Mighty Men of God, Inc. v. World Outreach Church of Murfreesboro Tennessee, Incorporated et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Thomas B Smith |
Case #: | 6:14-cv-00947 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2015 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 19, 2015 4:05 PM EST |
Defendant
Angus Buchan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Intend Ministries
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G. Allen Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Phillip Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
World Outreach Church of Murfreesboro Tennessee, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mighty Men of God, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, November 02, 2015 | ||
37 | 37
![]() Tradmark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (SWT) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, October 26, 2015 | ||
36 | 36
![]() ORDER dismissing case with prejudice subject to the right of any party, within sixty days from the date of this Order, to move the Court to enter a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or, on good cause shown, to reopen the case for further proceedings. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this file - re 35 Notice of settlement. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 10/26/2015. (DJD) |
|
Thursday, October 22, 2015 | ||
35 | 35
![]() NOTICE of settlement Joint by Intend Ministries, G. Allen Jackson, Phillip Jackson, World Outreach Church of Murfreesboro Tennessee, Incorporated (Pietsch, Matthew) |
|
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
34 | 34
![]() REPLY to 33 Counterclaim by Mighty Men of God, Inc.. Related document: 33 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim filed by Intend Ministries, G. Allen Jackson, World Outreach Church of Murfreesboro Tennessee, Incorporated, Phillip Jackson.(Byrd, Tucker) |
|
Monday, April 20, 2015 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Mighty Men of God, Inc. by World Outreach Church of Murfreesboro Tennessee, Incorporated, Phillip Jackson, Intend Ministries, G. Allen Jackson.(Fernandez, Raquel) |
|
Monday, April 06, 2015 | ||
32 | 32
![]() ORDER denying 22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 4/6/2015. (KMS) |
|
Monday, December 01, 2014 | ||
31 | 31
![]() RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Mighty Men of God, Inc..(Byrd, Tucker) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Monday, September 29, 2014 | ||
30 | 30 CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (LMM) | |
Friday, September 26, 2014 | ||
29 | 29
![]() |
|
Set/reset deadlines as to22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction . Responses due by 12/1/2014 (LMM) | ||
Thursday, September 25, 2014 | ||
28 | 28
![]() |
|
Friday, September 19, 2014 | ||
27 | 27
![]() |
|
26 | 26
![]() |
|
Thursday, September 11, 2014 | ||
25 | 25
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 10, 2014 | ||
24 | 24
![]() |
|
Friday, September 05, 2014 | ||
23 | 23
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
22 | 22
![]() |
|
Wednesday, September 03, 2014 | ||
21 | 21
![]() |
|
20 | 20
![]() |
|
Thursday, August 14, 2014 | ||
19 | 19
![]() |
|
18 | 18
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 13, 2014 | ||
17 | 17
![]() |
|
Tuesday, August 12, 2014 | ||
16 | 16
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
Friday, August 08, 2014 | ||
Set/reset deadlines/hearings: Answer due by 9/5/2014. (LMM) | ||
Thursday, August 07, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
Wednesday, August 06, 2014 | ||
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Friday, July 11, 2014 | ||
12 | 12
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
10 | 10
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |
|
8 | 8
![]() |
|
Monday, July 07, 2014 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Wednesday, July 02, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza. New case number: 6:14-cv-947-Orl-41-TBS. Judge John Antoon II no longer assigned to the case. (SC) | |
Tuesday, June 24, 2014 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Wednesday, June 18, 2014 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |