21
|
|
21
misc
Sealed Document Disposed
Wed 06/12 10:06 AM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 7 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 06/12/2024..(jus)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
misc
Sealed Document Disposed
Wed 06/12 10:04 AM
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 2 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 06/12/2024..(jus)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
misc
Sealed Document Attorney Notice to Retrieve
Wed 05/08 12:46 PM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 7 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 6/7/2024. .(jus)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
misc
Sealed Document Attorney Notice to Retrieve
Wed 05/08 12:08 PM
NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 2 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 6/7/2024. .(jus)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
order
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - Signed
Thu 04/22 5:47 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), and the United States of America having given its consent pursuant to 31 U.S.C. § 3730(b)(1), Plaintiff, Kumar Sreenivas Pandruvada and his counsel hereby give notice that the above-styled action is voluntarily dismissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/22/2021) (ks)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/22 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) 3I Infotech, Inc., JPMorgan. Document filed by Kumar Sreenivas Pandruvada. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Gross, John)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
misc
Letter
Thu 04/22 3:19 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from John J. Gross, Esq. dated April 22, 2021 re: Voluntary Dismissal. Document filed by Kumar Sreenivas Pandruvada..(Gross, John)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/22 3:14 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by Kumar Sreenivas Pandruvada. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Gross, John) Modified on 4/22/2021 (dt)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/22 3:36 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney John Gross. RE-FILE Document No. 14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Notice of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Notices - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (dt)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
1
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Fri 04/16 11:26 AM
ORDER: Accordingly, the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for April 22, 2021 is ADJOURNED to May 27, 2021 at 4:30 p.m. Plaintiffs shall file a letter updating the Court on the status of this case no later than April 23, 2021. Failure to do so may result in dismissal of the case as abandoned and/or for failure to prosecute. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 04:30 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/16/2021) (cf)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/12 10:58 AM
ORDER. In light of the COVID-19 situation, the Court will not hold the upcoming conference in this case in person. Counsel should submit their proposed case management plan and joint letter by the Thursday prior to the conference, as directed in the Court's earlier Scheduling Order. In their joint letter, the parties should also indicate whether they can do without a conference altogether. If so, the Court may enter a case management plan and scheduling order and the parties need not appear. If not, the Court will hold the initial conference by telephone, albeit perhaps at a different time. To that end, counsel should indicate in their joint letter dates and times during the week of the conference that they would be available for a telephone conference. In either case, counsel should review and comply with the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/12/21) (yv)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
3
pgs
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 02/01 5:07 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on April 22, 2021 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. All counsel are required to register promptly as filing users on ECF and to familiarize themselves with the SDNY ECF Rules & Instructions, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing. All counsel must also familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. Absent leave of Court obtained by letter-motion filed before the conference, all pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. The joint letter shall not exceed five (5) pages, and shall provide the following information in separate paragraphs: as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/22/2021 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/01/2021) (ama)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
order
Memo Endorsement
Mon 02/01 4:00 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF DECISION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/28/2020) (ama)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
misc
Note to Out of State Attorneys
Mon 02/01 2:39 PM
NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (laq)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
cmp
Complaint
Mon 02/01 12:24 PM
COMPLAINT against JPMorgan, 3I Infotech, Inc. Document filed by Kumar Sreenivas Pandruvada. (This document was previously filed under seal in envelope #2 and unsealed by docket entry #8 on 12/28/2020).(mro)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/29 3:24 PM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED THAT, 1. The complaint shall be unsealed thirty days after the entry of this Order and, in the event that the relator has not moved to dismiss the action, service upon the defendant by the relator is authorized as of that date. If the relator voluntarily dismisses the complaint pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within this thirty-day period, the relator may seek to modify this Order with the consent of the United States or by motion on notice to the United States. 2. All documents filed in this action prior to the entry of this Order shall remain under seal and not be made public, except for, thirty days after entry of this Order, relator's complaint, this Order, and the Government's Notice of Decision to Decline Intervention (the "Government's Notice of Decision"). The relator will serve upon the defendant this Order and the Government's Notice of Decision only after service of the complaint. 3. Upon the unsealing of the complaint, the seal shall be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. 4. The parties shall serve all pleadings, motions, and notices of appeal filed in this matter, including supporting memoranda, upon the United States. The United States may order any transcripts of depositions. The United States may seek to intervene with respect to the allegations in the relator's complaint, for good cause, at any time, or seek dismissal of this action. 5. all orders of this Court in this matter shall be sent to the United States by the relator. 6. Should the relator or the defendant propose that the complaint or any of its allegations be dismissed, settled, or otherwise discontinued, the party or parties proposing such relief must solicit the written consent of the United States before applying for Court approval. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/28/2020)(jus)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
ORDER, Case sealed. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 03/30/2017) (mps)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (mps)
Related: [-]
|