Massachusetts District Court
Case #: 1:21-cr-10042
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Feb 06, 2021 2:33 AM EST
Defendant
Theresa Alves (1)
Represented By
Eric B. Tennen
Swomley & Tennen, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hailey Stringfield (2)
Represented By
Liam D. Scully
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Corey Steinberg
United States Attorney'S Office Ma
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/06/2021 3:21 AM EST
Monday, June 15, 2020
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Theresa Alves (1), Hailey Stringfield (2). (Alves-Baptista, Antonia). [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 JS45 Alves,
Att: 3 JS45 Stringfield
2 2 MOTION to Seal and Unseal Case as to Theresa Alves, Hailey Stringfield by USA. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
3 3 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting2 Motion to Seal and Unseal Case as to Theresa Alves (1), Hailey Stringfield (2) (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
4 4 Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley as to Theresa Alves, Hailey Stringfield. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
5 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Theresa Alves, Hailey Stringfield; Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley assigned to case. (Finn, Mary) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2020
Case unsealed as per #2 MOTION to Seal and Unseal Case as to Theresa Alves, Hailey Stringfield (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Hailey Stringfield (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Theresa Alves (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to Hailey Stringfield. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:www.forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public no tices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . Initial Appearance set for 6/16/2020 12:00 PM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
7 7 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to Theresa Alves. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible. Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:www.forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . Initial Appearance set for 6/16/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom 24 before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
8 8 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: Initial Appearance as to Hailey Stringfield held on 6/16/2020. Hearing held in open Court. All parties appear by video. Court has colloquy with defendant about whether or not she waives his presence in the courtroom for the hearing. Defendant waives her presences in the courtroom and the Court finds the waiver knowing and voluntary. Court goes over the proceedings and advises the defendant of her rights. Court has colloquy with defendant about whether or not she understands her rights and whether or not she understands the pending charges. Court appoints attorney Scully to represent the defendant subject to review of financial affidavit. Government states charges and maximum penalties and agrees to conditions of release. Court orders the defendant released. Court goes over the conditions with the defendant and has a colloquy about whether or not she understands the conditions. (Attorneys present: Corey Steinberg for the government, Liam Scully for defendant and Luciana Sousa for Probation. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: James Gibbons at jamesgibbonsrpr@gmail.com. (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
9 9 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: Initial Appearance as to Theresa Alves held on 6/16/2020.Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: Initial Appearance as to Hailey Stringfield held on 6/16/2020. Hearing held in open Court. All parties appear by video. Court has colloquy with defendant about whether or not she waives her presence in the courtroom for the hearing. Defendant waives her presences in the courtroom and the Court finds the waiver knowing and voluntary. Court goes over the proceedings and advises the defendant of her rights. Court has colloquy with defendant about whether or not she understands her rights and whether or not she understands the pending charges. Defendant submits a financial affidavit and the Court appoints attorney Tennan to represent her. Government states charges and maximum penalties and agrees to conditions of release. Court orders the defendant released. Court goes over the conditions with the defendant and has a colloquy about whether or not she understands the conditions. (Attorneys present: Corey Steinberg for the government, Eric Tennan for defendant and Erin Hennemann for Probation. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: James Gibbons at jamesgibbonsrpr@gmail.com. (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
10 10 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Theresa Alves. (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
11 11 Unsecured Appereance Bond Entered as to Theresa Alves in amount of $ 10,000. (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
12 12 Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Hailey Stringfield. (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
13 13 Unsecured Appereance Bond Entered as to Hailey Stringfield in amount of $ 10,000. (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 23, 2020
14 14 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 6/16/2020 as to Theresa Alves. (Belmont, Kellyann) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
15 15 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Theresa Alves, Hailey Stringfield. Time excluded from July 16, 2020 until September 19, 2020. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(b) and 18 USC 3161(h)(7) Extension of time to return indictment. (See order allowing motion for extension of time in 20-mc-91325-PBS.) (Lara, Miguel) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 15, 2020
16 16 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Theresa Alves, Hailey Stringfield. Time excluded from 9/19/2020 until 10/21/2020. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(b) and 18 USC 3161(h)(7) Extension of time to return indictment. (See order allowing motion for extension of time in 20-mc-91325-PBS.) (Baker, Casey) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 09, 2020
17 17 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Theresa Alves, Hailey Stringfield. Time excluded from 10/21/2020 until 12/21/2020. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(b) and 18 USC 3161(h)(7) Extension of time to return indictment. (See order allowing motion for extension of time in 20-mc-91325-PBS.) (Baker, Casey) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 19, 2020
18 18 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER entered. ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Theresa Alves, Hailey Stringfield. Time excluded from 12/21/2020 until 1/21/2021. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(b) and 18 USC 3161(h)(7) Extension of time to return indictment. (See order allowing motion for extension of time in 20-mc-91325-PBS) (Baker, Casey) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 15, 2021
19 19 Judge Patti B. Saris: ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY entered as to Theresa Alves, Hailey Stringfield. Time excluded from 1/21/2021 until 3/4/2021. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Baker, Casey) [1:20-mj-06384-MPK]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 04, 2021
20 20 INFORMATION (Felony) as to Theresa Alves (1) count(s) 1, Hailey Stringfield (2) count(s) 1.(Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 JS45 Alves,
Att: 2 JS45 Stringfield
21 21 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Theresa Alves, Hailey Stringfield; Chief Judge F. Dennis Saylor, IV assigned to case. (Finn, Mary)
Related: [-]