Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Tilman E Self, III
Referred: Charles H Weigle
Case #: 5:21-cv-00049
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2021
Terminated:Sep 03, 2021
Defendant
GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC & CLASSIFICATION PRISON
Plaintiff
JONATHAN DAVIS

GPO Sep 03 2021
JUDGMENT (tam)

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, September 03, 2021
7 7 order Judgment Fri 09/03 3:53 PM
JUDGMENT (tam)
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 09/03 11:02 AM
ORDER adopting5 Report and Recommendation and dismissing Plaintiff's1 Complaint without prejudice. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E. SELF, III on 9/3/2021. (ech)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 11, 2021
5 5 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 08/11 9:15 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice. re1 Complaint filed by JONATHAN DAVIS Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 8/11/2021. (tam)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 02, 2021
4 4 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 07/02 10:12 AM
ORDER TO RESPOND AND SHOW CAUSE. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 7/2/2021. (tam)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 14, 2021
3 3 3 pgs order Order Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint Fri 05/14 10:31 AM
ORDER Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit a proper motion to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee, which should include a certified copy of his trust fund account statement. (), ORDER to Recast Complaint. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 5/14/2021. (tam)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
2 2 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 02/08 2:51 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/08 2:49 PM
COMPLAINT against GEORGIA DIAGNOSTIC & CLASSIFICATION PRISON,filed by JONATHAN DAVIS.(vs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope