Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gene Ek Pratter
Case #: 2:21-cv-00418
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2021
Terminated:Sep 20, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 28, 2021 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
JULIAN M. ALGARIN
Represented By
MILTON VELEZ
Office Of The Solicitor
contact info
Defendant
COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By
MILTON VELEZ
Office Of The Solicitor
contact info
Defendant
MARTHA D'ORAZIO
Represented By
MILTON VELEZ
Office Of The Solicitor
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyra Izzard
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER R. BOOTH, JR.
The Booth Law Firm
contact info

GPO Nov 29 2021
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/29/2021. 11/29/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
GPO Nov 29 2021
ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/29/2021. 11/29/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
42 42 order Stipulation and Order Tue 09/27 4:34 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/23/2022. 9/27/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
41 41 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 09/20 4:23 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/20/2022. 9/20/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
40 40 minutes Telephone Conference Wed 09/14 2:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Telephone Conference held on 9/14/22 (amas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
39 39 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 09/13 4:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI Settlement Conference held on 9/13/22. (amas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
38 38 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 08/05 9:46 AM
ORDER THAT A TELEPHONE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 9/13/2022, AT 2:00 PM, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI, ETC. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI ON 8/4/22. 8/5/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
37 37 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Wed 07/06 11:48 AM
Order Referring Case to MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/5/2022. 7/6/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/14 10:42 AM
ORDER RE: THE PRETRIAL DEADLINES IN THE THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULEING ORDER26 INCLUDING THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ARE CONTINUED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THIS COURT. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/13/2022. 6/14/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
35 35 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 06/13 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion31 MOTION for Summary Judgment : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 9/22/2022 at 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 10B BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
34 34 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 06/08 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/13/2022 11:30 AM BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
33 33 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/07 11:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tyra Izzard.(BOOTH, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Response to Statement of Undisputed Material Facts,
Att: 2 Exhibit 14,
Att: 3 Exhibit 14
Thursday, June 02, 2022
32 32 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/02 11:39 AM
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF MUST FILE ANY RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT31 ON OR BEFORE JUNE 7, 2022. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 6/2/2022. 6/2/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2022
31 31 motion Summary Judgment Fri 05/13 8:33 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JULIAN M. ALGARIN, COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, PENNSYLVANIA, MARTHA D'ORAZIO.proposed order, motion for summary judgment with memorandum of law and certificate of service.(VELEZ, MILTON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
30 30 order Status Report Order Tue 03/29 1:44 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 4/15/2022.. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/29/2022. 3/29/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 08, 2022
29 29 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 03/08 9:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER IN PERSON Pretrial Conference held on 3/7/22. (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
28 28 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 02/16 10:36 AM
NOTICE RESCHEDULING Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/7/2022 AT 3:00 PM IN Chambers BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/24 3:01 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Complaint) with Affirmative Defenses by JULIAN M. ALGARIN, COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, PENNSYLVANIA, MARTHA D'ORAZIO.(VELEZ, MILTON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
26 26 order Scheduling Order Thu 01/06 10:51 AM
THIRD AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/22/2022 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. DISCOVERY DUE BY 2/25/2022. MOTIONS DUE BY 5/13/2022. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 5/13/2022. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/10/2022. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 6/17/2022. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 6/28/2022.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/6/2022. 1/6/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(Flaherty, Sue)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 01/06 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Hearing:A STATUS CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 3/2/2022 AT 10:00 AM IN Chambers BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(Flaherty, Sue)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 01/04 4:10 PM
ORDER granting22 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE. MR. IZZARD'S AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 1/4/2022.1/4/2022 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
23 23 respm Response to Motion Tue 01/04 2:00 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re22 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by JULIAN M. ALGARIN, COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, PENNSYLVANIA, MARTHA D'ORAZIO. (VELEZ, MILTON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
22 22 motion Leave to File Document Thu 12/23 11:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Tyra Izzard.Brief.(BOOTH, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief
Thursday, December 09, 2021
21 21 order Scheduling Order Fri 12/10 9:08 AM
SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER THAT ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE 1/28/2022. ALL PARTIES ARE TO PREPARE AND FILE WITH THE CLERK OF COURT THIER PRETRIAL MEMORANDA, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THIS ORDER AND LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 16.1(c) AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFF ON OR BEFORE 2/18/2022; DEFENDANT ON OR BEFORE 2/25/2022. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD WITH THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/2/2022, AT 10:00 AM IN CHAMBERS. THE CASE WILL BE PLACED ON THE COURT'S TRIAL POOL LIST ON 2/1/2022, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/9/21. 12/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/10 9:00 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF TYRA IZZARD MUST SEEK LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 12/23/2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 12/9/21. 12/10/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
19 19 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Mon 11/29 2:08 PM
ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/29/2021. 11/29/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
18 18 24 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Mon 11/29 2:05 PM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION RE: MOTION TO DISMISS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 11/29/2021. 11/29/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 22, 2021
17 17 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 11/22 1:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER Motion Hearing held on 11/19/21 re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JULIAN M. ALGARIN, MARTHA D'ORAZIO, COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, PENNSYLVANIA (amas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 01, 2021
16 16 notice Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing Mon 11/01 4:45 PM
NOTICE re: Cancellation of Hearing THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR NOVEMBER 9, 2021 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE IS CANCELLED.(dc)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Settlement Conference Mon 11/01 10:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE Settlement Conference VIA TELECONFERENCE held on 11/1/21. (JL )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 29, 2021
14 14 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 10/29 1:56 PM
*FILED IN ERROR* NOTICE RESCHEDULING Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 11/22/2021 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, ) Modified on 10/29/2021 (sfl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 26, 2021
13 13 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 10/26 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR NOVEMBER 9,, 2021 AT 9:30 AM BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE VIA TELECONFERENCE.(dc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
12 12 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Mon 10/25 1:54 PM
Order Referring Case to MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/25/2021. 10/25/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 10/05 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : ORAL ARGUMENT IS SET FOR 11/19/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN Courtroom 10B BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 21, 2021
10 10 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/21 1:02 PM
FIRST AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/18/2022 10:00 AM IN Judge's Chambers BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/15/2021. MOTIONS DUE BY 12/10/2021. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 12/10/2021. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/7/2022. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/14/2022. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 2/1/2022.. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/21/2021. 9/21/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 27, 2021
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/27 2:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/2/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN Chambers BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/10/2021. MOTIONS DUE BY 10/29/2021. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 10/29/2021. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/17/2021. DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/24/2021. TRIAL POOL IS SET FOR 12/7/2021.. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/27/2021. 5/27/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/10 11:31 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tyra Izzard.(BOOTH, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit - Case law
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order Tue 05/04 4:57 PM
ORDER RE: PARTIES SHALL SUBMIT A JOINT REPORT OF RULE 26(f) MEETING AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 5/4/2021. 5/4/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Supplement,
Att: 3 Supplement
Monday, April 19, 2021
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 04/19 3:12 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JULIAN M. ALGARIN, COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, PENNSYLVANIA, MARTHA D'ORAZIO.PROPOSED ORDER, TABLE OF CONTENTS, MEMORANDUM OF LAW, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(VELEZ, MILTON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Table of Contents,
Att: 2 Memorandum of Law
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/19 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MILTON VELEZ on behalf of JULIAN M. ALGARIN, COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, PENNSYLVANIA, MARTHA D'ORAZIO (VELEZ, MILTON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 25, 2021
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/25 4:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tyra Izzard. MARTHA D'ORAZIO waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (BOOTH, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/25 4:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tyra Izzard. JULIAN M. ALGARIN waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (BOOTH, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 02/25 4:43 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tyra Izzard. COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, PENNSYLVANIA waiver sent on 2/18/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (BOOTH, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 01/29 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14879050.), filed by Tyra Izzard.(BOOTH, CHRISTOPHER)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 01/29 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to JULIAN M. ALGARIN, COUNTY OF MONTGOMERY, PENNSYLVANIA, MARTHA D'ORAZIO. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 1/29/21 (bw, )
Related: [-]