Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney H Holmes
Case #: 4:21-cv-00137
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2021
Terminated:Apr 30, 2025
Last checked: Monday Aug 02, 2021 3:57 AM CDT
Defendant
Jeff Carson
St. Louis Medium Security Institution 7600 N. Hall Street
St. Louis, MO 63147
Represented By
Abby J. Duncan
contact info
Defendant
City of St. Louis
City Hall 1200 Market Street
Saint Louis, MO 63103
Represented By
Abby J. Duncan
contact info
Defendant
Charlene Deeken
Department of Public Safety 1200 Market St. Room 401
St. Louis, MO 63103
Represented By
Abby J. Duncan
contact info
Defendant
Dale Glass
Division of Corrections 200 S. Tucker Blvd. STE 2950
St. Louis, MO 63102
Represented By
Abby J. Duncan
contact info
Defendant
Michael Guzy
10 N. Tucker Blvd. - 8th Floor Civil Courts Bldg.
St. Louis, MO 63101
Represented By
Abby J. Duncan
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Jones
Represented By
Elad J. Gross
Elad Gross LLC
contact info
Mark R. Niemeyer
Niemeyer And Grebel
contact info
Patrick Anton Hamacher
Niemeyer And Grebel
contact info

GPO Nov 21 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's oral motion to dismiss, made at the November 17, 2022 hearing, is GRANTED. Counts II, III, VIII, IX, and X are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 20) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED to the extent that Counts XI, XII, and XIII are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants' Motion is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nannette A. Baker on 11/21/2022. (JEB)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
115 115 order A Docket Text Order Wed 04/30 11:43 AM
Docket Text ORDER Re:113 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Michael Jones; SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 4/30/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
114 114 order A Docket Text Order Wed 04/30 11:40 AM
Docket Text ORDER Re:112 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Michael Jones; SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 4/30/2025. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
113 113 misc Stipulation Tue 04/29 11:43 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Michael Jones. (Gross, Elad)
Related: [-]
112 112 misc Stipulation Tue 04/29 11:42 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Michael Jones. (Gross, Elad)
Related: [-]