New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:21-cv-00762
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1442nr Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2021
Terminated:Oct 01, 2021
Last checked: Monday Jul 26, 2021 4:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Oriska Insurance Company
Defendant
Richard Schildron
Defendant
Berish Rubenstein
Defendant
Carolyn Robinson, Supervisor with the New York State Department of Labor,
Defendant
Lawrence Reichenberger
Defendant
Roberta Reardon as the Commissioner of the State of New York Department of Labor
Defendant
Rashbi Management, Inc.
Defendant
Pitterman Family Trust
Defendant
Robert J. Pines
Defendant
Bent Philipson
Defendant
Irwin Peckman
Defendant
Sam Schlesinger
Defendant
National Financial Services
Defendant
Isaac Muller
Defendant
Sharyn Mukamal
Defendant
Lipsius-Benhaim Law
Defendant
Ira Lipsius
Represented By
Ira S. Lipsius
Lipsius-Benhaim Law, LLP
contact info
Ira S Lipsius
Lipsius-Benhaim Law, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rich Levitan
Defendant
Chana Lerner
Defendant
Barry Leistner
Defendant
Martha Lees as General Counsel of the Department of Financial Services
Defendant
Benjamin Landa
Defendant
The Philipson Family Trust
Defendant
Israel Zeigelman
Defendant
Mark Zaffrin
Defendant
Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP
Defendant
Raphael A Weitzner
Defendant
Michael Weiss
Defendant
Sherman C. Vogel
Defendant
Jeffrey Vogel
Defendant
Stella M Vilardi
Defendant
The State University of New York
Defendant
The Schlesinger Family Trust
Defendant
Linda A Lacewell as Superintendent of Insurance of the State of New York Department of Financial Services
Defendant
C Kenneth Tesslar
Defendant
Lorraine Takesky
Defendant
Spencer Street Realty
Defendant
Henry Sirkis
Defendant
Henry Shayovitz
Defendant
Sentosacare, LLC
Defendant
Scott Dietrich and Peter Fountas of the Research Foundation of the State University of New York
Defendant
Michael Schweimmer
Defendant
Martin Schwartzman
Defendant
Broad Coverage Services, Inc.
Defendant
Martin Farbenblum
Defendant
Steven J. Eisman
Represented By
James Kernan
Kernan Professional Group
contact info
Defendant
Wolf Eisenbach
Defendant
Scott Einiger
Defendant
Dr. Merryl H. Tisch, Chairman of the State University of New York Board of Trustees
Defendant
Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York, in his official and individual capacities
Defendant
Cullen and Dykman LLP
Defendant
Michael Camilleri
Defendant
Richard Busell
Defendant
Steven Brown
Defendant
Martin Kass
Defendant
Berkshire Group, Inc.
Defendant
Howard Belford
Defendant
Bay Park Center For Nursing and Rehabilitation, LLC
Defendant
Paul Barbara
Defendant
Matthew Barbara
Defendant
Anthony J Bacchi
Defendant
Alexi Arias
Represented By
Joseph Vincent McBride
Rabin & Peckel L.L.P
contact info
James Kernan
Kernan Professional Group
contact info
Defendant
Allstate Administrators, Inc.
Defendant
Allstate ASO, Inc.
Defendant
Lori Fensterman
Defendant
Class Representatives of a Class of Employees of Employer Defendants as the interests of the Class may appear
Represented By
Joseph Vincent McBride
Rabin & Peckel L.L.P
contact info
James Kernan
Kernan Professional Group
contact info
Defendant
Allen Kass
Defendant
John Doe and other persons not yet identified
Defendant
Howard A. Zucker, M.D., as the Commissioner of the State of New York Department of Health
Defendant
Donna Hodge
Represented By
Joseph Vincent McBride
Rabin & Peckel L.L.P
contact info
James Kernan
Kernan Professional Group
contact info
Defendant
Annette Hall
Represented By
Joseph Vincent McBride
Rabin & Peckel L.L.P
contact info
James Kernan
Kernan Professional Group
contact info
Defendant
Steven Greenstein
Defendant
Eli Greenspan
Defendant
Joel Greeneberg
Defendant
Karen Grant Williams
Represented By
Joseph Vincent McBride
Rabin & Peckel L.L.P
contact info
James Kernan
Kernan Professional Group
contact info
Defendant
Grandview Brokerage, Inc.
