Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:20-bk-72122

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:21-ap-08012
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2021
Terminated:Mar 10, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Commack Union Free School District
Hubbs Administration Building 480 Clay Pitts Rd.
Commack, NY 11725
Represented By
Commack Union Free School District
contact info
Plaintiff
ACME Bus Corp.
3355 Veterans Memorial Highway
Ronkonkoma, NY 11779
Represented By
Andrew K. Martingale
Hamburger, Maxson, Yaffe, & Mcnally, LLP
contact info
Lauren Catherine Kiss
Klestadt Winters Jureller Southard
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, March 10, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Fri 03/10 8:55 AM
Adversary Case 8:21-ap-8012 Closed (one)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
32 32 notice Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/09 10:10 AM
Notice of Dismissal of an Adversary Proceeding Stipulation Dismissing Adversary Proceedings as Against Commack Union Free School District With Prejudice Filed by ACME Bus Corp.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
31 31 order Compromise Controversy (Settle Adversary) Wed 02/15 10:01 AM
Order, Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019, Approving Certain Settlement and General Release Agreements With (I) Port Washington Union Free School District, (II) Rockville Centre Union Free School District, (III) South Huntington Union Free School District, (IV) Three Village Central School District, (V) Uniondale Union Free School District, (VI) Westbury Union Free School District, (VII) Levittown Union Free School District, and (VIII) Commack Union Free School District Related [+] Signed on 2/15/2023. (one)
Related: [-] 28
Monday, February 13, 2023
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Settled/Withdrawn/Marked Off Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Fri 02/17 11:13 AM
Settled without hearin Related [+] Certificate of No Objection filed on docket #30; Under Submission. (mtt)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Compromise Controversy Filed by Plaintiff ACME Bus Corp.
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
30 30 misc Statement Wed 02/08 5:30 PM
Statement Certificate of No Objection with Respect to the Plan Administrator's Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019, Approving Certain Settlement and General Release Agreements with (I) Port Washington Union Free School District, (II) Rockville Centre Union Free School District, (III) South Huntington Union Free School District, (IV) Three Village Central School District, (V) Uniondale Union Free School District (VI) Westbury Union Free School District, (VII) Levittown Union Free School District, and (VIII) Commack Union Free School District Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of ACME Bus Corp. Related [+] (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Compromise Controversy filed by Plaintiff ACME Bus Corp.
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
29 29 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 01/17 3:35 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of ACME Bus Corp. Related [+] (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 28 Motion to Compromise Controversy filed by Plaintiff ACME Bus Corp.
Friday, January 13, 2023
28 28 motion Compromise Controversy (Settle Adversary) Fri 01/13 1:31 PM
Motion to Compromise Controversy Plan Administrator's Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 9019, Approving Certain Settlement and General Release Agreements with (I) Port Washington Union Free School District, (II) Rockville Centre Union Free School District, (III) South Huntington Union Free School District, (IV) Three Village Central School District, (V) Uniondale Union Free School District (VI) Westbury Union Free School District, (VII) Levittown Union Free School District, and (VIII) Commack Union Free School District . Objections to be filed on February 6, 2023. Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of ACME Bus Corp.. Hearing scheduled for 2/13/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 06/13 3:02 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Monday, April 11, 2022
27 27 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/11 3:38 PM
Omnibus Pretrial Order Governing Discovery and Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions; Discovery shall be completed on or before October 17, 2022; Any motions to amend the pleadings or to join other parties shall be filed on or beforeNovember 14, 2022; Any dispositive motions shall be filed on or before December 15, 2022. Opposition to dispositive motions shall be filed on or before January 17, 2023 with any reply to be filed by February 6, 2023; A final pretrial conference will be held on April 3, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. (EST) in Courtroom 860, United States Bankruptcy Court, Central Islip, New York Related [+]. Signed on 4/11/2022. (one)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 04/12 3:00 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Sean C Southard, Neil Bovona, Mary Sadowski, Robert Nosek, Mark Gillman, Cliff Katz, Michell Feldman, Robert Griswold. Pre-Trial Conference set for 06/13/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (mtt
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 02/25 1:29 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearances: Sean C Southard, Michelle Feldman, Neil Bivona, Richard McCord, Robert Nosek, Joshua Sprague. Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/11/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/16 4:39 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Joshua S. Sprague on behalf of Commack Union Free School District (Sprague, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 30, 2022
25 25 order Extending Time to File Answer Mon 01/31 12:26 PM
Stipulation and Order by and between Plaintiff and Defendant Extending Time for Defendant Commack Union Free School District to File Answer. Answer Due 2/16/2022 Related [+]. Signed on 1/30/2022 (one)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff ACME Bus Corp.
