New York Southern District Court
Judge:Denise L Cote
Case #: 1:21-cv-00811
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2021
Terminated:Apr 27, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 31, 2021 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Abasic, S.L.
Represented By
Eric Roman
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Devon Austin Rettew
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
James H. Hulme
Arent Fox LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
605 Fifth Property Owner, LLC
Represented By
Jay B. Solomon
Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
136 136 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 08/29 1:35 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:113 Judgment on Attorney Fees,, entered In favor of 605 Fifth Property Owner, LLC Against Abasic, S.A. in the amount of $183,296.27. Judgment satisfied on 8/29/2023.. Document filed by 605 Fifth Property Owner, LLC..(nd)
Related: [-]
135 135 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 08/29 1:34 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:109 Judgment entered In favor of 605 Fifth Property Owner, LLC Against Abasic, S.A. in the amount of $2,637,543.92. Judgment satisfied on 8/29/2023. Document filed by 605 Fifth Property Owner, LLC..(nd)
Related: [-]
134 134 misc Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 08/29 1:05 PM
PROPOSED FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Satisfaction of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by 605 Fifth Property Owner, LLC..(Katz, Israel) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
133 133 misc Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Tue 08/29 1:03 PM
PROPOSED FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Satisfaction of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by 605 Fifth Property Owner, LLC..(Katz, Israel) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]