Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Barry W Ashe
Referred: Karen Wells Roby
Case #: 2:21-cv-00254
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2021
Terminated:Mar 11, 2022
Defendant
Darrel Vannoy
Plaintiff
Timmy Doucet
Respondent
Attorney General State of Louisiana

GPO Dec 09 2021
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). For the foregoing reasons, it is RECOMMENDED that Timmy Doucet's petition for the issuance of a writ of habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 12/9/2021.(jeg)
GPO Mar 11 2022
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 20. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/11/2022.(lw)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, December 07, 2022
33 33 appeal Letter Regarding Writ of Certiorari Mon 12/12 2:50 PM
Letter from U.S. Supreme Court denying Writ of Certiorari(am)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter
Monday, September 26, 2022
32 32 appeal Certificate of Appealability Denied by USCA Mon 09/26 3:09 PM
issued as mandate on 09/26/2022. Certificate of Appealability Denied by USCA. His motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is also DENIED. re27 Notice of Appeal. USCA Judge Name: Carolyn Dineen King(am)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter
Friday, September 02, 2022
31 31 appeal Certificate of Appealability Denied by USCA Fri 09/02 4:41 PM
Certificate of Appealability Denied by USCA. His motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is also DENIED. USCA Judge Name: Carolyn Dineen King.(mm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USCA Transmittal Letter
Thursday, May 12, 2022
appeal USCA Case Number Fri 05/13 9:19 AM
USCA Case Number 22-30163 appealed to USCA, 5th Circuit for27 Notice of Appeal filed by Timmy Doucet (am)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 04, 2022
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/04 11:19 AM
ORDER denying28 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 04/01/2022. (am)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
28 28 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Wed 03/30 11:33 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Timmy Doucet. (sdp)
Related: [-]
27 27 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 03/30 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Timmy Doucet as to25 Judgment.(sdp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Friday, March 11, 2022
26 26 order Certificate of Appealability Denied by USDC Fri 03/11 11:28 AM
Certificate of Appealability Denied by USDC. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/11/2022.(lw)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Judgment Fri 03/11 11:27 AM
JUDGMENT with Prejudice entered in favor of Darrel Vannoy against Timmy Doucet. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/11/2022.(lw)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 03/11 11:23 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS20 . Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/11/2022.(lw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
23 23 16 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 01/31 10:53 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barry W Ashe. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/28/2022.(my)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Clerk's Reallotment Case List
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
22 22 misc Letter Tue 01/18 3:18 PM
Letter to the court from Timmy Doucet dated 01/14/2022. (sdp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
21 21 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Wed 12/29 2:05 PM
OBJECTION to20 Report and Recommendations by Timmy Doucet.(jls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Attachments,
Att: 3 Cover Letter
Thursday, December 09, 2021
20 20 order Report and Recommendations Thu 12/09 9:23 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). For the foregoing reasons, it is RECOMMENDED that Timmy Doucet's petition for the issuance of a writ of habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 12/9/2021.(jeg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 17, 2021
19 19 misc Response/Reply Thu 06/17 4:00 PM
Reply by Timmy Doucet to17 Response to1 Habeas Petition.(js)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Friday, May 28, 2021
18 18 respm Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 05/28 5:04 PM
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Timmy Doucet re15 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply .(bwn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Thursday, May 27, 2021
17 17 answer Response to Habeas Petition Thu 05/27 5:05 AM
RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), by Darrel Vannoy.(Clauss, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 12, 2021
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/12 4:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and respondent shall have an additional fifteen days, or until May 27, 2021, to file a response in accordance with the Court's original briefing order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 5/12/2021. (jeg)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/12 10:26 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Darrel Vannoy. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby.(Clauss, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 23, 2021
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/23 11:43 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court separately file and docket Doucet's Motion for Stay of Proceedings (ECF No. 1-9) and attach his proposed Order (ECF No. 1-10). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the12 Motion Lift Stay and Abey is DENIED in part as MOOT because there is no stay to lift and GRANTED in part to the extent he seeks to dismiss the Motion for Stay of Proceedings filed with his petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that13 Motion to Stay is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 4/23/2021. (jeg)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Stay Fri 04/23 11:39 AM
MOTION to Stay of Proceedings by Timmy Doucet. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby.(jeg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 04/22 12:27 PM
MOTION to Lift Stay and Abey by Timmy Doucet. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (sa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 13, 2021
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/13 1:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Respondent shall have an additional thirty days, or until May 12, 2021, to file a response to the petition filed by Timmy Doucet in this matter in accordance with the Court's original Briefing Order (ECF No. 4). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 4/13/2021. (jeg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 12, 2021
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/12 8:46 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Darrel Vannoy. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby.(Clauss, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 15, 2021
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/15 10:08 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Respondent shall have an additional thirty days, or until Monday, 4/12/2021, to file a response in this matter in accordance with the Court's prior Briefing Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 3/15/2021. (caa)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/12 9:23 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Darrel Vannoy. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby.Attorney Matthew R. Clauss added to party Darrel Vannoy(pty:dft).(Clauss, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 26, 2021
misc Filing Fee Payment - Writ of Habeas Corpus - 5 dollars Fri 02/26 4:16 PM
Filing fee paid from Timmy Doucet re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), (Filing fee $ 5.00, LAE066351) (sa)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 22, 2021
7 7 discov Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint) Mon 02/22 3:22 PM
Return of Service of Certified Receipt on Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Louisiana Department of Justice, Attorney General, Criminal Division on 2/18/2021(cwa)
Related: [-]
6 6 discov Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint) Mon 02/22 3:20 PM
Return of Service of Certified Receipt on Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Jefferson Parish, District Attorney's Office (cwa)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Return of Service (Non Summons & Complaint) Mon 02/22 3:18 PM
Return of Service of Certified Receipt on Habeas Corpus Response Order served on Clerk of Court, 24th Judicial District Court, Jefferson Parish on 2/19/2021(cwa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
4 4 order Habeas Corpus Response Order Wed 02/10 1:53 PM
Habeas Corpus Response Order that Attorney General for the State of Louisiana and the District Attorney for Jefferson Parish respond to the petition of Habeas Corpus within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/10/2021.(caa)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/10 1:29 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis because the petitioner has sufficient funds to pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/10/2021. (caa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 02/09 3:30 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timmy Doucet. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (cwa)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) Tue 02/09 3:29 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Timmy Doucet.(cwa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet