Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:20-cr-00178
Case Filed:Dec 08, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 27, 2021 2:16 AM EST
defendant
Carl Anthony Turner (1)
Represented By
John Freeman
Law Office Of John Freeman
contact info
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Stephanie M. Carowan
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info

GPO Jan 21 2021
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Carl Anthony Turner; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
GPO Jun 01 2021
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the guilty plea of Carl Anthony Turner as to the Indictment be accepted ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)
GPO Jun 16 2021
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 33 as to Carl Anthony Turner; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)

Docket last updated: 02/07/2021 6:02 PM EST
Tuesday, December 08, 2020
1 1 INDICTMENT as to Carl Anthony Turner (ems) Modified on 1/19/2021 (jln).
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION and ORDER TO SEAL CASE until defendant is arrested, the investigation is completed, or further order of this court; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (ems) Modified on 1/19/2021 (jln).
Related: [-]
3 3 PENALTY SHEET re Indictment1 as to Carl Anthony Turner (ems) Modified on 1/19/2021 (jln).
Related: [-]