New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric N Vitaliano
Referred: Peggy Kuo
Case #: 1:21-cv-00520
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 01, 2021
Terminated:Mar 16, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Jul 31, 2021 4:58 AM EDT
Defendant
Aargon Collection Agency, Inc.
Plaintiff
Esty Katz
Represented By
David M. Barshay
Barshay, Rizzo & Lopez, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
7 7 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Wed 03/17 9:22 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: As per6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, this case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. So Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 3/16/2021. (Almonte, Giselle)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/15 9:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Esty Katz (Barshay, David)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 13, 2021
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 02/13 11:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Esty Katz. Aargon Collection Agency, Inc. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Barshay, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 02/01 10:43 AM
Summons Issued as to Aargon Collection Agency, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 02/01 10:41 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 02/01 10:41 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/01 10:09 AM
COMPLAINT against Aargon Collection Agency, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14078714 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Esty Katz. (Barshay, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/01 10:40 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric N. Vitaliano and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly)
Related: [-]