Illinois Central District Court
Case #: 3:21-cr-30011
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Feb 06, 2021 1:38 AM CST
Defendant
Richard Miller (1)
Represented By
Rosana E Brown
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Harley Nelson (2)
Represented By
James E Elmore
Elmore & Reid
contact info
Defendant
Dartanyon Smith (3)
Represented By
Sara M Vig
Vig Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew Z Weir
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/14/2024 2:11 PM CST
Friday, January 22, 2021
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins as to Defendant 1. Initial Appearance set Monday, 1/25/2021, at 3:30 p.m. by telephonic conference before Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins. The Office of the Federal Public Defender is provisionally appointed to represent Defendant 1 until counsel is appointed or retained for the initial appearance. This provisional appointment is made to facilitate the preparation of a Pretrial Services Report by the U.S. Probation Office. The Clerk is directed to issue a telephonic writ for Defendant's participation. Counsel are directed to use the courtroom audio number of 571-353-2300, Call ID 338032881#, to join the call. Entered on 1/22/2021. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Richard Miller (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Harley Nelson (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs COMPLAINT as to Richard Miller (1), Harley Nelson (2), Dartanyon Smith (3). (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
2 2 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT - COMPLAINT - UNREDACTED (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
6 6 TELEPHONE WRIT issued for Defendant Miller as to 1/25/2021 Hearing. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 25, 2021
Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Initial Appearance as to Defendant 1 as to the Complaint held on 1/25/21 by phone. Matthew Weir present by phone on behalf on the Government. Defendant present in custody by phone. Assistant Federal Public Defender Rosanna Brown present by phone. Defendant advised of charges and acknowledges receipt of the Complaint. Defendant advised of rights, including right to counsel. Defendant sworn and questioned by the Court regarding his financial situation. Court finds Defendant qualifies for court-appointed counsel and appoints AFPD Rosana Brown. AFPD Brown present and accepts the appointment. Government states the statutory penalties. Government advised of obligations under Brady v. Maryland and advised of the possible consequences of violating such obligations. Clerk to enter written Order. Government seeks detention. On motion of the Government, the Court orders the Detention Hearing continued to 1/27/21 at 2:00PM in before Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins by video conference. All parties to appear by video. Clerk to enter an Order of Temporary Detention. The Defendant is remanded to the temporary custody of the U.S. Marshal pending the Detention Hearing. Hearing adjourned. (Tape #Sp-C 4:12 PM.) (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins as to Defendant 2. Initial Appearance set Tuesday, 1/26/2021, at 3:00 p.m. by video conference before Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins. Attorney James Elmore, a member of the Court's Criminal Justice Act (CJA) Appointment Panel, is provisionally appointed to represent the Defendant until counsel is appointed or retained for the initial appearance. This provisional appointment is made to facilitate the preparation of a Pretrial Services Report by the U.S. Probation Office. The Clerk is directed to issue a video writ for Defendant's participation. Counsel for the Government and Defendant should also appear by video. Video conference instructions for counsel are attached. Entered on 1/25/2021. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
7 7 ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 1/22/2021 as to Richard Miller. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
8 8 ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 1/22/2021 as to Harley Nelson. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
9 9 TEMPORARY ORDER OF DETENTION as to Richard Miller. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
10 10 1 pgs ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(F) as to Richard Miller. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 1/25/2021. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
12 12 VIDEO WRIT issued as to Harley Nelson regarding Initial Appearance set 1/26/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Schanzle-Haskins. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Initial Appearance as to Harley Nelson as to the Complaint held on 1/26/21 by video. Matthew Weir present by video on behalf on the Government. Defendant present in custody by video. Attorney Jay Elmore present by video. Defendant consents to hearing by video. Defendant advised of charges and acknowledges receipt of the Complaint. Defendant advised of rights, including right to counsel. Defendant sworn and questioned by the Court regarding her financial situation. Court finds Defendant qualifies for court-appointed counsel and appoints CJA Attorney Jay Elmore. Attorney Elmore present and accepts the appointment. Government states the statutory penalties. Government advised of obligations under Brady v. Maryland and advised of the possible consequences of violating such obligations. Clerk to enter written Order. Government seeks detention. Defendant's motion to continue the Detention Hearing is ALLOWED. Detention Hearing continued to 2/9/21 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins by video conference. All parties to appear by video. Clerk to enter an Order of Temporary Detention. Governments oral motion to unseal case documents pertaining to Defendant 2 ALLOWED. The Defendant is remanded to the temporary custody of the U.S. Marshal pending the Detention Hearing. Hearing adjourned. (Tape #Sp-C 3:01 PM.) (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
11 11 VIDEO WRIT issued as to Richard Miller regarding Detention Hearing 1/27/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Schanzle-Haskins. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
13 13 TEMPORARY ORDER OF DETENTION as to Harley Nelson. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 1/26/2021. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(F) as to Harley Nelson. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 1/26/2021. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Detention Hearing as to Richard Miller held on 1/27/2021 by video. AUSA Matt Weir present by video on behalf of the Government. Defendant in custody and present by video. AFPD Rosana Brown present by video on behalf of the Defendant. Government seeks detention. Parties proffers evidence. Defense calls witness. Witness sworn and questioned. Arguments heard. Defendant ordered detained. Government to prepare proposed Order of Detention. Defendant waives right to Preliminary Hearing. Court accepts waiver as knowing and voluntary. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Court adjourned (Tape #SP-C 2:06PM.) (SKN, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
15 15 VIDEO WRIT issued as to Harley Nelson regarding Detention Hearing 2/9/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Schanzle-Haskins. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
16 16 + + PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Richard Miller (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 28, 2021
Arrest of Dartanyon Smith. (SKN, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
17 17 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins as to Defendant 3. Initial Appearance set Friday, 1/29/2021, at 3:00 p.m. by video conference before Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins. Attorney Sara Vig, a member of the Court's Criminal Justice Act (CJA) Appointment Panel, is provisionally appointed to represent the Defendant until counsel is appointed or retained for the initial appearance. This provisional appointment is made to facilitate the preparation of a Pretrial Services Report by the U.S. Probation Office. The Clerk is directed to issue a video writ for Defendant's' participation. Counsel for the Government and Defendant should also appear by video. Video conference instructions for counsel are attached. Entered on 1/28/2021. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
18 18 TEXT ORDER by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins as to Defendant 3. Initial Appearance set Friday, 1/29/2021, at 3:00 p.m. by video conference before Magistrate Judge Schanzle-Haskins. Attorney Sara Vig, a member of the Court's Criminal Justice Act (CJA) Appointment Panel, is provisionally appointed to represent the Defendant until counsel is appointed or retained for the initial appearance. This provisional appointment is made to facilitate the preparation of a Pretrial Services Report by the U.S. Probation Office. The Clerk is directed to issue a video writ for Defendant's participation. Counsel for the Government and Defendant should also appear by video. Video conference instructions for counsel are attached. Entered on 1/28/2021. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
19 19 VIDEO WRIT issued as to Dantanyon Smith regarding Initial Appearance 1/29/2021 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Schanzle-Haskins. (ME, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Dartanyon Smith held on 1/29/21 by video. Matthew Weir present by video on behalf on the Government. Defendant in custody and present by video. Attorney Sara Vig present by video. Defendant consents to hearing by video. Defendant advised of charges and acknowledges receipt of the Complaint. Defendant advised of rights, including right to counsel. Defendant sworn and questioned by the Court regarding his financial situation. Court finds Defendant qualifies for court-appointed counsel and appoints CJA Attorney Sara Vig. Attorney Vig present by video and accepts the appointment. Government states the statutory penalties. Government advised of obligations under Brady v. Maryland and advised of the possible consequences of violating such obligations. Clerk to enter written Order. Government seeks detention. Government's motion to continue the Detention Hearing is ALLOWED. Detention Hearing continued to 2/2/21 at 3:00PM before Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins by video conference. All parties to appear by video. Clerk to enter an Order of Temporary Detention. The Defendant is remanded to the temporary custody of the U.S. Marshal pending the Detention Hearing. Hearing adjourned. (Tape #SP-C 3:01PM.) (SKN, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
21 21 TEMPORARY ORDER OF DETENTION as to Dartanyon Smith. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 01/29/2021. (SKN, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) as to Dartanyon Smith. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 01/29/2021. (SKN, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
23 23 VIDEO WRIT issued as to Dartanyon Smith Detention Hearing set for 2/2/21 at 3:00PM before Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Writ emailed to USMS. (SKN, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins: Detention Hearing as to Dartanyon Smith held on 2/2/2021 by video. AUSA Matt Weir present by video on behalf of the Government. Defendant in custody and present by video. Attorney Sara Vig present by video on behalf of the Defendant. Defendant consents to hearing by video. Government seeks detention. Parties proffer evidence. Arguments heard. Defendant ordered detained. Government to prepare proposed Order of Detention. Defendant waives right to Preliminary Hearing. Court accepts waiver as knowing and voluntary. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Court adjourned. (Tape #SP-C 3:01PM.) (SKN, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
24 24 + + PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Dartanyon Smith (Gustafson, Linnea) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
25 25 4 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Richard Miller. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER.) Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 2/3/2021. (GL, ilcd) [3:21-mj-03006-TSH]
Related: [-]
26 26 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to Richard Miller (1) count(s) 1, 2, Harley Nelson (2) count(s) 1, 2, Dartanyon Smith (3) count(s) 1, 2. (SKN, ilcd)
Related: [-]
27 27 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - ORIGINAL DOCUMENT INDICTMENT UNREDACTED (SKN, ilcd)
Related: [-]
28 28 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET- RICHARD MILLER (1). (SKN, ilcd)
Related: [-]
29 29 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET- HARLEY NELSON (2). (SKN, ilcd)
Related: [-]
30 30 +++ SEALED DOCUMENT - DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET- DARTANYON SMITH (3). (SKN, ilcd)
Related: [-]