Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Terry A Doughty
Referred: Kayla D Mcclusky
Case #: 3:21-cv-00202
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 20, 2021
Re-opened:Jan 12, 2022
Terminated:Jul 05, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
46 46 order Judgment re Report and Recommendations Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 07/05 10:47 AM
JUDGMENT adopting45 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, granting in part and denying in part20 and29 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/5/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
45 45 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 06/13 4:51 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint,20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment,29 MOTION for Summary Judgment. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the motions for summary judgment be GRANTED-IN-PART and that Plaintiff's claims against said Defendants be DISMISSED, with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the motions for summary judgment otherwise are DENIED, and instead that Plaintiff's state law claims, if any, against all Defendants be DISMISSED, without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/27/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/13/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
44 44 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 03/29 5:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Frazier. (aty,Bryant, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 23, 2022
43 43 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/23 9:24 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Janna Chauvin. (aty,Sartor, Fred) Modified to reflect correct filer on 3/23/2022 (Whitener, M)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
42 42 respm Response to Motion Tue 03/22 9:54 AM
RESPONSE to29 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Desmond Renard.(crt,Taylor, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 Envelope
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
41 41 notice Notice of Motion Setting Tue 02/22 10:30 AM
SECOND NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment ,29 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 3/15/2022 (crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
40 40 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 02/03 2:01 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Janna Chauvin. (aty,Sartor, Fred)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
39 39 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 02/02 12:40 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Frazier. (aty,Bryant, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
38 38 5 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Thu 01/27 12:00 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Desmond Renard.(crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 01/12 10:48 AM
ORDER granting36 Motion to Reopen Case, styled as Motion to File Out of Time Appeal. The case is reopened and Plaintiff must respond to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment by 1/26/22. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 1/12/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/12 10:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment ,29 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Plaintiff's response is due by 1/26/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
36 36 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 01/11 1:40 PM
MOTION to File Out of Time Appeal by Desmond Renard, pro se. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/10/2022.(crt,WalkerSld, B)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Cover Letter,
Att: 3 Envelope
utility Motions Transferred Tue 01/11 1:46 PM
Motions Transferred regarding36 MOTION for to File Out of Time Appeal. Motion referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,WalkerSld, B)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 28, 2021
35 35 misc Mail Returned Mon 11/01 3:59 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Desmond Renard, Tensas Parish Detention Center, re:34 Order Dismissing Case/Party (LR41.3) returned marked: return to sender. (crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 15, 2021
34 34 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case/Party (LR41.3) Fri 10/15 4:43 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Clerk under LR41.3. Case may be reinstated within 30 days for good cause shown. Issued by Tony R Moore, Clerk of Court, on 10/15/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 12, 2021
33 33 misc Mail Returned Thu 10/14 10:32 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Desmond Renard, Tensas Parish Detention Center, re:31 Notice of Intent to Dismiss returned marked: return to sender, inmate no longer at this facility. (crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 29, 2021
32 32 misc Mail Returned Wed 09/29 3:49 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Desmond Renard, Tensas Parish Detention Center, re:30 Notice of Motion Setting returned marked: Return to Sender; Inmate No Longer at Facility. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 27, 2021
31 31 notice Notice of Intent to Dismiss (Form Included) Mon 09/27 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Intent to dismiss CASE for Failure to apprise court of change of address. (crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 22, 2021
30 30 notice Notice of Motion Setting Wed 09/22 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:29 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 10/13/2021 (crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
29 29 motion Summary Judgment Tue 09/21 3:38 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Frazier. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky.(aty,Richardson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief,
Att: 2 Statement of material facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Declaration of Nurse Frazier
Friday, September 17, 2021
28 28 misc Mail Returned Mon 09/20 1:33 PM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Desmond Renard, Tensas Parish Detention Center, re:27 Order on Motion for Extension returned marked: return to sender. (crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 09, 2021
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Thu 09/09 11:43 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of time to file dispositive motions. Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 9/8/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
26 26 motion Extension (Other) Tue 09/07 10:33 AM
MOTION for Extension of time to file dispositive motions with consent sought but not yet obtained by Frazier. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/7/2021.(aty,Bryant, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Friday, August 27, 2021
25 25 misc Mail Returned Fri 08/27 9:26 AM
MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Desmond Renard, Tensas Parish Detention Center, re:22 Notice of Deficiency,24 Notice of Motion Setting returned marked: Return to Sender; Inmate No Longer at Facility. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Return doc #24
Thursday, August 12, 2021
24 24 notice Notice of Motion Setting Thu 08/12 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding:20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 9/2/2021 (crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
23 23 misc Corrective Document Wed 08/11 4:56 PM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Adding Table of Authorities for Doc. 20 filed by Janna Chauvin regarding20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . (aty,Sartor, Fred)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 08/11 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency to Janna Chauvin regarding20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . Reason: A table of contents and table of cases, statutes and other authorities is required for a brief which exceeds ten pages. Please see LR7.8 for specific requirements regarding table of contents. (crt,Haik, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 10, 2021
21 21 misc Sealed Document (Sealed Pleading) Tue 08/10 6:05 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT: by Janna Chauvin re20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment .(aty,Sartor, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A2 to Declaration of Janna Chauvin filed under seal pursuant to Rec. Doc. 11
20 20 motion Summary Judgment Tue 08/10 6:02 PM
First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Janna Chauvin. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky.(aty,Sartor, Fred)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support of Chauvin Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 2 Statement of material facts Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Janna Chauvin,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A1 - Contract between Sisters Medical Clinic, LLC and The Tensas Parish Law Enforcement District,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B - Confirmation of Chauvin PCF eligibility,
Att: 6 Proposed order Proposed Order on Chauvin MSJ,
Att: 7 Notice of manual attachment Notice of Compliance with Rec. Doc 11 That Requires Certain Documents - Here Exhibit A2 - to be Filed Under Seal
Friday, May 28, 2021
19 19 misc Sealed Document (Sealed Pleading) Fri 05/28 1:37 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT: Notice of Compliance by Frazier re11 Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely,.(aty,Bryant, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit TPDC Medical File
Monday, May 24, 2021
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 05/24 4:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Janna Chauvin served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021; Frazier served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/19 1:11 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Janna Chauvin.(Attorney Fred W Sartor, Jr added to party Janna Chauvin(pty:dft))(aty,Sartor, Fred)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Answer to Complaint Mon 05/10 1:10 PM
ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint, , ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint,1 Complaint, by Frazier.(Attorney Timothy R Richardson added to party Frazier(pty:dft))(aty,Richardson, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
15 15 service Summons Issued Thu 04/01 1:09 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Janna Chauvin, Nurse Frazier. Clerk sent summons, USM-285 form, docs 1, 9, 11 for each party to USM for service. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
14 14 order Judgment re Report and Recommendations Order on Report and Recommendations Thu 03/25 9:14 AM
JUDGMENT adopting10 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, dismissing Plaintiff's claims as frivolous and for failing to state claims on which relief may be granted, with the exception of Plaintiff's claims of lack of medical care against Nurse Frazier and Dr Chauvin. Tensas Parish Detention Center, Rikey Jones, Pat Smith, Nolen Bass, and Diedra Harvey dismissed. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 3/25/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
13 13 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 03/24 3:54 PM
OBJECTION to10 Report and Recommendations by Desmond Renard. Response to Objection to R&R due by 4/7/2021.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
12 12 misc Copy Work or Form Request (Public Entry No NEF) Wed 03/24 3:32 PM
REQUEST from Desmond Renard for Pauperis and 1983 forms. Clerk mailed requested forms on 03/24/2021. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, March 15, 2021
11 11 order Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely Mon 03/15 4:57 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Clerk is directed to serve plaintiff with two summons forms and one USM 285 form for each defendant to be completed by plaintiff and returned to clerk for service by U S Marshal. Clerk manually noticed order with forms. Pro Se Response due by 4/14/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/15/2021.(crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Forms,
Att: 2 USM285 Forms
10 10 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 03/15 4:54 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that with the exception of Plaintiffs claims of lack of medical care against Nurse Frazier and Dr. Chauvin, Plaintiff's claims be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 3/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/15/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/11 4:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nolen Bass, Jr, Janna Chauvin, Frazier, Diedra Harvey, Rikey Jones, Pat Smith, Tensas Parish Detention Center filed by Desmond Renard.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of Notice of Electronic Filing,
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
8 8 order Minute Entry/Order Reassigning Case Tue 02/23 7:06 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Magistrate Judge Hayes are hereby reset before Magistrate Judge McClusky. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/23/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
7 7 order Sec P - Order Amend/ARP/Summons/Timely Fri 02/12 4:36 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint, within 30 days of the filing of this Order, to cure the deficiencies. Plaintiff shall dismiss any claims that he is unable to cure through amendment. Plaintiff shall also notify the Court of any change in his address. Pro Se Response due by 3/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/12/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/12 1:10 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/12/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
5 5 misc Corrective Document Thu 02/11 4:39 PM
CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Signed Signature Page of Complaint filed by Desmond Renard regarding1 Complaint.(crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 Envelope
Thursday, January 28, 2021
4 4 order Sec P - Deficiency Order Thu 01/28 9:30 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to sign complaint/petition. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 3/1/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/28/2021.(crt,Leday, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Signature Page
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
3 3 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Wed 01/27 11:52 AM
PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/27/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 01/25 10:16 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Desmond Renard. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/20/2021.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/25 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT against Nolen Bass, Jr, Janna Chauvin, Frazier, Diedra Harvey, Rickey Jones, Pat Smith, Tensas Parish Detention Center filed by Desmond Renard.(crt,Miletello, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet,
Att: 2 Envelope
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/27 11:04 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Devillier, W)
Related: [-]