New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-00043
Case Filed:Jan 25, 2021
Terminated:Aug 09, 2023
Last checked: Friday Nov 26, 2021 6:53 AM EST
Defendant
Constantine Vases (1)
Represented By
David Kirby
David V. Kirby
contact info
Anastasios Sarikas
Law Offices Of Anastasios Sarikas
contact info
Frederick Lawrence Sosinsky
Law Offices Of Frederick L. Sosinsky
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Joshua G. Hafetz
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Edny
contact info
Claire S. Kedeshian
United States Attorneys Office
contact info
Jonathan Edgar Algor, IV
United States Attorney'S Office Eastern District Of New
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/10/2023 6:08 AM EDT
Monday, February 03, 2020
1 1 21 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT and affidavit in support of arrest warrants as to Abed Ahmad (1), Alaa Ahmad (2), Claudia Ayoub (3), Moustafa Ayoub (4), Constantine Vases (5). Signed by Judge Roanne Mann dtd 2/3/2020. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2020
7 7 2 pgs Order to Unseal Case as to Abed Ahmad, Alaa Ahmad, Claudia Ayoub, Moustafa Ayoub, Constantine Vases.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/4/2020. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann:Arraignment as to Constantine Vases on the Complaint held on 2/4/2020, Initial Appearance as to Constantine Vases held on 2/4/2020, (FTR Log #5;51-5;58, 7;06-7;21.) Attorney Appointment of CJA counsel David Kirby (for initial appearance ONLY) for the defendant present. AUSA Joshua Hafetz present. Clerk Josh Poulansky. Bond set at $400,000 on the consent of both parties. Defendant and suretor advised of bond obligations and signed bond. Defendant released. Time excluded till 3/3/2020. Defendant waived preliminary hearing. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Constantine Vases (5) $400,000 bond. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/4/2020. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs REDACTED $400,000 BOND as to Constantine Vases to18 1 - Sealed Document CR, Order Setting Conditions of Release (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Constantine Vases Time excluded from 2/4/20 until 3/3/2020.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/4/2020. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
21 21 CJA 20 as to Constantine Vases: Appointment of Attorney David Kirby for Constantine Vases FOR INITIAL APPEARNCE TRANSITION ONLY. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 2/4/2020. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
29 29 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Frederick Lawrence Sosinsky appearing for Constantine Vases (Sosinsky, Frederick) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 02, 2020
46 46 Consent MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Constantine Vases. (Sosinsky, Frederick) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 09, 2020
49 49 (Electronic) ORDER granting46 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Constantine Vases (5)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 3/9/2020. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2020
54 54 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Constantine Vases Time excluded from 3/16/20 until 4/17/20. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/16/2020. (Chin, Felix) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 09, 2020
56 56 Consent MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Alaa Ahmad as to Abed Ahmad, Alaa Ahmad, Claudia Ayoub, Moustafa Ayoub, Constantine Vases. (Lichtman, Jeffrey) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 16, 2020
62 62 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Constantine Vases Time excluded from 4/17/20 until 6/1/20. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 4/16/2020. (Chin, Felix) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2020
63 63 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Alaa Ahmad as to Abed Ahmad, Alaa Ahmad, Claudia Ayoub, Moustafa Ayoub, Constantine Vases. (Lichtman, Jeffrey) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 04, 2020
68 68 2 pgs ORDER granting63 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Abed Ahmad (1), Claudia Ayoub (3), Moustafa Ayoub (4), Constantine Vases (5)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/3/2020. (Chin, Felix) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
69 69 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Constantine Vases Time excluded from 6/2/20 until 7/31/20. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 6/4/2020. (Chin, Felix) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 20, 2020
72 72 Consent MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to Permit Travel by Constantine Vases. (Sosinsky, Frederick) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 23, 2020
73 73 ORDER granting72 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Constantine Vases (5)Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/23/2020. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2020
75 75 Consent MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Constantine Vases. (Sosinsky, Frederick) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
79 79 2 pgs ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Constantine Vases Time excluded from 7/31/20 until 9/1/20. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/30/2020. (Chin, Felix) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 04, 2020
ORDER granting75 Consent Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Constantine Vases (5).Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/4/2020. (Levy, Robert) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
83 83 2 pgs ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Constantine Vases Time excluded from 9/2/20 until 10/5/20. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/2/2020. (Chin, Felix) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 08, 2020
84 84 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anastasios Sarikas appearing for Constantine Vases (Sarikas, Anastasios) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
85 85 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anastasios Sarikas appearing for Constantine Vases Corrected Notice of Appearance (Sarikas, Anastasios) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 06, 2020
89 89 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Constantine Vases Time excluded from 10/6/20 until 11/9/20.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 10/6/2020. (Sica, Michele) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
93 93 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Constantine Vases Time excluded from 12/31/20 until 2/28/21. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/29/20. (Chin, Felix) [1:20-mj-00106-RLM]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE as to Constantine Vases. Reassigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano. Judge Edward R. Korman no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 1/25/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom as to Constantine Vases. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 1/25/2021. (Magnas, Talia)
Related: [-]
94 94 1 pgs NOTICE of Intent to proceed under FRCrP 7(b) as to Constantine Vases (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Information Sheet
95 95 Pursuant to Local Rule 50.3.2, the government hereby notifies the Court that the above-captioned case (U.S. v. Vases) is presumptively related to United States v. Moustafa Ayoub, No. 20-CR-142 (ENV) (U.S. v. Ayoub). (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]