New Jersey District Court
Judge:Kevin Mcnulty
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:21-cv-02114
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Medical Malpractice
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2021
Terminated:Jul 19, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 07, 2021 5:04 AM EDT
Defendant
ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER II
99 Mulford Road
Lafayette Township, NJ 07848
Represented By
MALINDA A. MILLER
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-10
Defendant
HEALTHCARE SERVICE GROUP
Defendant
ALTITUDE INVESTMENTS LTD
Defendant
ALTITUDE HEALTH SERVICES INC.
Defendant
ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE
Represented By
MALINDA A. MILLER
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
CHAIM SCHEINBAUM
Represented By
MALINDA A. MILLER
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
LOUIS SCHWARTZ
Represented By
MALINDA A. MILLER
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER I
Represented By
MALINDA A. MILLER
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Defendant
ABC AND XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF DALE PETRY
Represented By
DANIEL GERARD PETOIA MARCHESE
The Marchese Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER PETRY
Represented By
DANIEL GERARD PETOIA MARCHESE
The Marchese Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ESTATE OF JOSEPH MAGLIOLI
Represented By
DANIEL GERARD PETOIA MARCHESE
The Marchese Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DANTE MAGLIOLI
Represented By
DANIEL GERARD PETOIA MARCHESE
The Marchese Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
BERNARD MAGLIOLI
Represented By
DANIEL GERARD PETOIA MARCHESE
The Marchese Law Firm, LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 18 2021
OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/18/2021. (ams, )

Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
28 28 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 07/19 11:02 AM
LETTER ORDER administratively terminating this matter. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 7/19/2023. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
27 27 misc Letter Tue 07/18 3:16 PM
Letter from counsel regarding status. (MILLER, MALINDA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
26 26 order Order Tue 06/27 2:48 PM
TEXT ORDER directing the parties to submit a joint status letter by 7/12/2023. So Ordered by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/27/2023. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/10 4:20 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte. Magistrate Judge James B. Clark no longer assigned to the case. (sbg, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Thu 07/29 10:58 AM
LETTER ORDER that Plaintiffs'7 Motion to Remand is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 7/29/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 18, 2021
24 24 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 06/21 11:14 AM
ORDER that Defendants'20 Motion to Stay Plaintiffs'7 Remand Motion pending the outcome of Defendants' appeal is GRANTED, etc. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/18/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
23 23 14 pgs order Opinion Mon 06/21 11:12 AM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 6/18/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
22 22 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 06/14 6:00 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER I, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ re20 MOTION to Stay (MILLER, MALINDA)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 07, 2021
21 21 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 06/07 7:52 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re20 MOTION to Stay (MARCHESE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 06/01 9:49 AM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Stay . Motion set for 6/21/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2021
20 20 motion Stay Fri 05/28 12:39 PM
MOTION to Stay by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER I, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ.(MILLER, MALINDA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 21, 2021
19 19 order Order Fri 05/21 10:53 AM
TEXT ORDER: Defendants are authorized to file a motion to stay. No view on the merits of the motion is expressed. The motion shall initially address this court's jurisdiction to act while the appeal is pending. So Ordered by Judge Kevin McNulty on 5/21/2021. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 20, 2021
18 18 misc Letter Thu 05/20 9:50 PM
Letter from Daniel G.P. Marchese, Esq. opposing Defendants' request for a stay or to move for a stay. (MARCHESE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Letter Thu 05/20 7:34 PM
Letter from Defendants requesting stay. (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 20, 2021
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/20 10:54 AM
LETTER ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled in this matter for 4/27/2021 is adjourned. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 4/20/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
15 15 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Fri 04/16 10:39 AM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re7 MOTION to Remand (MARCHESE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 09, 2021
14 14 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/09 6:22 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER I, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ re7 MOTION to Remand (MILLER, MALINDA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certifications Combined,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - AO 21-01,
Att: 4 Exhibit D- Statement of Interest
Monday, April 05, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order Mon 04/05 10:43 AM
ORDER granting12 Letter requesting extension of time to file opposition and reply briefs. Signed by Judge Kevin McNulty on 4/5/2021. (ams, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 01, 2021
12 12 misc Letter Thu 04/01 11:30 AM
Letter from Defendants regarding extension request for opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand. (MILLER, MALINDA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/15 5:28 PM
Resetting Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Remand . Motion reset for 4/19/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Opposition due 4/5/2021. Reply due 4/12/2021. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nic, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
11 11 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Fri 03/12 10:35 AM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER I, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ re7 MOTION to Remand (MILLER, MALINDA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 10, 2021
10 10 misc Proposed Order Wed 03/10 1:56 PM
Proposed Order text by All Plaintiffs re7 MOTION to Remand . (MARCHESE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/10 12:21 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct8 MOTION to Amend/Correct7 MOTION to Remand brief statement of facts ,7 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (MARCHESE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/10 12:02 PM
Exhibit to Document - Corrected Brief re7 MOTION to Remand brief statement of facts by All Plaintiffs. (MARCHESE, DANIEL) Modified on 3/10/2021 (ams, )
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Remand to State Court Wed 03/10 11:54 AM
MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs.(MARCHESE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
misc QC - Generic Message Wed 03/10 12:57 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Per Counsel, please disregard the Motions filed at D.E.'s6 ,8 and9 as they were filed incorrectly. D.E.8 has been edited to reflect that it is the corrected Brief for D.E.7 Motion to Remand. In the future, to file corrected documents, please use the event "Exhibit to Document" found under Other Documents. This message is for informational purposes only. (ams, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/10 12:58 PM
Set Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Kevin McNulty. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, )
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Wed 03/10 1:14 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Text of Proposed Order filed at D.E.7 by Daniel Marchese contains the incorrect case number. Please refile using the event "Proposed Order" found under Other Documents and link it to D.E.7 . (ams, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
6 6 motion Remand to State Court Tue 03/09 10:30 PM
MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs.(MARCHESE, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, February 22, 2021
5 5 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 02/22 12:50 PM
LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 2/22/2021. (seb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 19, 2021
4 4 19 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/19 11:51 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by ALLIANCE HEALTHCARE, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER I, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ.(MILLER, MALINDA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 02/09 9:05 AM
Case assigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (jr)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 02/08 5:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER I, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ. (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 02/08 5:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER I, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ. (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/08 5:32 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER I, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER II, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, case number SSX-L-000176-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12099338), filed by ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER I, ANDOVER SUBACUTE REHABILITATION CENTER II, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM.(MARTINO, SALVATORE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 18 pgs Exhibit A - Initial Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - First Amended Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Second Amended Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Docket Report,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Statement of Interest,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Certifications Combined,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Supplement Supplement to CIS,
Att: 9 Notice to Federal Court re State Removal