Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Karen S Marston
Case #: 2:21-cv-00602
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2021
Terminated:Jun 14, 2021

Debtor
LINDA OSINUPEBI
711 YEADON AVE.
YEADON, PA 19050
Last checked: Sunday Aug 08, 2021 5:28 AM EDT
Appellee
Charles Dobbs
Represented By
EDWARD J. HAYES
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Appellee
Brian Maher
Represented By
EDWARD J. HAYES
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Appellee
Nasr Properties I, LLC
Represented By
BRIAN H. SMITH
Fidelity National Law Group
contact info
Appellee
Albert Papaleo
Represented By
EDWARD J. HAYES
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Appellee
Jay Pierce, Jr.
Represented By
EDWARD J. HAYES
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Appellee
Revocable Trust of Alan C. Emsley, U/A/D November 13, 2017
Represented By
EDWARD J. HAYES
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Interpleader
The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-4
Represented By
BRIAN ERIC CAINE
Parker Mccay P.A.
contact info
Notice Only Party
HON. ASHLEY M. CHAN
US BKY COURT EDPA 900 MARKET ST., STE. 400
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19107
Notice Only Party
TIMOTHY B. MCGRATH
CLERK, U.S. BANKRUPTCY COURT 900 MARKET STREET SUITE 400
PHILA., PA 19107
Trustee
TERRY P. DERSHAW
DERSHAW LAW OFFICES P.O. BOX 556
WARMINSTER, PA 18974
Trustee
UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE U.S. TRUSTEE 200 CHESTNUT ST. SUITE 502
PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106

GPO Jun 14 2021
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/14/21. 6/14/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
GPO Jun 14 2021
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT NASR PROPERTIES I, LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH APPEAL (DOC. NOS. 5 & 6) IS GRANTED AND THE APPEAL IS QUASHED FOR LACK OF STANDING. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/14/21. 6/14/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
19 19 misc Letter Wed 07/13 8:53 AM
Letter dated 7/8/22 re: Receipt of Bankruptcy Record. (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 15, 2021
misc Remark Tue 06/15 8:27 AM
DOC. NOS. 17 AND 18 MAILED TO TRUSTEES AND NOTICE ONLY PARTIES ON 6/15/2021. (md, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 14, 2021
18 18 1 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Mon 06/14 5:21 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT NASR PROPERTIES I, LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH APPEAL (DOC. NOS. 5 & 6) IS GRANTED AND THE APPEAL IS QUASHED FOR LACK OF STANDING. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS MATTER CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/14/21. 6/14/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
17 17 13 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Mon 06/14 5:18 PM
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 6/14/21. 6/14/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 11, 2021
16 16 respoth Response Wed 05/12 4:20 PM
Response to15 Objection to Standing to Appeal, by LINDA OSINUPEBI. (va, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email
Thursday, May 06, 2021
15 15 misc Objections Thu 05/06 12:18 PM
Objections by The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-4 re14 Statement of Party's Standing to Appeal .(CAINE, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 29, 2021
14 14 misc Statement Fri 04/30 8:18 PM
Party Aggrieved's Standing To Appeal, by LINDA OSINUPEBI. (va, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Email
Monday, April 05, 2021
misc Remark Mon 04/05 9:48 AM
DOC. 13 MAILED TO UNREP/NOTICE ONLY & PRO SE PARTIES. (sg, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 31, 2021
13 13 1 pgs order Order Thu 04/01 4:02 PM
ORDER THAT THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE OUTLINED IN DOC. NO.12 IS VACATED. THE COURT WILL ISSUE A NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE GOVERNING THE SUBSTANTIVE ISSUES IN THIS CASE IF IT FINDS THAT THE APPELLANT HAS STANDING TO PURSUE THIS APPEAL.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/31/21. 4/1/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREP/NOTICE ONLY AND PRO SE PARTIES NOT MAILED (va, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2021
12 12 misc Briefing Schedule Mon 03/29 9:44 AM
