Delaware District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Hall
Case #: 1:21-cv-00149
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2021
Terminated:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 03, 2021 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Universal Robots A/S
Represented By
Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Christine Dealy Haynes
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
James M. Lyons
contact info
Christopher R. Noyes
contact info
Defendant
Universal Robots USA, Inc.
Represented By
Frederick L. Cottrell, III
Richards, Layton & Finger, PA
contact info
Christine Dealy Haynes
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
James M. Lyons
contact info
Christopher R. Noyes
contact info
Plaintiff
Northwestern University
Represented By
Jeremy A. Tigan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2022
MEMORANDUM ORDER DENYING Universal Robots A/S and Universal Robots USA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (C.A. No. 21-149, D.I. 21) and DENYING ABB Ltd. and ABB Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (C.A. No. 21-150, D.I. 22). Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 3/28/2022.(dlw)
GPO Oct 11 2022
ORDER ADOPTING 100 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED. Defendants' motion for leave to amend their answer to add an inequitable conduct affirmative defense is DENIED. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 10/11/2022. (dlw)
GPO Jan 22 2024
MEMORANDUM ORDER REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 1/22/2024. (dlw)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, November 14, 2024
386 386 misc - Transcript Thu 11/14 5:11 PM
Official Transcript of Trial held on 09-19-24 before Judge Hall. Court Reporter Stacy Ingram,Email: stacy_ingram@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2025. (Ingram, Stacy)
Related: [-]
385 385 misc - Transcript Thu 11/14 5:09 PM
Official Transcript of Trial held on 09-18-24 before Judge Hall. Court Reporter Stacy Ingram,Email: stacy_ingram@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2025. (Ingram, Stacy)
Related: [-]
384 384 misc - Transcript Thu 11/14 5:08 PM
Official Transcript of Trial held on 09-16-24 before Judge Hall. Court Reporter Stacy Ingram,Email: stacy_ingram@ded.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or order/purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/5/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/12/2025. (Ingram, Stacy)
Related: [-]