JONES v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-00216 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:21-cv-00198 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 09, 2021 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO LLC
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
BREANNE JONES
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 02/15 2:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by BREANNE JONES. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/01 4:13 PM
ORDER - Despite the Court's warnings, the 609 plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B have more than one case filed on the active docket. The law firms representing these plaintiffs are directed to confer with one another and move to dismiss the case that is deemed to be the duplicate case within 21 days of the date of this Order. To the extent the law firms fail to dismiss the duplicate case by the deadline, the Court will dismiss the later filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/1/2023. (djb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, March 02, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/02 4:48 PM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by BREANNE JONES. (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/02 12:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of BREANNE JONES (REUTER, VINCE) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/02 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of BREANNE JONES (REAMS, JARED) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/02 12:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of BREANNE JONES (ECKLAND, JEFF) |
|
Wednesday, February 10, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 02/10 10:03 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Compalaint due on or before 3/2/2021 .) (djb) |
|
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Wed 02/10 8:36 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00198. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-93) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable M. Casey Rodgers.(lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2021.] | |
Wednesday, January 27, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-198 (JRT/KMM). (MMP) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2021.] | |
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2021.] | |
2 | 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2021.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8438110) filed by 3M Company. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/10/2021.] | |
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |