California Southern District Court
Judge:Thomas J Whelan
Referred: Daniel E Butcher
Case #: 3:21-cv-00242
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause15:0078j(b)ss Stockholder Suit
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2021
Terminated:Feb 27, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Aug 08, 2021 2:45 AM PDT
Defendant
Blockchain Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Hannah E. Brown
Gordon & Rees
contact info
Christopher Brian Queally
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Conn
Represented By
David Allen Sergenian
Sergenian Law, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Defendant
DOES 1 through 25
Defendant
Kevin Hu
Defendant
Robert Kalkstein
Defendant
Paul Kim
Defendant
Richard Kromka
Defendant
Patrick Moynihan
Defendant
Max Robbins
Defendant
Joseph Salvani
Defendant
Justin Schreiber
Defendant
Andreas Typaldos
Plaintiff
Daniel Brannon White
Represented By
Elliott H. Jung
Hepburn, Hernandez & Jung Trial Attorneys
contact info
Katharine A. Tremblay
Tremblay Beck Law
contact info

GPO Aug 21 2024
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part First Amended Motion to Dismiss (Re ECF No. 37)Plaintiff may file a first amended complaint on or before September 9, 2024. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 8/21/2024. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
GPO Feb 11 2025
ORDER Granting 50 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/11/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, February 27, 2025
66 66 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 02/27 12:13 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/27/2025.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(exs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
65 65 20 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/25 7:08 PM
Defendant Michael Conn's Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (Sergenian, David) (exs).
Related: [-]