Defendant
Patrick Formato
Defendant
Benjamin Fishoff
Defendant
Mayer Fischl
Defendant
Financial Service
Defendant
Samuel Ferrara
Defendant
Staci Fensterman
Defendant
Robert Fensterman
Defendant
Jordan Fensterman
Plaintiff
Oriska Corporation


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, October 01, 2021
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Fri 10/01 4:20 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Remand to State Court. On August 1, 2021, Plaintiff filed a motion to remand the case, supported by a Declaration that the action had become moot because the underlying state court action is in the process of being discontinued by Plaintiff pursuant to N.Y. C.P.L.R. § 3217. Dkt. No. 21. The Class Defendants have filed a letter agreeing that the removed actions are now moot and that they do not oppose the motion to remand the actions to state court for discontinuance. Dkt. No. 24. Because all parties agree that the case should be remanded, the request for a remand is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 21 and to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 10/1/2021) (va)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
24 24 respm Response to Motion Thu 09/16 12:39 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re:22 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge..(McBride, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2021
23 23 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 09/01 12:10 PM
DECLARATION of Frank Policelli in Support re:18 MOTION to Remand to State Court .,22 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Oriska Corporation..(Policelli, Frank)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Remand to State Court Wed 09/01 12:09 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Oriska Corporation..(Policelli, Frank)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Wed 09/01 11:57 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Frank Policelli to RE-FILE Document 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 31, 2021
21 21 misc Letter Tue 08/31 12:28 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Frank Policelli dated 08/31/2021 re: Ex. A to Doc. #20. Document filed by Oriska Corporation..(Policelli, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Judge Pantzer Decision - Ex. A to Doc. #20
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 08/31 10:35 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:18 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Oriska Corporation..(Policelli, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 26, 2021
19 19 4 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/26 5:20 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:18 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Ira Lipsius..(Lipsius, Ira)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Remand to State Court Thu 08/26 1:22 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Oriska Corporation..(Policelli, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
17 17 misc Letter Tue 06/01 6:18 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Alexander J. Sperber dated June 1, 2021 re: Developments in Related Actions. Document filed by Ira Lipsius..(Lipsius, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EDNY Dismissal Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Zanani Hearing Transcript
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Tue 06/01 1:38 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Joseph Vincent McBride to RE-FILE Document 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion are both found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
16 16 misc Letter Wed 05/26 11:01 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Joseph McBride re: PROPOSED SUMMONS. Document filed by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge..(McBride, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
15 15 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 05/11 3:42 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases . Document filed by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge..(McBride, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 #1 Attachment to Memorandum-JPML Motion,
Att: 4 #2 Attachment to Memorandum-Schedule of Actions,
Att: 5 #3 Attachment to Memorandum-Brief to Panel,
Att: 6 #4- Judge Libert Order
Friday, May 07, 2021
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/07 3:51 PM
NOTICE of PROPOSED SUMMONS re:1 Notice of Removal,,. Document filed by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge..(McBride, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 06, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/06 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Vincent McBride on behalf of Alexi Arias, Class Representatives of a Class of Employees of Employer Defendants as the interests of the Class may appear, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge..(McBride, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
12 12 misc Letter Mon 04/26 2:02 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Alexander J. Sperber dated April 26, 2021 re: Admission Status of Attorney Kernan. Document filed by Ira Lipsius..(Lipsius, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Correspondence from Attorney Services
11 11 misc Letter Mon 04/26 8:57 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from James M. Kernan, Esq. dated 04/26/2021 re: Object to Remand. Document filed by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge..(Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
10 10 misc Letter Thu 04/15 8:56 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from James M. Kernan, Esq. dated April 15, 2021 re: Clarify Decision in Related Action. Document filed by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge..(Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
9 9 misc Letter Wed 04/14 5:09 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from Alexander J. Sperber dated April 14, 2021 re: Decision in Related Action. Document filed by Ira Lipsius..(Lipsius, Ira)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/14 12:14 PM
ORDER: The Court has received the Moving Defendants motion to remand this case to state court. The removing parties are directed to inform the Court by April 20 at 5:00 p.m. whether they object to the motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 4/14/2021) (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/30 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Withdraw JPML Motion. Document filed by Alexi Arias, Karen Grant Williams, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge..(Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
6 6 respm Affirmation in Support of Motion Thu 03/11 2:32 PM
AFFIRMATION of Alexander J. Sperber in Support re:4 MOTION to Remand to State Court .. Document filed by Ira Lipsius..(Lipsius, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O
misc Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error Thu 03/11 6:53 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Ira S. Lipsius to RE-FILE Document 4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Affirmation in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
order Order Tue 03/09 7:16 PM
ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 12, 2021 is CANCELED. Counsel for Defendants is ordered to notify all counsel of the cancellation. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman) (Text Only Order) (mf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
5 5 26 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 03/01 7:41 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:4 MOTION to Remand to State Court . . Document filed by Ira Lipsius..(Lipsius, Ira)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Remand to State Court Mon 03/01 7:33 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court . Document filed by Ira Lipsius..(Lipsius, Ira)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Alexander J. Sperber,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M,
Att: 15 Exhibit N,
Att: 16 Exhibit O
Friday, February 12, 2021
3 3 1 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Fri 02/12 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference by TELEPHONE on March 12, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. Parties are directed to dial into the Court's teleconference number at 888-251-2909, Access Code 2123101, and follow the necessary prompts. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 3/12/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge Lewis J. Liman. (Signed by Judge Lewis J. Liman on 2/12/2021) (cf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Thu 01/28 5:48 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bronx County Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 2019-33547..Document filed by Karen Grant Williams, Alexi Arias, Annette Hall, Donna Hodge, Class Representatives of a Class of Employees of Employer Defendants as the interests of the Class may appear..(Kernan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Related Case Statement,
Att: 3 Baypark Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Whiteplains Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Throgs Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 NMC Amended Complaint,
Att: 7 Kingsbridge Amended Complaint,
Att: 8 Eastchester Amended Complaint
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 01/28 8:49 AM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bronx County Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 2019-33547. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-23725527).Document filed by Class Representatives of a Class of Employees of Employer Defendants as the interests of the Class may appear..(Kernan, James) Modified on 1/28/2021 (dnh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Related Case Statement,
Att: 3 Baypark Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Amended Complaint,
Att: 6 Amended Complaint,
Att: 7 Amended Complaint,
Att: 8 Amended Complaint
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Thu 01/28 3:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney James Kernan to RE-FILE re: Document No. 1 Notice of Removal,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; all of the parties listed in the pleading caption must be added to CM/ECF. Due to party modification, the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Thu 01/28 3:43 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Kernan. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Oriska Corporation, Bay Park Center for Nursing and Rehabilitation, Class Representatives of a Class of Employees of Employer Defendants as the interests of the Class may appear. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was omitted. (dnh)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Thu 01/28 3:45 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney James Kernan. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 01/28 3:47 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 01/28 3:47 PM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 01/28 3:48 PM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
Related: [-]
utility Add Party for Pleading Thu 01/28 5:41 PM
ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents The State University of New York, Stella M Vilardi, Rashbi Management, Inc., Patrick Formato, C Kenneth Tesslar, Jordan Fensterman, Anthony J Bacchi, Allstate Administrators, Inc., Donna Hodge, Scott Einiger, Chana Lerner, Roberta Reardon as the Commissioner of the State of New York Department of Labor, Dr. Merryl H. Tisch, Chairman of the State University of New York Board of Trustees, Mark Zaffrin, Cullen and Dykman LLP, Class Representatives of a Class of Employees of Employer Defendants as the interests of the Class may appear, Carolyn Robinson, Supervisor with the New York State Department of Labor,, Wolf Eisenbach, Lawrence Reichenberger, Richard Schildron, Lori Fensterman, Annette Hall, Scott Dietrich and Peter Fountas of the Research Foundation of the State University of New York, National Financial Services, The Schlesinger Family Trust, Mayer Fischl, Robert Fensterman, Jeffrey Vogel, Lorraine Takesky, Financial Service, Allstate ASO, Inc., Israel Zeigelman, Sentosacare, LLC, Howard A. Zucker, M.D., as the Commissioner of the State of New York Department of Health, Isaac Muller, Joel Greeneberg, Martin Farbenblum, Bent Philipson, Karen Grant Williams, Sherman C. Vogel, Benjamin Landa, Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York, in his official and individual capacities, Howard Belford, Barry Leistner, John Doe and other persons not yet identified, Sam Schlesinger, Broad Coverage Services, Inc., Henry Shayovitz, Matthew Barbara, Spencer Street Realty, Irwin Peckman, Martin Kass, Martin Schwartzman, Robert J. Pines, Oriska Insurance Company, Steven Greenstein, The Philipson Family Trust, Paul Barbara, Alexi Arias, Berkshire Group, Inc., Staci Fensterman, Eli Greenspan, Ira Lipsius, Samuel Ferrara, Lipsius-Benhaim Law, Michael Camilleri, Raphael A Weitzner, Steven Brown, Sharyn Mukamal, Allen Kass, Michael Weiss, Benjamin Fishoff, Berish Rubenstein, Linda A Lacewell as Superintendent of Insurance of the State of New York Department of Financial Services, Michael Schweimmer, Grandview Brokerage, Inc., Martha Lees as General Counsel of the Department of Financial Services, Pitterman Family Trust, Henry Sirkis, Rich Levitan, Richard Busell, Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP added. Party added pursuant to1 Notice of Removal,,.Document filed by The State University of New York, Stella M Vilardi, Rashbi Management, Inc., Patrick Formato, C Kenneth Tesslar, Jordan Fensterman, Anthony J Bacchi, Allstate Administrators, Inc., Donna Hodge, Scott Einiger, Chana Lerner, Roberta Reardon as the Commissioner of the State of New York Department of Labor, Dr. Merryl H. Tisch, Chairman of the State University of New York Board of Trustees, Mark Zaffrin, Cullen and Dykman LLP, Class Representatives of a Class of Employees of Employer Defendants as the interests of the Class may appear, Carolyn Robinson, Supervisor with the New York State Department of Labor,, Wolf Eisenbach, Lawrence Reichenberger, Richard Schildron, Lori Fensterman, Annette Hall, Scott Dietrich and Peter Fountas of the Research Foundation of the State University of New York, National Financial Services, The Schlesinger Family Trust, Mayer Fischl, Robert Fensterman, Jeffrey Vogel, Lorraine Takesky, Financial Service, Allstate ASO, Inc., Israel Zeigelman, Sentosacare, LLC, Howard A. Zucker, M.D., as the Commissioner of the State of New York Department of Health, Isaac Muller, Joel Greeneberg, Martin Farbenblum, Bent Philipson, Karen Grant Williams, Sherman C. Vogel, Benjamin Landa, Andrew M. Cuomo, Governor of the State of New York, in his official and individual capacities, Howard Belford, Barry Leistner, John Doe and other persons not yet identified, Sam Schlesinger, Broad Coverage Services, Inc., Henry Shayovitz, Matthew Barbara, Spencer Street Realty, Irwin Peckman, Martin Kass, Martin Schwartzman, Robert J. Pines, Oriska Insurance Company, Steven Greenstein, The Philipson Family Trust, Paul Barbara, Alexi Arias, Berkshire Group, Inc., Staci Fensterman, Eli Greenspan, Ira Lipsius, Samuel Ferrara, Lipsius-Benhaim Law, Michael Camilleri, Raphael A Weitzner, Steven Brown, Sharyn Mukamal, Allen Kass, Michael Weiss, Benjamin Fishoff, Berish Rubenstein, Linda A Lacewell as Superintendent of Insurance of the State of New York Department of Financial Services, Michael Schweimmer, Grandview Brokerage, Inc., Martha Lees as General Counsel of the Department of Financial Services, Pitterman Family Trust, Henry Sirkis, Rich Levitan, Richard Busell, Whiteman Osterman & Hanna, LLP. Related document:1 Notice of Removal,,..(Kernan, James)
Related: [-]