Idaho District Court
Judge:David C Nye
Case #: 1:21-cv-00040
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2021
Terminated:Jun 30, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Jul 25, 2021 4:02 AM MDT
Defendant
Canyon County
Defendant
Canyon County Courthouse
Defendant
Canyon County Prosecuting Attorneys Office
Defendant
Canyon County Public Defenders Office
Defendant
Brian Crawforth
Defendant
CC.P.D. Robert Tom Curl
Defendant
Daniel Allen Ezell
Defendant
Justin Hambley
Defendant
Middleton Police Department
Defendant
Possibly Canyon County Sherriffs
Defendant
Andrew Sigueroa
Defendant
Tony Snider
Defendant
Bailey Wilson
Plaintiff
Cameron Morris
711 Jenkin Creek Rd
Weiser, ID 83672


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
6 6 order Judgment Wed 06/30 4:38 PM
JUDGMENT - In accordance with the Courts June 30, 2021 Order (Dkt.5 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that this case is DISMISSED WITHPREJUDICE and closed. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
5 5 14 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 06/30 4:37 PM
ORDER - Morriss Complaint (Dkt.3 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and this caseis CLOSED. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
4 4 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/16 6:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. IT IS ORDERED that Morriss Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Dkt.1 ) is GRANTED. Morris may pay the $402 filing fee, in installments, when and as he can afford to do so. Signed by Judge David C. Nye. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
3 3 2 pgs order Order of Conditional Filing Thu 01/28 7:09 AM
ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
2 2 cmp Complaint Wed 01/27 8:21 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cameron Morris.(kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint (2 of 3),
Att: 2 Complaint (3 of 3),
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 01/27 7:32 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cameron Morris. Responses due by 2/16/2021(kt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion & Affidavit for Fee Waiver