Levings et al v. Dimont & Associates, LLC et al
Oklahoma Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick R Wyrick |
Case #: | 6:21-cv-00021 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Jan 25, 2021 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2022 |
Case in other court: | LeFlore County District Court, CJ-20-00204 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 24, 2021 3:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
Dimont & Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Levings
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Margaret Levings
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 04/27 10:21 AM
MANDATE letter from Circuit Court. (adw, Deputy Clerk) |
|
39 | 39
appeal
USCA Decision
Thu 04/27 10:19 AM
DECISION from Circuit Court dismissing the Appeal. (adw, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
appeal
Transcript Order Form (for appeals only)
Fri 02/10 1:17 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by James Levings, Margaret Levings. (Transcripts are not necessary or are already on file) (adw, Deputy Clerk) |
|
appeal
Notice of Record Completion
Fri 02/10 1:19 PM
Notice advising the record is complete for the purposes of appeal . A Transcript Order Form has been filed stating no transcripts are necessary. (adw, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Wednesday, January 25, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
appeal
Appeal Number Information from Circuit Court
Wed 01/25 12:27 PM
APPEAL NUMBER INFORMATION from Circuit Court assigning Case Number 23-7004 (adw, Deputy Clerk) |
|
35 | 35
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Wed 01/25 11:05 AM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to U.S. Court of Appeals. (With attachments)(adw, Deputy Clerk) |
|
34 | 34
appeal
Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment
Wed 01/25 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Circuit Court (paid $505 appeal fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1750685) by James Levings, Margaret Levings (Roloff, Janet) |
|
Tuesday, December 27, 2022 | ||
33 | 33
order
Ruling on Motion for Hearing Ruling on Motion to Reconsider
Tue 12/27 9:08 AM
ORDER by Judge Patrick R. Wyrick denying32 plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and for Rule 59 Relief from Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice, asking the Court to reconsider its prior Order31 granting Defendants' motions to dismiss and dismissing this case with prejudice. (Spaulding, Kathy) |
|
Thursday, December 15, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Hearing
Thu 12/15 8:50 AM
MOTION for Hearing motion for reconsideration and for rule 59 relief from judgment of dismissal with prejudice by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/29/2022(Roloff, Janet) |
|
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
31 | 31
order
Ruling on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 11/29 1:19 PM
ORDER by Judge Patrick R. Wyrick granting8 Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss and10 Defendant Dimont & Associates, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (as more fully set out in order). (Spaulding, Kathy) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/21 9:01 AM
NOTICE notice of unavailability of counsel by James Levings, Margaret Levings (Roloff, Janet) |
|
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Surreply to Motion
Fri 02/11 8:51 AM
SURREPLY to Motion by James Levings, Margaret Levings ;(Roloff, Janet) |
|
Tuesday, February 08, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
order
Ruling on Motion for Leave to File Document(s) Deadlines - Set/Reset Deadline(s)
Tue 02/08 12:30 PM
ORDER by Judge Patrick R. Wyrick granting25 and26 plaintiff's motions for leave to file a surreply to defendants' motions to dismiss. Plaintiffs are directed to file their surreply by no later than Friday, February 11, 2022. (Spaulding, Kathy) |
|
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 06/02 11:56 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA ;(Rodine, Brent) |
|
Thursday, May 20, 2021 | ||
order
Documents - Terminate Motion(s)
Thu 05/20 9:08 AM
Motions terminated:24 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to the reply brief filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. filed by Margaret Levings, James Levings (incorrect document attached; attorney has refiled).(Spaulding, Kathy) |
||
utility
Remark
Thu 05/20 9:11 AM
***Remark: Motion STRICKEN (incorrect document attached; attorney has refiled); (document24 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to the reply brief filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. ) (Spaulding, Kathy) |
||
Wednesday, May 19, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Leave to File Document(s)
Wed 05/19 6:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to File surreply to the reply brief filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/2/2021(Roloff, Janet) |
|
Tuesday, May 18, 2021 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Leave to File Document(s)
Tue 05/18 10:31 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to the reply brief filed by defendant Dimont by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/1/2021(Roloff, Janet) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Leave to File Document(s)
Tue 05/18 10:27 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply to the reply brief filed by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. by All Plaintiffs Responses due by 6/1/2021(Roloff, Janet) |
|
Tuesday, March 30, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Supplement
Tue 03/30 10:27 AM
SUPPLEMENT by JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (Rodine, Brent) |
|
Friday, March 12, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 03/12 4:31 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion by Dimont & Associates, LLC ;(Jones, Molly) |
|
Wednesday, March 10, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 03/10 11:26 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion by JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA ;(Rodine, Brent) |
|
Friday, February 26, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 02/26 3:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by James Levings, Margaret Levings ;(Roloff, Janet) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
order
Ruling on Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion
Tue 02/16 1:59 PM
ORDER by Judge Patrick R. Wyrick granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion. Responses due by 2/26/2021 (kch, Deputy Clerk) (Main Document 19 replaced on 2/16/2021) (kch, Deputy Clerk) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time to Respond to Motion
Tue 02/16 1:55 PM
James Levings, Margaret Levings MOTION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Motion (kch, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, February 05, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Fri 02/05 3:13 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Molly M. Jones on behalf of Dimont & Associates, LLC (Jones, Molly) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Fri 02/05 2:38 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew M. Gould on behalf of Dimont & Associates, LLC (Gould, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, February 04, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
order
02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s)
Thu 02/04 2:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Patrick R. Wyrick, of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-21-PRW. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, February 03, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
order
Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/03 3:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder granting12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Molly M. Jones for Dimont & Associates, LLC, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) |
|
13 | 13
order
Ruling on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/03 3:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder granting11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of attorney Andrew M. Gould for Dimont & Associates, LLC, provided that local counsel is present at all proceedings, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This is conditioned on the filing of an entry of appearance and registration for electronic case filing by the applicant within seven (7) days from entry of this Order. See LCvR 83.4 and CM/ECF Administrative Guide of Policies and Procedures. (pmb, Deputy Clerk) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/03 12:22 PM
MOTION for Attorney Molly M. Jones to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1454969) by Dimont & Associates, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 2/17/2021(Dean, Ryan) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 02/03 12:16 PM
MOTION for Attorney Andrew M. Gould to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 filing fee; receipt number AOKEDC-1454955) by Dimont & Associates, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 2/17/2021(Dean, Ryan) |
|
Monday, February 01, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 02/01 6:20 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by Dimont & Associates, LLC (With attachments) Responses due by 2/16/2021(Dean, Ryan) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Mon 02/01 6:18 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan L. Dean on behalf of Dimont & Associates, LLC (Dean, Ryan) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 02/01 3:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim by JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (With attachments) Responses due by 2/16/2021(Rodine, Brent) |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2021 | ||
misc
Filing Fee Paid in Full - CV
Tue 02/02 1:29 PM
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 1/28/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1452537 by JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (sms, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, January 26, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Disclosure Statement (Corporate)
Tue 01/26 5:33 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Dimont Acquisition Holdings, LLC for Dimont & Associates, LLC) by Dimont & Associates, LLC (Meek, Justin) |
|
Monday, January 25, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 01/25 3:28 PM
NOTICE Consent of Removal by Dimont & Associates, LLC (Meek, Justin) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement (Corporate)
Mon 01/25 3:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA) by JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (Rodine, Brent) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance - Attorney
Mon 01/25 3:22 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Justin Meek on behalf of Dimont & Associates, LLC (Meek, Justin) |
|
3 | 3
order
02 - Minute Order Directing - New CV Notice of Removal Case Filing Fee Payment
Mon 01/25 2:48 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 2/1/2021)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 01/25 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Removal from LeFlore County District Court, case number CJ-20-204 by JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 01/25 2:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA (jcb, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Saturday, February 29, 2020 | ||
PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Dimont & Associates, LLC, JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA by Margaret Levings, James Levings (jcb, Deputy Clerk) |