Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas A Varlan
Referred: Christopher H Steger
Case #: 1:21-cv-00023
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2021
Last checked: Monday Aug 09, 2021 5:52 AM EDT
Defendant
William Travis Griffith
Defendant
Jason T Jones
Defendant
James Levoy Knight
Defendant
The Stache Company, LLC
Plaintiff
Truist Bank
Represented By
Charles W Cook, III
Adams And Reese, Llp (nashville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 28, 2021
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/28 10:25 AM
NOTICE by Truist Bank Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(A)(1) (Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 29, 2021
20 20 2 pgs order Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 07/29 11:20 AM
ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendant Griffiths Agreed Motion to Stay as to Defendant Travis Griffith 19 is DENIED. However, in light of the bankruptcy notices as to Defendants Jones and Knight, the Court finds it appropriate to stay this action pending the resolution of those bankruptcy actions. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that this matter is STAYED pending resolution of Defendant Jones and Knights bankruptcy proceedings. The parties are further ORDERED to file a status report regarding the status of the bankruptcy proceedings ninety (90) days from the date of this order, and every ninety (90) days thereafter, until the bankruptcy proceedings are concluded. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 7/29/21. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 29, 2021
19 19 motion Stay Thu 04/29 1:33 PM
MOTION to Stay Agreed Motion to Stay as to Def (W. Travis Griffith) by Truist Bank.(Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Proposed Agreed Order to Stay as to Def (W. Travis Griffith)
Friday, April 23, 2021
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/23 10:03 AM
NOTICE by Truist Bank of Bankruptcy Filing of Dedendant James Levoy Knight (Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 26, 2021
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed (non-USA) Fri 03/26 3:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. William Travis Griffith served on 3/22/2021. (Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed (non-USA) Mon 03/22 2:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. James Levoy Knight served on 3/18/2021. (Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed (non-USA) Fri 03/19 3:56 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Truist Bank. The Stache Company, LLC served on 3/18/2021. (Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 15, 2021
14 14 service Alias Summons Issued Mon 03/15 2:19 PM
Alias Summons Issued as to Jason T Jones. (BJL)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/15 10:20 AM
NOTICE by Truist Bank of Bankruptcy Filing of Defendant Jason T. Jones (Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2021
12 12 misc Supplement Fri 03/12 1:17 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint, Summons to J. Jones, Registered Agent by Truist Bank. (Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 12, 2021
11 11 misc Supplement Fri 02/12 10:17 AM
SUPPLEMENT to7 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet by Truist Bank. (Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Fri 02/12 8:24 AM
Summons Issued as to The Stache Company, LLC.(AML)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to James Knight,
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Jason Jones,
Att: 3 Summons Issued as to William Griffith
9 9 notice Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Fri 02/12 8:17 AM
Administrative Notice to Counsel re7 Supplement not flattened prior to filing: requirements due by 2/17/2021 . (AML)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 11, 2021
8 8 misc Supplement Thu 02/11 3:04 PM
SUPPLEMENT to1 Complaint, Summons and Civil Cover Sheet by Truist Bank.(Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons to J. Jones,
Att: 2 Summons Summons to J. Levoy Knight, Jr.,
Att: 3 Summons Summons to W. Travis Griffith,
Att: 4 Summons Summons to Stache Company LLC
7 7 misc Supplement Thu 02/11 2:16 PM
SUPPLEMENT Civil Cover Sheet by Truist Bank. (Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Thu 02/11 2:15 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Truist Bank identifying Corporate Parent Truist Bank for Truist Bank. (Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
5 5 3 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Thu 02/11 10:26 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on February 11, 2021. (SAC)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Thu 02/11 10:26 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on February 11, 2021. (SAC)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Thu 02/11 10:25 AM
Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on February 11, 2021. (SAC)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Thu 02/11 9:37 AM
Administrative Notice to Counsel requirements due by 2/16/2021 . (SAC) (Additional attachment(s) added -informational only on 2/11/2021: #1 Other) (SAC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 02/11 9:36 AM
District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (SAC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File CCI Thu 02/11 9:38 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by Truist Bank. (SAC)
Related: [-]
service Summons NOT Issued Thu 02/11 9:39 AM
No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to All Defendants. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 02/10 12:01 PM
COMPLAINT against THE STACHE COMPANY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4650697.), filed by TRUIST BANK, successor-in-interest to SUNTRUST BANK.(Cook, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H