Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:21-cr-00129
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2021
Last checked: Friday Jan 29, 2021 1:27 AM CST
Defendant
Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner (2)
Represented By
Gregory D. Torres
Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Jose Aldair Yanez (1)
Represented By
Pablo Avila
Law Office Of Pablo Avila
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Holly Diane Pavlinski
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/29/2021 2:09 AM CST
Thursday, December 31, 2020
Arrest of Jose Aldair Yanez, Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 12/31/2020 as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner. (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner. (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner (2); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner (2).By Judge Victor R. Garcia. (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 12/31/2020 as to Jose Aldair Yanez. (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jose Aldair Yanez. (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Jose Aldair Yanez (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Jose Aldair Yanez (1).By Judge Victor R. Garcia. (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Jose Aldair Yanez, Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner. (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Jose Aldair Yanez. (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
3 3 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Victor R. Garcia as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner. (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
4 4 Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Video Initial Appearance as to Jose Aldair Yanez held on 1/5/2021 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/15/2021 11:00AM before Judge Collis White, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Jose Aldair Yanez (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - CLEVRIE.) (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
5 5 Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Video Initial Appearance as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner held on 1/5/2021 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 1/15/2021 11:00AM before Judge Collis White, Spanish Language Interpreter NOT required as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner (Court Reporter FTR GOLD - CLEVRIE.) (mcda) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 12, 2021
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Pablo Avila appearing for Jose Aldair Yanez . Attorney Pablo Avila added to party Jose Aldair Yanez(pty:dft) (Avila, Pablo) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 14, 2021
7 7 MOTION to Continue by Jose Aldair Yanez.(Avila, Pablo) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 ORDER GRANTING7 Motion to Continue as to Jose Aldair Yanez (1) Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 1/22/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia. Signed by Judge Collis White. (ccl) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
9 9 VIDEO Proceedings held before Judge Collis White:Attorney Status Hearing as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner held on 1/15/2021; Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 1/19/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Court Reporter FTR Gold MG Cienega.) (ccl) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner Gregory D. Torres for Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner appointed.. Signed by Judge Collis White. (ccl) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
11 11 VIDEO Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Pretrial Conference as to Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner held on 1/19/2021; Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing RESET for 2/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Victor R. Garcia. (Court Reporter FTR Gold J Mendoza.) (ccl) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 22, 2021
12 12 VIDEO Proceedings held before Judge Victor R. Garcia:Preliminary Hearing AND Detention Hearing as to Jose Aldair Yanez held on 1/22/2021; Probable Cause Found; Defendant Ordered DETAINED w/o Bond. (Court Reporter FTR Gold J Mendoza.) (ccl) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL: Bond set to NO BOND as to Jose Aldair Yanez. Signed by Judge Victor R. Garcia. (ccl) [2:21-mj-00021-VRG]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
14 14 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jose Aldair Yanez (1) count(s) 1, Steven Andrew Zachary Ebner (2) count(s) 1. (ls)
Related: [-] dacted Version