Louisiana Western District Court
Case #: 1:21-mj-00001
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2021
Terminated:Jan 12, 2021
Last checked: Thursday Feb 04, 2021 1:17 AM CST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Mary J Mudrick
U S Attorneys Office (shv)
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Adebowale Ojo (1)
Terminated: 01/12/2021
Represented By
Aaron Albert Adams
Federal Public Defenders Office (laf)
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/04/2021 1:40 AM CST
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
ARREST (Rule 5(c)(2)) of Adebowale Ojo (1). (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
1 1 RULE 40 or 5(c)(3) Charging Documents Received from District of Maryland, their Case Number 20-mj-2900-CBD, as to Adebowale Ojo (1). (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 SEALED Arrest Warrant