Briefing Schedule 3/29/21 Entered and copies e-mailed. Pro Se Parties Not Mailed. (va, )
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Bankruptcy designation of record received Mon 03/29 9:41 AM
Original Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received.(va, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket, Appellant and Appelle Designation
misc Remark Mon 03/29 12:00 PM
MAILED OUT ORDER ENTRY #12 TO COUNSEL AND PRO SE PARTIES ON 3/29/21. (jaa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 25, 2021
misc Remark Thu 03/25 1:11 PM
COPY OF ORDER #10 MAILED TO PRO SE AND UNREPS (jpd, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 24, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 03/25 12:16 PM
ORDER DENYING9 MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS TO GET LEGAL COUNSEL. HOWEVER, TO ACCOMMODATE OLUWASEYI OSINUPEBIS SEARCH FOR COUNSEL, THE COURT WILL GRANT A BRIEF EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE QUASHED. (SEE DOC. NO.6 .) OLUWASEYI OSINUPEBI SHALL DEMONSTRATE THAT SHE HAS STANDING TO PURSUE THIS APPEAL BY APRIL 29, 2021. IF SHE FAILS TO SHOW CAUSE BY APRIL 29, 2021, THE COURT MAY GRANT THE GRANT NASR PROPERTIES I, LLCS MOTION TO QUASH (DOC. NO.5 ) AND DISMISS THIS APPEAL WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/24/21.3/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREP/NOTICE ONLY AND PRO SE PARTIES NOT MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 23, 2021
misc Remark Tue 03/23 9:05 AM
COPY OF DOC. NO. 8 HAS BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, UNREP PARTIES AND NOTICE ONLY PARTIES. (bw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 22, 2021
9 9 motion Stay Tue 03/23 11:24 AM
MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS TO GET LEGAL COUNSEL, PROOF OF SERVICE, FILED BY OLUWASEYI OSINUPEBI ON BEHALF OF LINDA OSINUPEBI. "NO ENVELOPE ATTACHED"(kw, ) Modified on 3/23/2021 (kw, )
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Mon 03/22 7:27 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPELLANT SHALL HAVE UNTIL 4/19/21 TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS APPEAL SHOULD NOT BE QUASHED. SPECIFICALLY, THE APPELLANT IS DIRECTED TO IDENTIFY HERSELF OR HIMSELF3 AND DEMONSTRATE THAT HE OR SHE HAS STANDING TO PURSUE THIS APPEAL. IF THE APPELLANT FAILS TO SHOW CAUSE BY APRIL 19, 2021, THE COURT MAY GRANT THE PENDING MOTION TO QUASH AND DISMISS THIS APPEAL WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE KAREN S. MARSTON ON 3/22/21. 3/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. UNREP/NOTICE ONLY AND PRO SE PARTIES NOT MAILED. (va, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2021
7 7 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/24 11:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nasr Properties I, LLC re6 Plaintiff's Brief and Statement of Issues in Support of Request for Review regarding Motion to Quash Appeal ,5 MOTION to Quash Appeal (SMITH, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Brief and Statement Wed 02/24 11:54 AM
Plaintiff's Brief and Statement of Issues in Support of Request for Review regarding Motion to Quash Appeal filed by Nasr Properties I, LLC..(SMITH, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Quash Wed 02/24 11:52 AM
MOTION to Quash Appeal filed by Nasr Properties I, LLC..(SMITH, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 02/24 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. HAYES on behalf of Brian Maher, Albert Papaleo, Charles Dobbs, Jay Pierce, Jr., Revocable Trust of Alan C. Emsley, U/A/D November 13, 2017 with certificate of service(HAYES, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
3 3 misc Suggestion of Death Wed 02/17 8:52 AM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Linda Osinupebi, Pro Se by The Bank of New York Mellon FKA The Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-4.(CAINE, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, February 10, 2021
misc Remark Wed 02/10 2:54 PM
DOC. NO. 2 MAILED TO PRO SE (ems)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
2 2 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Wed 02/10 11:13 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, )
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Bankruptcy Appeal Received Wed 02/10 10:58 AM
Certificate of Appeal of LINDA OSINUPEBI from the order of Bankruptcy Judge ASHELY M. CHAN filed on 6/15/2018.(bw, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USCA DOCKET