Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:20-bk-81339

Nebraska Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brian S Kruse
Case #: 8:21-ap-08004
Nature of Suit64 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(15), divorce or separation obligation (other than domestic support)
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2021
Terminated:Jun 16, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
Blake A. Rife
88962 532 Avenue
Niobrara, NE 68760
Represented By
Blake A. Rife
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner
Represented By
Sarah J Applegate
Baird Holm LLP
contact info
Brandon R. Tomjack
Baird Holm LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, June 16, 2021
15 15 appeal Acknowledgment of Appeal - DC Wed 06/16 3:52 PM
Acknowledgment of Appeal from District Court. Appeal Unassigned. Case Number: 8:21-mc-00160-UNA. Related [+]. (nmw)
Related: [-] 14 Transmittal of Record to District Court
14 14 appeal Transmittal of Record to District Court Wed 06/16 7:49 AM
Transmittal of Record to District Court Related [+]. (nmw)
Related: [-] 11 Judgment
court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/16 12:51 PM
Adversary Case Closed 21-08004 BSK Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner v. Rife DEFAULT JUDGMENT entered on 6/1/21 . (nmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 06/03 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 06/03/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Court's Certificate of Mailing
Tuesday, June 01, 2021
12 12 court Courts Certificate Of Mailing Tue 06/01 2:50 PM
Court's Certificate of Mailing to Debtor/Defendant Related [+]. (law)
Related: [-] 10 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,11 Judgment
11 11 order Judgment Tue 06/01 2:48 PM
Judgment Related [+]. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion is granted, and default judgment is hereby entered in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendant; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the debts Defendant Blake A. Rife owes to Plaintiff Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner as set forth above are excepted from discharge under 11 U.S.C. § 523(a)(5) and 11 U.S.C. § 523(a)(15); and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner and against Defendant Blake A. Rife in the amount of $350.00 for the costs of this action. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Brian S. Kruse (See PDF) (law)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner
10 10 order Default Judgment Tue 06/01 2:46 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner Related [+].The motion is granted. Separate Judgment to be entered. Movant is responsible for giving notice to parties in interest as required by rule or statute. ORDERED by Judge Brian S. Kruse (Text Only Order) (law)
Related: [-] 8
9 9 misc Affidavit/Declaration Tue 06/01 11:31 AM
Affidavit of Sarah J. Applegate in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment. Filed by Sarah J Applegate on behalf of Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner. Related [+] (Applegate, Sarah)
Related: [-] 8 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner
8 8 motion Default Judgment Tue 06/01 11:25 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner (Applegate, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 17, 2021
7 7 order Show Cause Mon 05/17 1:44 PM
Order to Show Cause for Failure of Plaintiff to Move for Relief Related [+] Show Cause due by 6/7/2021. (nmw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 02/09 2:00 PM
Summons Service Executed on Blake A. Rife on 2/9/21 Filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner Related [+] (Applegate, Sarah) ORIGINALLY, THE INCORRECT EVENT WAS USED. CORRECTIONS HAVE BEEN MADE. Modified on 2/9/2021 (nmw)
Related: [-] related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/09 12:53 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brandon R. Tomjack on behalf of Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner. (Tomjack, Brandon)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/09 12:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Sarah J Applegate on behalf of Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner. (Applegate, Sarah)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 02/09 10:56 AM
Summons Issued on Blake A. Rife Date Issued 2/9/2021, Answer Due 3/11/2021 . (nmw)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 02/09 10:25 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-08004 BSK] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) filing fee. Receipt number A8465125, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/09 10:23 AM
Adversary case 21-08004 Complaint Objecting to Dischargability of a Debt by Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner against Blake A. Rife. NOS: 64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree). Fee Amount $ 350 Filed by Sarah Applegate on behalf of Jennifer Crane n/k/a Jennifer Salvner.Nature of Suit: (64 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(15), divorce/sep property settlement/decree))(Applegate, Sarah) INCORRECT PARTY FILER WAS CHOSEN. DOCKET TEXT HAS BEEN MODIFIED TO REFLECT THE CORRECT PLAINTIFF. DOCKET TEXT ALSO MODIFIED TO REFLECT ATTORNEY SARAH APPLEGATE AS ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF. Modified on 2/9/2021 (nmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Decree and Stipulation
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 1.31.17 Order
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 3.27.19 Order
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Appeals Affirmation
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 8.27.20 Order