Bernal Villatoro et al v. CTS & Associates, Inc. et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Deborah K Chasanow |
Case #: | 8:14-cv-01978 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2016 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 18, 2014 3:23 AM EST |
Defendant
CTS & Associates, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dana M. Purkey
|
|
Plaintiff
Elvis A. Bernal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas J. Bernal De La O
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Erick Joevanny Bernal De La O
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Will Miguel Bernal De La O
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilfrido Bernal Villatoro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carlos Mauricio Chicas Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bladimir Alexander Pichinte Ardon
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 04, 2016 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Wed 05/04 2:37 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART10 supplemental motion for default judgment and for attorneys' fees and costs, ENTERING judgment in favor of Plaintiffs and against Defendants CTS & Associates, Inc. and Dana Purkey, jointly and severally, in the amount of $176,031.60 plus $14,380.00 for attorneys' fees, and $450.00 for costs, and DIRECTING the Clerk to close this case (c/m to Defendants 5/4/16 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/4/2016. (sat, Chambers) |
|
11 | 11
12
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Wed 05/04 2:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION (c/m to Defendants 5/4/16 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/4/2016. (sat, Chambers) |
|
Friday, November 06, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default - Judgment
Fri 11/06 5:02 PM
Supplemental MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by Elvis A. Bernal, Douglas J. Bernal De La O, Erick Joevanny Bernal De La O, Will Miguel Bernal De La O, Wilfrido Bernal Villatoro, Carlos Mauricio Chicas Rivera, Bladimir Alexander Pichinte Ardon Responses due by 11/23/2015(Lombardo, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G | ||
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 10/23 3:40 PM
ORDER DENYING7 motion for default judgment without prejudice to renewal within 14 days (c/m to Defendants 10/23/15 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/23/2015. (sat, Chambers) |
|
8 | 8
8
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Fri 10/23 3:38 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION (c/m to Defendants 10/23/15 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 10/23/2015. (sat, Chambers) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Default - Judgment
Thu 03/26 4:30 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by Elvis A. Bernal, Douglas J. Bernal De La O, Erick Joevanny Bernal De La O, Will Miguel Bernal De La O, Wilfrido Bernal Villatoro, Carlos Mauricio Chicas Rivera, Bladimir Alexander Pichinte Ardon Responses due by 4/13/2015(Lombardo, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 17, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CTS & Associates, Inc. and Dana M. Purkey (c/m to Defendants 9/17/2014 td) (td, Deputy Clerk) | |
Monday, August 11, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Elvis A. Bernal, Douglas J. Bernal De La O, Erick Joevanny Bernal De La O, Will Miguel Bernal De La O, Wilfrido Bernal Villatoro, Carlos Mauricio Chicas Rivera, Bladimir Alexander Pichinte Ardon Responses due by 8/28/2014 (Lombardo, Mary) | |
Monday, June 30, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Mauricio Chicas Rivera, Will Miguel Bernal De La O, Bladimir Alexander Pichinte Ardon, Erick Joevanny Bernal De La O, Wilfrido Bernal Villatoro, Douglas J. Bernal De La O, Elvis A. Bernal. Dana M. Purkey served on 6/27/2014, answer due 7/18/2014. (Lombardo, Mary) | |
3 | 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Mauricio Chicas Rivera, Will Miguel Bernal De La O, Bladimir Alexander Pichinte Ardon, Erick Joevanny Bernal De La O, Wilfrido Bernal Villatoro, Douglas J. Bernal De La O, Elvis A. Bernal. CTS & Associates, Inc. served on 6/27/2014, answer due 7/18/2014. (Lombardo, Mary) | |
Wednesday, June 25, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to CTS & Associates, Inc., Dana M. Purkey.(aos, Deputy Clerk) | |
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Wednesday, June 18, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-4809696.), filed by Carlos Mauricio Chicas Rivera, Will Miguel Bernal De La O, Bladimir Alexander Pichinte Ardon, Erick Joevanny Bernal De La O, Wilfrido Bernal Villatoro, Douglas J. Bernal De La O, Elvis A. Bernal.(Lombardo, Mary) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons to CTS & Associates, | ||
Att: 3 Summons to Dana Purkey | ||
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (rss, Deputy Clerk) |