New York Western District Court
Judge:Geoffrey W Crawford
Case #: 1:21-cv-00206
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 03, 2021 4:51 AM EDT
Cross Claimant
The City of Buffalo
Represented By
Maeve Eileen Huggins
City Of Buffalo Law Department
contact info
Cross Defendant
John Doe No. 8
Cross Defendant
Corporation X
Cross Defendant
Bail Shop, LLC
Represented By
Kevin Marc Habberfield
Black, Lyle & Habberfield LLP
contact info
Matthew Benjamin Weisberg
Weisberg Law
contact info
Cross Defendant
Agent D. White
Defendant
Agent D. White
Defendant
The City of Buffalo
Represented By
Maeve Eileen Huggins
City Of Buffalo Law Department
contact info
David M. Lee
Corporation Counsel
contact info
Defendant
Bail Shop, LLC
Represented By
Kevin Marc Habberfield
Black, Lyle & Habberfield LLP
contact info
Matthew Benjamin Weisberg
Weisberg Law
contact info
Defendant
John Does Nos. 1-7
Defendant
John Doe No. 8
Defendant
Corporation X
Plaintiff
Taylor M. Schmieder
Represented By
R. Anthony Rupp, III
Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf, Cunningham & Coppola LLC
contact info
Chad A. Davenport
Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jake M. Reinhardt
Represented By
R. Anthony Rupp, III
Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf, Cunningham & Coppola LLC
contact info
Chad A. Davenport
Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Krystyna Kimbrell
Represented By
R. Anthony Rupp, III
Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf, Cunningham & Coppola LLC
contact info
Chad A. Davenport
Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin R. Harrington
Represented By
R. Anthony Rupp, III
Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf, Cunningham & Coppola LLC
contact info
Chad A. Davenport
Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Casey E. Carminati
Represented By
R. Anthony Rupp, III
Rupp, Baase, Pfalzgraf, Cunningham & Coppola LLC
contact info
Chad A. Davenport
Rupp Baase Pfalzgraf Cunningham LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Cross Defendant
Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc.
Terminated: 07/06/2021
Represented By
Adam W. Perry
Hodgon Russ LLP
contact info
David A. Short
Hodgson Russ LLP
contact info
Defendant
Byron Lockwood
Terminated: 05/27/2021
Represented By
Maeve Eileen Huggins
City Of Buffalo Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Financial Casualty & Surety, Inc.
Terminated: 06/28/2021
Represented By
Adam W. Perry
Hodgon Russ LLP
contact info
David A. Short
Hodgson Russ LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
205 205 misc Letter Fri 05/16 6:15 PM
Letter filed by The City of Buffalo, Clayton Reed, Melissa Kurdziel, Jae S. Murphy, Spencer T. George, Roberto J. Torres, Colin Keenan, Devon Salter-Brown . (Lee, David)
Related: [-]