Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas P Agresti
Case #: 2:00-bk-22876
Case Filed:Apr 16, 2000
Creditor Meeting:Jun 28, 2000
Terminated:Sep 27, 2024

Debtor
Pittsburgh Corning Corporation
800 Presque Isle Drive
Pittsburgh, PA 15239
Represented By
Sara Beth A. Reyburn Kohut
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
David Ziegler
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Rosalie J. Bell
contact info
Andrew J. Muha
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Lisa Kerszencwejg Stauffer
Cohen & Grigsby, P.C.
contact info
Paul M. Singer
Reed Smith
contact info
Saul Ewing LLP
C/o Jeffery C. Hampton
contact info
Elihu Inselbuch
Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered
contact info
Joel M. Helmrich
Dinsmore & Shohl LLP
contact info
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Douglas E. Cameron
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
James J. Restivo
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Cred. Comm. Chair
Tort Victims Represented by Motely Rice LLC, Hartley & O'Brein PLLC; and Caroselli Beachler McTiernan & Conboy, Tort Victims Represented by Motely Rice LLC; Hartley O'Brien PLLC and Caroselli Beachler McTiernan & Conboy
Caroselli Beachler McTiernan & Conboy 312 Boulevard of the Allies 8th Floor
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Represented By
Edwin Beachler
Caroselli Beachler Mctiernan & Convoy
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Liberty Center 1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 970
Pittsburgh, PA 15222
Represented By
Norma Hildenbrand, on Behalf of the United States Trustee by
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Joseph M. Fornari Jr on Behalf of the United States Trustee by
Liberty Center
contact info

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 6:06 PM EDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
10964 10964 misc Report -Generic- Fri 04/25 2:00 PM
Report NOTICE OF FILING ANNUAL REPORT AND ACCOUNT OF THE PITTSBURGH CORNING CORPORATION ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY SETTLEMENT TRUST FOR THE FISCAL YEAR ENDING DECEMBER 31, 2024 Filed by Interested Party Pittsburgh Corning Corporation Asbestos Personal Injury Settlement Trust (Milch, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - 2024 Annual Report
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Exhibit 1 - Financial Statements
Att: 3 Certificate of Service