Friday, January 28, 2022
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 01/31 8:38 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 02/23/2022 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thursday, January 27, 2022
24 24 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Thu 01/27 5:42 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between Neil Bivona, as Plan Administrator on behalf of the Post-Confirmation Debtors and Commack Union Free School District to Extend Time to Answer the Complaint Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of ACME Bus Corp. Related [+] (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 22 Extending Time to File Answer
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
23 23 order Generic Order Tue 01/04 12:00 PM
Memorandum Decision Denying Motions to Dismiss Related [+]. Signed on 1/4/2022 (one)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District,20 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
22 22 order Extending Time to File Answer Tue 12/28 11:38 AM
Stipulation and Order by and between Plaintiff and Defendant Commack Union Free School District Extending Time for Defendant Commack Union Free School District to File Answer is hereby extended to and including January 31, 2022 . Answer Due 1/31/2022. Signed on 12/28/2021 (ssw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 22, 2021
21 21 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Wed 12/22 10:42 AM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between (A) Plan Administrator, on behalf of the Post-Confirmation Debtors and (B) Commack Union Free School District to To Extend Time to Answer the Complaints Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of ACME Bus Corp. Related [+] (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, December 13, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 12/13 2:05 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/31/2022 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+]
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. (mtt
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
20 20 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/23 1:43 PM
Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Establishing Deadlines to Answer and Submit a Proposed Pretrial Order; The deadline for Defendants to answer the complaints is thirty (30) days from the date of this Order; provided that such deadline may be extended by further stipulation with approval of this Court in the event of ongoing settlement and/or mediation efforts between and among the parties; Plaintiffs and Defendants shall meet and confer concerning a proposed pretrial order in each adversary proceeding; A pre-trial conference shall be held in relation to all then unresolved adversary proceedings subject to this Order on January 31, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. (EST) Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2021. (one)
Related: [-] 10
utility Update Answer Deadline Tue 11/23 1:43 PM
Commack Union Free School District Answer Deadline Reset for 12/23/2021 (one)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 28, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 11/02 2:00 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Sean Southard, Wade Wilkinson, Joshua Sprauge, Joshua Shteierman, Dennis O'Brien, Horalo Miller, Michelle Feldman, Chris Shishko, Joshua Sprague, Richard Hamburger, Cliff Katz, Maryanne Sadowski, David Arntsen, Marcus Monteiro & on phone: Brian Powers, Christopher Mesteay, Lauren Kiss, Michael Fishman, Niel Bivona, Patrick Collins, Richard McCord, Robert Nosek & Sara Temes ; ; Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Tue 11/02 2:44 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance: Sean Southard, Wade Wilkinson, Joshua Sprauge, Joshua Shteierman, Dennis O'Brien, Horalo Miller, Michelle Feldman, Chris Shishko, Joshua Sprague, Richard Hamburger, Cliff Katz, Maryanne Sadowski, David Arntsen, Marcus Monteiro & on phone: Brian Powers, Christopher Mesteay, Lauren Kiss, Michael Fishman, Niel Bivona, Patrick Collins, Richard McCord, Robert Nosek & Sara Temes ; ; Related [+] Motion Denied; Submit Order (mtt)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
Thursday, September 30, 2021
19 19 answer Reply Thu 09/30 3:24 PM
Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Filed by Joshua S. Sprague on behalf of Commack Union Free School District Related [+] (Sprague, Joshua)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Wed 09/15 10:54 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (amp)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Wed 09/15 10:55 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing 'Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (amp)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
18 18 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Wed 08/11 10:21 AM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from September 15, 2021 to October 25, 2021 Filed by Michelle S Feldman on behalf of Commack Union Free School District Related [+]. (Feldman, Michelle)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
17 17 answer Affidavit in Opposition Wed 06/30 7:42 PM
Affidavit in Opposition Commack Declaration of Richard Hamburger in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss of Commack Union Free School District Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of ACME Bus Corp. Related [+] (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
Att: 1 Exhibit A - School District Notices and Demands for Examination
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Excerpts from 50-h Examination
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 3, 2020 Email
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Second April 3, 2020 Email
16 16 answer Affidavit in Opposition Wed 06/30 7:40 PM
Affidavit in Opposition Declaration of Ronald Baumann in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of ACME Bus Corp. Related [+] (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from Bayport-Blue Point UFSD Athletics Contract
15 15 answer Affidavit in Opposition Wed 06/30 7:40 PM
Affidavit in Opposition Declaration of Richard Hamburger in Support of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of ACME Bus Corp. Related [+] (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Decision and Order in VTC Bus Corp. v. Valley Stream UFSD 24
14 14 answer Memorandum of Law in Opposition Wed 06/30 7:39 PM
Memorandum of Law in Opposition Memorandum of Law on Behalf of ACME Bus Corp. and Baumann & Sons Buses, Inc. in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss Made by Defendant Commack Union Free School District Filed by Lauren Catherine Kiss on behalf of ACME Bus Corp. Related [+] (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 06/30 12:24 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned;Appearance: Sean Southard, Lauren Kiss, Christine Black, Brian Kantar, Thomas Killeen, Brian Lebrun, James Murphy, Neil Bivona, George Megre, Ronald Baumann, Kim D. Steverson, Ronald J Friedman, Brian Powers,, Haley Trust, Richard McCord, Peter Corey, Patrick Collins, Sara Temes ; Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/15/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Wed 06/30 12:25 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Sean Southard, Lauren Kiss, Christine Black, Brian Kantar, Thomas Killeen, Brian Lebrun, James Murphy, Neil Bivona, George Megre, Ronald Baumann, Kim D. Steverson, Ronald J Friedman, Brian Powers,, Haley Trust, Richard McCord, Peter Corey, Patrick Collins, Sara Temes ; 'Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
Thursday, May 27, 2021
13 13 order Stipulation and Order Thu 05/27 12:19 PM
Stipulation and Omnibus Pretrial Order by and between ACME Bus Corp. and Commack Union Free School District; Plaintiffs will file opposition to each of the pending motions to dismiss the complaints on or before June 30, 2021; Defendants shall file any reply papers on or before August 16, 2021; The Court shall establish such hearing(s) for argument on the pending motions as necessary; All discovery is stayed pending a further Pretrial Order permitting discovery to proceed Related [+]. Signed on 5/27/2021 (one)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 05/14 1:14 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Sean Southard, Andrew Martingale, Marcus Montero, Richard Hamburger, Richard McCord, Robert Nosek, Ronald Fiedman, Brian Powers, Haley Trust, Dennis O'Brien, Cliff Katz, David Arntsen, Richard Artura, Wade Wilkensen, Neil Bivona, Sarah Temes, Christine Black ; Pre-Trial Conference set for 06/30/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Fri 05/14 1:15 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Sean Southard, Andrew Martingale, Marcus Montero, Richard Hamburger, Richard McCord, Robert Nosek, Ronald Fiedman, Brian Powers, Haley Trust, Dennis O'Brien, Cliff Katz, David Arntsen, Richard Artura, Wade Wilkensen, Neil Bivona, Sarah Temes, Christine Black ; 'Hearing scheduled for 06/30/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Thu 04/22 11:10 AM
Adjourned Without Hearing 'Hearing scheduled for 05/12/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Thu 04/08 5:56 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Sean Southard, Richard McCord, Cliff Katz, Howard Miller, Richard Artura, Michelle Feldman, Joshua Sprague, Wade Wilkensen, Stan Yang, Brian Kantar, Richard Hamburger, Robert Cohen, Maryann Sadowski, Marcus Montero, David Arntsen, Brian Powers ; Pre-Trial Conference set for 05/12/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
12 12 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Wed 03/24 1:21 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service of Notice of Motion, Declaration of Michelle S. Feldman and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Joshua S. Sprague on behalf of Commack Union Free School District Related [+] (Sprague, Joshua)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 03/26 9:58 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Sean Southard, Lauren Kiss, Stan Yang, Richard Hamburger, Andrew Martingale, Ronald Friedman, Cliff Katz, Elizabeth Ledkovsky, Marcus Monteiro, Sophia Perna-Plank, Wade Wilkensen, Michelle Feldman, Sarah Temes, David Arntsen, Brian Powers, Robert Cohen, Richard McCord, Richard Artura, Neil Bibona, Brian Kantar, Joshua Sprague, Maryann Sidowsky, Sean Carey, Howard Miller, Christopher Shishko ; Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/07/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Monday, March 22, 2021
