Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-00191
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2021
Terminated:May 02, 2022
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:20-cv-02297
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 04, 2021 5:06 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
ROBERT C BROCK
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By
ROBERT C BROCK
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Washington Dc
contact info
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Plaintiff
DEMARIO DODSON
Represented By
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
BRENT JACOBS
Terminated: 02/17/2021
Represented By
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
Plaintiff
RENARD MCCOY
Terminated: 02/17/2021
Represented By
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES OMEALLY
Terminated: 02/17/2021
Represented By
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
Plaintiff
JEREMIAH SAMMONS
Terminated: 02/17/2021
Represented By
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
Plaintiff
JESSE TALLON
Terminated: 02/17/2021
Represented By
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info
Plaintiff
WILLIAM WALKER
Terminated: 02/17/2021
Represented By
AMANDA MARIE WILLIAMS
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
DANIEL E GUSTAFSON
Gustafson Gluek Pllc - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
MATTHEW JAMES BARBER
Schwebel, Goetz & Sieben
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, May 02, 2022
24 24 27 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 05/05 3:13 PM
ORDER. The plaintiffs' cases identified on Exhibit A and Exhibit B are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to comply with Court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets only, and then to close the cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/2/2022. (erl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
23 23 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/09 4:57 PM
Short Form AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by DEMARIO DODSON. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
22 22 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/17 1:10 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 16 MULTI-PLAINTIFF ACTIONS. For multi-plaintiff actions in which no remand motion is currently pending, all plaintiffs, except for the first-named plaintiff, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, with the right to refile an individual short form complaint in the approved form, currently available on the master docket for the MDL at ECF No. 705. For short form complaints filed within 30 days of the date of the dismissal without prejudice pursuant to this Order, the filing date for the short form complaint will relate back to the filing date of the original multi- plaintiff complaint from which the individual plaintiff was severed. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/15/2019. JAMES OMEALLY, JEREMIAH SAMMONS, JESSE TALLON, WILLIAM WALKER, BRENT JACOBS and RENARD MCCOY terminated. (Plaintiff, DEMARIO DODSON Amended (Short Form) Complaint due to be filed in this case by 3/19/2021 . Severed Plaintiffs' to file Short Form Complaint (New Civil Action w/waived filing fee) due on or before 3/19/2021 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
21 21 misc Stipulation Tue 02/09 10:27 AM
STIPULATION re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Withdrawal of Motion by DEMARIO DODSON. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 05, 2021
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/05 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT C BROCK on behalf of 3M COMPANY, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC (BROCK, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Fri 02/05 10:54 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. Emailed notice to counsel for defendants, Jerry W. Blackwell, Benjamin W. Hulse and S. Jamal Faleel. (djb)
Related: [-]
18 18 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Fri 02/05 10:05 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-02297. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
17 17 4 pgs order Order Fri 02/05 6:18 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
16 16 REPLY re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Demario Dodson, Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker.(Gustafson, Daniel) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Tuesday, December 22, 2020
15 15 DECLARATION of Benjamin W. Hulse in Opposition to9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company.(Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits A-K
14 14 19 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC.(Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Wednesday, December 09, 2020
13 13 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Demario Dodson, Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker.(Gustafson, Daniel) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
12 12 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re9 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Demario Dodson, Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker.(Gustafson, Daniel) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
11 11 6 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Demario Dodson, Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker.(Gustafson, Daniel) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
10 10 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION9 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Date and time to be determined. (Gustafson, Daniel) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Demario Dodson, Brent Jacobs, Renard McCoy, James Omeally, Jeremiah Sammons, Jesse Tallon, William Walker. (Gustafson, Daniel) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 16, 2020
8 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (Hulse, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/17/2020 (MKB). [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 10, 2020
7 7 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Aearo Technologies LLC. (Rashid, Faris) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Aearo Technologies LLC re1 Notice of Removal (Rashid, Faris) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (MTP). [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
5 5 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Richard M. Paul III, Ashlea G. Schwarz as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-2297 JRT/KMM. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8206383) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/5/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet