New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael B Kaplan
Case #: 3:14-bk-22654
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jul 22, 2014
Terminated:May 31, 2017
Plan Confirmed:Jun 30, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Revel AC, Inc.
500 Boardwalk
Atlantic City, NJ 08401
Represented By
Evan Goldenberg
White & Case LLP
contact info
Jason N. Zakia
White & Case LLP
contact info
John K. Cunningham
White & Case LLP
contact info
Michael J. Viscount, Jr.
Fox Rothschild, LLP
contact info
Richard S. Kebrdle
White & Case LLP
contact info
White & Case LLP
White & Case LLP
contact info
Alfred J. Lechner, Jr.
White & Case, LLP
contact info
Slater, Tenaglia, Fritz & Hunt, PA
contact info
Raymond M. Patella
Fox Rothschild, LLP
contact info
Kevin M. McGill
White & Case LLP
contact info
John H Strock
Fox Rothschild, Llp.
contact info
Fan B. He
White & Case LLP
contact info
L. John Bird
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Fox, Rothschild
contact info
Andrew Ritter
White & Case LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Cole Schotz Meisel Forman & Leonard PA Court Plaza North 25 Main Street
Hackensack, NJ 07601
Represented By
Warren A. Usatine
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard
contact info
Ryan T. Jareck
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard
contact info
Stuart Komrower
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard
contact info
Ilana Volkov
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard
contact info
Michael D. Sirota
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard
contact info
Mark Tsukerman
Cole, Schotz Et Al
contact info
Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee One Newark Center Suite 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Mitchell Hausman
United States Department Of Justice
contact info
Jeffrey M. Sponder
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info

GPO Jun 24 2015
Opinion Summary: After Tenants' leases were rejected, a cross motion was filed, seeking clarification of the Tenants' rights under section 365(h) of the Bankruptcy Code. The Court ruled that the Tenants hold true leases and retain their possessory rights. Furthermore, the Court preliminarily enjoined the landlord from interfering with Tenants' rights to use, possession, and quiet enjoyment of the premises, so long as Tenants act in compliance with local, state and federal regulations. (related document:1577 Cross Motion re: Clarification of 365(h) Rights (related document:554 Motion to Reject / Debtors Second Omnibus Motion To Reject Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc To The Shutdown Date filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC).. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/24/2015. (wir)

1. Revel Owner Glenn Straub, Casino Restaurants Pick Legal Bar Brawl (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 02/11/2016
2. New Jersey Bankruptcy Judge to Approve Revel Liquidation Plan (casinonewsdaily.com)
Submitted Wed 07/01/2015
3. Judge says ACR Energy can't delay Chapter 11 disclosure (pressofatlanticcity.com)
Submitted Tue 05/05/2015
4. Revel Wins Approval of Backup Sale as Buyer Weighs Options (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Tue 01/06/2015
5. Bankruptcy judge OKs Revel sale over objection of losing bidder - News - NorthJersey.com (northjersey.com)
Submitted Tue 10/07/2014
6. Judge Approves $110 Million Sale of Revel Casino to Brookfield (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 10/08/2014
7. Forward Motions: Revel Asks for Approval of Sale to Brookfield (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Fri 10/03/2014
8. Forward Motions: Revel Auction Resumes Tuesday (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 09/29/2014
9. Revel Lawyers Adjourn Casino's Bankruptcy Auction For Rosh Hashanah (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 09/25/2014
10. Attorney: Revel could be open in weeks under new buyer (pressofatlanticcity.com)
Submitted Mon 09/15/2014
11. Forward Motions: Revel Looks to Protect New $90 Million Offer (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Sat 09/13/2014
12. Florida Developer Offers $90 Million for Atlantic City's Revel (online.wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 09/11/2014
13. Where?s the Boardwalk? Ravel Isn?t Revel (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Wed 08/20/2014
14. Revel Delays Auction Indefinitely After Saying It Will Close (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Thu 08/14/2014
15. Forward Motions: Revel Set to Hit Bankruptcy Auction Block (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Sat 08/09/2014
16. Revel Postpones Bankruptcy Auction a Week to Analyze Bids (bloomberg.com)
Submitted Thu 08/07/2014
17. Forward Motions: Revel Aims to Secure a Buyer to Prevent Shutdown - Bankruptcy Beat - WSJ (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 08/04/2014
18. Revel bankruptcy judge says execs could get $1.75 million in bonuses if resort sells (pressofatlanticcity.com)
Submitted Wed 07/30/2014
19. Revel files for bankruptcy again, threatens to close (app.com)
Submitted Fri 06/20/2014
20. Lawyer: Revel 'a melting ice cube' that needs help (therepublic.com)
Submitted Fri 06/20/2014
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Monday, June 12, 2017
court Hearing Held Mon 06/12 2:21 PM
Minute of 6/12/17; CASE PREVIOUSLY CLOSED ON 5/31/17 Related [+] (kmf)
Related: [-] Set/Reset/Satisfy Deadline(s) - Other