11 11 answer Memorandum of Law in Support Mon 03/22 3:35 PM
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint Filed by Michelle S Feldman on behalf of Commack Union Free School District Related [+] (Feldman, Michelle)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Defendant Commack Union Free School District
10 10 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 03/22 3:32 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Michelle S Feldman on behalf of Commack Union Free School District. Hearing scheduled for 4/21/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (Feldman, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Michelle S. Feldman
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Order
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Complaint
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Contract
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Notice of Claim
Monday, March 08, 2021
9 9 order Extending Time to File Answer Mon 03/08 9:31 AM
Stipulation and Order by and between ACME Bus Corp. and Commack Union Free School District Extending Time for Defendant Commack Union Free School District to File Answer. Answer Due 3/22/2021 Related [+]. Signed on 3/8/2021 (one)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation and Order, Extending Time to File Answer,8 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff ACME Bus Corp.
Friday, March 05, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Fri 03/05 2:23 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between ACME Bus Corp., Plaintiff, and Commack Union Free School District, Defendant, to Extend the Defendant's Time to Answer the Complaint Filed by ACME Bus Corp.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Thu 02/25 1:56 PM
Stipulation and Initial Pretrial Order by and between ACME Bus Corp. and Commack Union Free School District; Initial Disclosures shall be exchanged by March 17, 2021; The parties shall be permitted to serve discovery demands and discuss any potential objections to scope of the same, but shall not be compelled to respond pending further consideration of status by the parties and the Court at a further pre-trial conference scheduled in this matter for March 24, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Related [+]. Signed on 2/25/2021 (one)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto),6 Notice of Submission of Proposed Order filed by Plaintiff ACME Bus Corp.
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Wed 02/24 4:35 PM
Notice of Submission of Proposed Order Filed by ACME Bus Corp.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Wed 02/24 2:06 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Sean Southard, Lauren Kiss, Richard Hamburger, Neil BiBona, Mary Ann Sadowski, Cliff Katz, Brian Powers, Mark Rushfield, Brian Kantar, Christine Black, David Arntsen, Dennis O'Brien, Haley Trust, Marcus Monteiro, Mark Tulis, Michael Fishman, Michelle Feldman, Richard Artura, Robert Cohen, Robert Nosek, Ron Baumann, Ronald Friedman, Sara Temes, Sophia Perna-Plank, Wade Wilkinson & Christopher Shishko; Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/24/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY Related [+] (mtt)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Thursday, February 18, 2021
5 5 order Extending Time to File Answer Thu 02/18 10:00 AM
Stipulation and Order by and between ACME Bus Corp. and Commack Union Free School District Extending Time for Defendant Commack Union Free School District to File Answer. Answer Due 3/15/2021 Related [+]. Signed on 2/18/2021 (one)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Proposed Stipulation filed by Plaintiff ACME Bus Corp.
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
4 4 notice Notice of Proposed Stipulation Wed 02/17 1:49 PM
Notice of Proposed Stipulation By and Between ACME Bus Corp., Plaintiff, and Commack Union Free School District, Defendant, to Extend the Defendant's Time to Answer the Complaint Filed by ACME Bus Corp.. (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 01/27 3:26 PM
Summons Served on Commack Union Free School District 1/26/2021 . (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Tue 01/26 9:59 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against Commack Union Free School District Answer Due: 2/25/2021 Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/23/2021 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (one)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/25 3:46 PM
Adversary case 8 21-08012 Complaint by ACME Bus Corp. against Commack Union Free School District. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). (Kiss, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet