Utah District Court
Judge:Jill N Parrish
Referred: Daphne A Oberg
Case #: 1:21-cv-00012
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Cause42:7413(b) Clean Air Act
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2021
Terminated:May 10, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 28, 2021 2:26 AM MDT
Defendant
Stericycle
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John K. Mangum
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
James D. Freeman
Us Department Of Justice (enr-Co)
contact info


Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Thursday, December 05, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/05 3:39 PM
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Termination. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 12/5/2024. (alf)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
11 11 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 10/25 9:16 AM
Stipulated MOTION Termination and Order re9 Judgment filed by Plaintiff USA. (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron J. Cutler on behalf of Stericycle (Cutler, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 10, 2021
9 9 order Judgment Mon 05/10 2:05 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT AND CONSENT DECREE. Case Closed. Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/10/21.(alf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Decree
Monday, April 19, 2021
8 8 motion Entry of Judgment Mon 04/19 5:06 PM
MOTION for Entry of Judgment and Memorandum in Support (Unopposed) to Enter Consent Decree filed by Plaintiff USA. (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Acknowledgment Mon 04/19 4:57 PM
NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order4 filed by Plaintiff USA (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Acknowledgment Fri 04/16 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Civil Standing Order4 filed by Plaintiff USA (Mangum, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 14, 2021
5 5 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 04/14 11:30 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/14/21. (ss)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
4 4 order Civil Standing Order Tue 04/13 5:13 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 4/13/21. (ss)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/29 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Lodging of Consent Decree by USA (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Decree
2 2 12 pgs cmp Complaint (Atty) Fri 01/29 11:17 AM
COMPLAINT against Stericycle No Filing Fee filed by USA. Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Freeman, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
1 1 1 pgs misc Remark - New Case Fri 01/29 10:52 AM
Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Plaintiff USA is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) by the end of the business day. Filing Fee waived (USA) NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh)
Related: [-]