legal and factual bases of the anticipated motion within seven (7) business days from service of defendants' letter, on or before March 24, 2021 . (Karr, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 03/12 4:09 PM
INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for April 26, 2021 at 11:30 A.M. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. The Initial Conference will be conducted by telephone. Counsel are directed to utilize the Court's teleconferencing line at (866) 590-5055, access code 9720458, at the time of the conference. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the Court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DETAILS. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 3/12/2021. (Ameri, Mana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/23 2:43 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to March 19, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 2/23/2021. (Ameri, Mana)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/17 2:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shivraj Anand. Chabad Lubavitch of Midtown Manhattan, Inc. served on 1/27/2021, answer due 2/17/2021; Chai Foundation, Inc. served on 1/27/2021, answer due 2/17/2021; Yitzchak Cohn served on 2/10/2021, answer due 3/3/2021; Lambro Industries, Inc. served on 1/27/2021, answer due 2/17/2021; Lambro-West, Inc. served on 1/29/2021, answer due 2/19/2021; Nachman Mazurek served on 1/28/2021, answer due 2/18/2021; David Tessel served on 1/27/2021, answer due 2/17/2021. (Gilbert, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/12 4:24 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the plaintiff's complaint by Chabad Lubavitch of Midtown Manhattan, Inc., Chai Foundation, Inc., Yitzchak Cohn, Lambro Industries, Inc., Lambro-West, Inc., Nachman Mazurek, David Tessel. (Barer, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/12 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Bialek on behalf of Chabad Lubavitch of Midtown Manhattan, Inc., Chai Foundation, Inc., Yitzchak Cohn, Lambro Industries, Inc., Lambro-West, Inc., Nachman Mazurek, David Tessel (aty to be noticed) (Bialek, Adam)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/12 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Barer on behalf of Chabad Lubavitch of Midtown Manhattan, Inc., Chai Foundation, Inc., Yitzchak Cohn, Lambro Industries, Inc., Lambro-West, Inc., Nachman Mazurek, David Tessel (aty to be noticed) (Barer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 01/25 8:43 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 01/25 8:43 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 01/25 8:37 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 01/25 8:40 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/22 5:12 PM
COMPLAINT VERIFIED against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14034272 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Shivraj Anand. (Gilbert, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit Employment Agreement