doe v. SWEARINGEN
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Hinkle |
Referred: | Michael J Frank |
Case #: | 4:21-cv-00085 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s) |
Case Filed: | Feb 04, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 03, 2021 4:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
RICHARD L SWEARINGEN
2331 Phillips Road
Tallahassee, FL 32308 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JANE DOE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
69 | 69
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/30 6:47 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re55 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by STEPHANIE ASHLEY HARPER. (SCHER, TODD) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Bassel Hatoum Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 FDLE Registration Notification Form, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Request for Production, Does v. Swearingen, No. 18-24145 CV-KMW (S.D. Fla.), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Chapter 119 Public Records Request E-Mail | ||
68 | 68
motion
Strike
Tue 05/30 4:50 PM
MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Impeachment Witnesses by MARK GLASS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/13/2023) . (BLUME, STACEY) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Rule 26 Disclosures | ||
67 | 67
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/30 4:34 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re54 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARK GLASS. (BLUME, STACEY) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit No File For - 2022CF005349AMB, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Waiver of Rights 2022-CF-000016-A-27 | ||
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
66 | 66
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/26 2:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re61 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Witness, Corrie McCue filed by STEPHANIE ASHLEY HARPER. (SCHER, TODD) |
|
65 | 65
motion
Strike
Fri 05/26 1:18 PM
MOTION to Strike60 Response to Motion by STEPHANIE ASHLEY HARPER. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/9/2023) . (SCHER, TODD) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
64 | 64
order
~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Order
Wed 05/24 10:47 AM
ORDER DELAYING THE PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. The summary-judgment hearing remains scheduled for 6/1/2023 . The motion to continue the remainder of the pretrial schedule, ECF No. 63 , is granted. The deadline for the attorney conference required by the order for pretrial conference is 6/5/2023 . The deadline for the pretrial stipulation and trial briefs is 6/20/2023 . The pretrial conference will be rescheduled by separate notice. The trial remains set for 7/17/2023 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. These deadlines and the trial date may be moved further upon submission of the pending summary-judgment motions. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 05/24/2023. (rcb) |
|
63 | 63
motion
Continue
Wed 05/24 9:51 AM
Joint MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference by STEPHANIE ASHLEY HARPER. (SCHER, TODD) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
utility
Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases
Tue 05/23 9:03 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re:44 Pretrial Order, Set/Reset Deadline (rcb) |