California Northern District Court
Judge:Donna M Ryu
Case #: 4:21-cv-00998
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2021
Last checked: Sunday Aug 08, 2021 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Club Donatello Owners Association
Represented By
Philip Harris Stillman
Stillman & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Rafael Arroyo
Represented By
Raymond George Ballister, Jr.
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Russell Clive Handy
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Center For Disability Access
contact info
Zachary Best
Center For Disability Access
contact info

GPO Dec 13 2021
Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed on 12/13/2021.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2021)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
37 37 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 07/12 10:39 PM
STIPULATION for dismissal Pursuant to F.R.CIV.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) jointly filed by Rafael Arroyo.(Masanque, Isabel Rose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, July 11, 2022
order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Mon 07/11 2:27 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying without prejudice 33 Defendant's Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment pending the outcome of Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's motion to stay is due by 7/21/2022. Any reply is due by 7/28/2022. The court will decide the motion to stay on the papers unless it determines that it would benefit from oral argument. Therefore, the 8/25/2022 hearing on the motion to stay is VACATED. Signed on 7/11/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/11 2:28 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to35 MOTION to Stay: Responses due by 7/21/2022. Replies due by 7/28/2022. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 06, 2022
35 35 motion Stay Wed 07/06 11:31 PM
MOTION to Stay Order for further proceedings & deadlines filed by Rafael Arroyo. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2022 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/20/2022. Replies due by 7/27/2022.(Masanque, Isabel Rose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, June 27, 2022
34 34 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 06/27 9:48 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byRafael Arroyo.(Masanque, Isabel Rose)
Related: [-] 33 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to file MSJ
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Thursday, June 23, 2022
33 33 motion Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Thu 06/23 8:09 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Leave to file MSJ filed by Club Donatello Owners Association. Responses due by 6/27/2022.(Stillman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
32 32 2 pgs order Order Thu 06/23 3:51 PM
ORDER re: Plaintiff's Request to Stay this Action, re: 31 Status Report filed by Rafael Arroyo. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/23/2022. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
31 31 misc Status Report Thu 06/16 5:02 PM
STATUS REPORT by Rafael Arroyo. (Zimmermann, Josie)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
order Order Mon 06/13 4:33 PM
ORDER: The court ordered the parties to conduct a site inspection by 1/12/2022. According to the Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under Americans With Disabilities Act, the last day for Plaintiff to file a Notice of Need for Mediation was on or about 2/23/2022. No such notice has been filed. By no later than 6/16/2022, the parties shall submit a joint report regarding the status of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/13/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
oth_evt Clerk's Declination of Default Thu 01/27 3:53 PM
Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to Club Donatello Owners Association. An Answer was filed on 01/25/2022 at docket 28.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Related [+](msr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] (s)27
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
28 28 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 01/25 1:10 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint byClub Donatello Owners Association. (Stillman, Philip)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Entry of Default Tue 01/25 10:41 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default As to Club Donatello Owners Association, a California Non-profit Corporation filed by Rafael Arroyo.(Masanque, Isabel Rose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certificate/Proof of Service
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/25 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Isabel Rose O. Masanque(Masanque, Isabel Rose)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Monday, December 13, 2021
25 25 7 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 12/13 4:12 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed on 12/13/2021.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
24 24 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 07/12 4:03 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No.16 ) scheduled for July 22, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu is hereby submitted without hearing and without appearance by counsel pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 09, 2021
23 23 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Sat 07/10 12:12 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Hearing on Motion to Dismiss 16 is set for 7/22/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. ( This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 03, 2021
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 06/03 7:09 AM
CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING ON16 MOTION TO DISMISS: Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. (jjoS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 18, 2021
21 21 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Tue 05/18 8:14 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byClub Donatello Owners Association. (Stillman, Philip)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Monday, May 10, 2021
20 20 oth_sup Declaration in Support Mon 05/10 8:51 AM
Declaration of Marie Vergara in Support of16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Club Donatello Owners Association. Related [+] (Stillman, Philip) Modified on 5/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 16
19 19 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Mon 05/10 8:08 AM
Request for Judicial Notice re18 Opposition/Response to Motion to dismiss the First Amended Complaint filed by Rafael Arroyo. Related [+] (Handy, Russell) Modified on 5/10/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 18
18 18 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 05/10 8:06 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byRafael Arroyo. (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-] 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Thursday, April 29, 2021
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 04/29 11:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 16 is set for 6/10/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr] General Order 58. Perso ns granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry. ) (ig, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 26, 2021
16 16 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 04/26 2:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Club Donatello Owners Association. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 5/10/2021. Replies due by 5/17/2021.(Stillman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, April 12, 2021
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 04/12 1:50 PM
Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 9 Motion to Dismiss as moot. Signed on 4/12/2021.(dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 10, 2021
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Sat 04/10 6:52 PM
NOTICE by Rafael Arroyo of Filing of First Amended Complaint in Lieu of Opposing the Motion to Dismiss (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Sat 04/10 6:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byRafael Arroyo. (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 08, 2021
12 12 oth_evt Clerk's Notice 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 04/08 9:16 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are notified that the hearing on Defendant's motion to dismiss, currently scheduled for 5/13/2021, is vacated. The court will decide the motion without oral argument pursuant to Civil. L.R. 7-1(b) or will set another hearing if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
11 11 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/31 11:26 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Club Donatello Owners Association.. (Stillman, Philip)
Related: [-]
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 03/31 9:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The complaint in this action was filed on 2/9/2021. Defendant has filed a motion to dismiss9 . Accordingly, Defendant is instructed to file either the consent or declination form within seven (7) calendar days of the date of this notice, indicating whether it consents to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge in this matter. If the parties do not consent, the case will be randomly assigned to a District Judge of this court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
9 9 motion Dismiss Mon 03/29 8:37 AM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim filed by Club Donatello Owners Association. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 4/12/2021. Replies due by 4/19/2021.(Stillman, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum Of Points and Authorities,
Att: 2 Request for Judcial Notice,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Monday, March 22, 2021
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/22 10:01 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rafael Arroyo. Club Donatello Owners Association served on 3/21/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 02/11 5:29 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Rafael Arroyo..(Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case Tue 02/09 3:14 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (cjlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 02/09 3:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Club Donatello Owners Association. (cjlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 02/09 2:32 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/23/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Tue 02/09 10:45 AM
Proposed Summons. (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 02/09 10:44 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Rafael Arroyo re1 Complaint (Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/09 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15552626.). Filed byRafael Arroyo.(Handy, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet