United States of America v. PCPLV LLC et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | James C Mahan |
Referred: | Daniel J Albregts |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-00184 |
Nature of Suit | 375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act |
Cause | 31:3729 False Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 02, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 01, 2021 2:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
AS Enterprises, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ivan Lee Goldsmith
|
|
Defendant
Robert Gomez
|
|
Defendant
Gomez & Associates, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Brandon Jimenez
|
|
Defendant
Rock'n Rob Enterprises
|
|
Defendant
Amir Shalev
|
|
Defendant
Cecilia Ventura
|
|
Defendant
Ofir Ventura
|
|
Defendant
PCPLV LLC
4431 S. Eastern Ave. Suite 2
Las Vegas, NV 89119 |
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
minord
Minute Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Mon 04/08 1:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan, on April 8, 2024. RE: Joint motion for stay pending settlement discussions (ECF No. 52 ) WHEREAS, on April 3, 2024, the court received a joint motion for stay pending settlement proceedings between plaintiff and defendants. (ECF No. 67 ). The parties represent that they have conferred and are in the process of completing a financial settlement. The parties believe they will be able to resolve this matter without continued litigation. In their motion, the parties request a stay of this matter until August 1, 2024, although they anticipate filing dismissal paperwork prior to this deadline. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' joint motion for stay pending settlement proceedings is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is STAYED until August 1, 2024. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
67 | 67
motion
Motion Stay Case or Discovery
Wed 04/03 9:48 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff United States of America. Responses due by 4/17/2024. (Johnson, Summer) |