New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:21-bk-10632
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2021
Terminated:Mar 25, 2022
Plan Confirmed:Aug 25, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
L'Occitane, Inc.
111 W 33rd St Fl 20
New York, NY 10001-2904
Represented By
Mark E. Hall
Fox Rothschild, LLP
contact info
Michael R. Herz
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Thursday, March 21, 2024
643 643 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Fri 03/22 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 03/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
642 642 53 pgs court Transcript Fri 03/15 2:10 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 08/24/21 Related [+]. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/22/2024. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 04/5/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/15/2024. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 06/13/2024. (J&J Court Transcribers)
Related: [-] 386 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor L'Occitane, Inc.,407 Order Approving Disclosure Statement,408 Order Conditionally Approving Disclosure Statement