Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Roderick C Young
Referred: Robert J Krask
Case #: 2:21-cv-00060
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 29, 2021
Terminated:Nov 08, 2021

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, September 23, 2022
33 33 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 10/11 11:50 AM
Partial Appeal Filing fee: $ 182.12, receipt number 34683054652 (tlev, )
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
32 32 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 09/19 4:30 PM
Partial Appeal Filing fee: $ 36.00, receipt number 24683052478 (tlev, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
31 31 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 06/29 10:54 AM
Partial Appeal Filing fee: $ 48.59, receipt number 24683051829 (tlev, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 17, 2022
29 29 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 06/17 8:58 AM
USCA Mandate re16 Notice of Appeal. The judgment entered May 26, 2022 takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. 21-7713 (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
30 30 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 06/21 11:37 AM
Partial Appeal Filing fee: $ 46.32, receipt number 24683051723 (tlev, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 26, 2022
28 28 appeal USCA Judgment Fri 05/27 9:18 AM
USCA JUDGMENT as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by Khalil J. Kimbrough. The judgment of the district court is affirmed. This judgment shall take effect upon issuance of the mandate in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 41. 21-7713 (jmey, )
Related: [-]
27 27 appeal USCA Opinion Fri 05/27 9:13 AM
Opinion of USCA (Copy) re16 Notice of Appeal. 21-7713 (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
26 26 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 05/02 10:56 AM
Partial Appeal Filing fee: $ 53.89, receipt number 24683051383 (tlev, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
25 25 misc Filing Fee Received Thu 03/24 1:16 PM
Partial Appeal Filing fee: $ 74.10, receipt number 24683051119 (tgam, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 28, 2022
24 24 misc Filing Fee Received Mon 02/28 4:32 PM
Partial Appeal Filing fee: $ 15.35, receipt number 24683050892 (tlev, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
23 23 misc Filing Fee Received Wed 02/23 12:17 PM
Partial Appeal Filing fee: $ 47.55, receipt number 24683050840 (tlev, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
22 22 appeal USCA Order Tue 02/08 3:17 PM
ORDER of USCA as to16 Notice of Appeal filed by Khalil J. Kimbrough. The court grants appellant leave to proceed without full prepayment of fees. 21-7713 (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
21 21 3 pgs order Order (send NEF to 4th Circuit) Wed 01/19 10:59 AM
ORDER. Plaintiff's Rule 59(e) Motion is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to re-file ECF No. 17 as Plaintiff's Complaint in a new civil action. Upon opening the new action, the Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff an Acknowledgment of Receipt form providing the case caption and case number for the new action. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 1/18/2022. Copies mailed 1/19/2022.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
20 20 appeal Appeal Remark Tue 01/11 10:31 AM
Appeal Remark re16 Notice of Appeal : Rule 45 Notice. Default(s) must be remedied by: 01/25/2022. 21-7713 (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
19 19 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 12/10 3:41 PM
USCA Case Number 21-7713 - Rickie Edwards, Case Manager for16 Notice of Appeal filed by Khalil J. Kimbrough. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 09, 2021
18 18 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA Thu 12/09 3:23 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re16 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (jmey, )
Related: [-]
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 12/09 3:23 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harold Clarke, Kevin Hudson, filed by Khalil J. Kimbrough.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
16 16 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 12/09 3:22 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to14 DISMISSAL ORDER by Khalil J. Kimbrough. Filing fee $ 0.00.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
appeal Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA Thu 12/09 3:24 PM
Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re16 Notice of Appeal. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 08, 2021
15 15 order Judgment - Clerk Mon 11/08 12:48 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 11/8/2021. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
14 14 order Dismissal Order (1983) Mon 11/08 12:47 PM
DISMISSAL ORDER. It is ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to resubmit the case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Dismissal Order to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/8/2021. Copies mailed 11/8/2021.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 05, 2021
13 13 3 pgs order Order Tue 10/05 4:39 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a Second Amended Complaint that complies with the instructions set forth in this Order within 14 days of the date of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 10/5/2021. (copy mailed 10/5/2021)(afar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 16, 2021
12 12 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Tue 09/21 8:17 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 07, 2021
11 11 misc Letter Wed 09/08 4:04 PM
Letter to Inmate Financial Accounts Officer. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 07/12 3:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Harold Clarke, Kevin Hudson, filed by Khalil J. Kimbrough.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, July 01, 2021
9 9 misc Mail Returned Thu 07/01 11:15 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Khalil J. Kimbrough @ Rappahannock Regional Jail, PO Box 3300 Stafford, VA 22555-3300. The Court's Order, dated 6/7/20, returned as undelivered. (epri, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Change of Address Thu 06/10 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Khalil J. Kimbrough.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
7 7 4 pgs order Order Mon 06/07 1:11 PM
ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for the appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 6/7/2021. Copies mailed 6/7/2021.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
6 6 misc Consent to Collection of Fees Tue 03/30 11:57 AM
Consent to Collection of Fees by Khalil J. Kimbrough. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
5 5 respoth Response Other Tue 03/30 11:57 AM
Response to4 Order filed by Khalil J. Kimbrough.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Monday, March 15, 2021
4 4 3 pgs order Order Mon 03/15 3:05 PM
ORDER. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he is ORDERED to either sign the enclosed consent to collection of fees form and RETURN IT TO THE COURT or to submit the full filing fee of $350.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order, a copy of the Consent to Collection of Fees form, and a copy of the document titled "Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint" to Plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 3/15/2021. Copies mailed 3/15/2021.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Collection of Fees and Selected Procedural Information for Prisoners Who Have Filed a Civil Rights Complaint
Friday, January 29, 2021
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 01/29 2:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Khalil J. Kimbrough. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Clerk's Office Acknowledgment of Receipt Fri 01/29 2:57 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt. (jmey, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Prisoner (1983) Fri 01/29 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT, Conditionally filed against Harold Clarke, Commonwealth of Virginia, Fredericksburg, VA, Kevin Hudson, King George, VA, Manager of Summit Food Services, Nurse Meade, Spotsyvania, VA, Staff of Rappahannock Regional Jail, Stafford, VA (Filing fee $ 0.00.), filed by Khalil J. Kimbrough.(jmey, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope