Washington Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:21-cr-06004
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 10, 2021 11:42 PM PST
Defendant
Andres Gutierrez (2)
Represented By
Robin Collett Emmans
contact info
Defendant
Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1)
Represented By
Kenneth D Therrien
Kenneth Therrien Law Office
contact info
Douglas E McKinley, Jr
Law Office Of Douglas E Mckinley Jr
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Benjamin David Seal
United States Attorneys Office
contact info

GPO Sep 28 2023
JUDGMENT as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1); Count 1 - Imprisonment: 87 months; Supervised Release: 60 months; Special Penalty Assessment: $100; Fine: Waived; Count 2 - DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Mary K. Dimke. (REM, Case Administrator)

Docket last updated: 02/11/2021 12:12 AM PST
Friday, January 15, 2021
Arrest of Andres Gutierrez (2) on 1/15/2021. (CLP, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1) on 1/15/2021. (CLP, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1), Andres Gutierrez (2). (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Charges and Penalties as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1). (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
3 3 Charges and Penalties as to Andres Gutierrez (2). (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
6 6 APPOINTMENT ORDER. Type of Appointment: CJA. IT IS ORDERED that Douglas E McKinley, Jr is appointed to represent Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1) in this matter. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE AND ORDERING DEFENDANT BE HELD PENDING INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER FINDING PROBABLE CAUSE AND ORDERING DEFENDANT BE HELD PENDING INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Andres Gutierrez (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 18, 2021
9 9 APPOINTMENT ORDER. Type of Appointment: CJA - Adult - Felony. IT IS ORDERED that Robin Collett Emmans is appointed to represent Andres Gutierrez (2) in this matter. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (Gardner, Darrel) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE OF HEARING - By Court (USM Action Required) as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1). Text entry; no PDF attached. Initial Appearance on Complaint set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Richland Courtroom 326 via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. Defendant to appear by video from Benton County Jail. Due to the Court's General Order 2021-1, Yakima Administrative Order 20-13 and Richland Administrative Order 20-10 limiting public access to the courthouse, members of the public and press may listen to the proceedings by using the following conference call line, 866-590-5055, access code 5864120#. Hearing content provided via videoconference or teleconference dial-in access MUST NOT be recorded or rebroadcast. Parties on the line MUST MUTE THEIR PHONES. (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF HEARING - By Court (USM Action Required) as to Andres Gutierrez (2). Text entry; no PDF attached. Initial Appearance on complaint set for 1/19/2021 at 03:30 PM in Richland Courtroom 326 via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. Defendant to appear by video from Benton County Jail. Due to the Court's General Order 2021-1, Yakima Administrative Order 20-13 and Richland Administrative Order 20-10 limiting public access to the courthouse, members of the public and press may listen to the proceedings by using the following conference call line, 866-590-5055, access code 5864120#. Hearing content provided via videoconference or teleconference dial-in access MUST NOT be recorded or rebroadcast. Parties on the line MUST MUTE THEIR PHONES. (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE RESETTING HEARING - By Court (USM Action Required) as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1). Text entry; no PDF attached. Hearing content provided via videoconference or teleconference dial-in access MUST NOT be recorded or rebroadcast. Initial Appearance on Complaint set for 1/19/2021 at 10:00 AM IS RESET TO 11:00 AM in Richland Courtroom 326 via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. Defendant to appear by video from Benton County Jail.(PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 19, 2021
13 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Douglas E McKinley, Jr appearing for Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1) (McKinley, Douglas) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
14 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF RIGHTS by Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1) (McKinley, Douglas) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
15 15 ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS by Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1) (McKinley, Douglas) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
18 18 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1). (Seal, Benjamin) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
19 19 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Andres Gutierrez (2). (Seal, Benjamin) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke: Initial Appearance as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1) held on 1/19/2021. Related [+] (SG, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Digital Recording/R-326. Contact Court_Reporters@waed.uscourts.gov to order.
21 21 ORDER FOLLOWING INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT AND SETTING DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARINGS as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1); Detention Hearing set for 1/21/2021 at 3:15 PM in Yakima Courtroom 102 by Video Conference; Preliminary Hearing set for 2/2/2021 at 3:00 PM in Yakima Courtroom 102 by Video Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (CLP, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
22 22 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke: Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Andres Gutierrez (2) held on 1/19/2021. Interpreter required. Language: Spanish Related [+] (SG, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Digital Recording/R-326. Contact Court_Reporters@waed.uscourts.gov to order.
Wednesday, January 20, 2021
23 23 ORDER FOLLOWING INITIAL APPEARANCE ON COMPLAINT AND SETTING DETENTION AND PRELIMINARY HEARINGS (USM Action Required) as to Andres Gutierrez (2); Detention Hearing set for 1/22/2021 at 3:00 PM in Yakima Courtroom 102 by Video Conference; Preliminary Hearing set for 2/2/2021 at 3:00 PM in Yakima Courtroom 102 by Video Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (CLP, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 21, 2021
24 24 AFFIDAVIT of Douglas McKinley in Opposition to18 MOTION for Detention as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1).(McKinley, Douglas) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit letters in support
26 26 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke: Detention Hearing as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1) held on 1/21/2021. Related [+] (SG, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Digital Recording/R-326. Contact Court_Reporters@waed.uscourts.gov to order.
Friday, January 22, 2021
28 28 ASSERTION OF FIFTH AND SIXTH AMENDMENT RIGHTS by Andres Gutierrez (2) (Emmans, Robin) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
30 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF NOTICE OF RIGHTS by Andres Gutierrez (2) (Emmans, Robin) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
31 31 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL; Granting18 Motion for Detention as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (CLP, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
32 32 DECLARATION of Robin Emmans regarding letter from family in support of release by Andres Gutierrez (2) re19 MOTION for Detention as to Andres Gutierrez (2)(Emmans, Robin) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A
33 33 Minute Entry for VIDEO CONFERENCE proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke: Detention Hearing as to Andres Gutierrez (2) held on 1/22/2021. Related [+] (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-] ported/Recorded by: Digital Recording/Y-102. Contact Court_Reporters@waed.uscourts.gov to order.
Monday, January 25, 2021
34 34 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL, Granting19 Motion for Detention as to Andres Gutierrez (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. (CLP, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
35 35 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/15/2021 as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1). (CLP, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
36 36 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 1/15/2021 as to Andres Gutierrez (2). (CLP, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 29, 2021
37 37 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1) (McKinley, Douglas) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
38 38 NOTICE of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court (USM Action Required) - Text entry - no PDF document - as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1). Due to Defendant's filing of a Waiver of Preliminary Hearing (ECF No.37 ), Preliminary Hearing set for 2/2/2021 at 3:00 PM is STRICKEN. A Status Hearing is set for 2/11/2021 at 02:00 PM in Richland Courtroom 326 via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. Defendant to appear by video from Benton County Jail. Due to the Court's General Order 2021-1, Yakima Administrative Order 20-13 and Richland Administrative Order 20-10 limiting public access to the courthouse, members of the public and press may listen to the proceedings by using the following conference call line, 866-590-5055, access code 5864120#. Hearing content provided via videoconference or teleconference dial-in access MUST NOT be recorded or rebroadcast. Parties on the line MUST MUTE THEIR PHONES. (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
39 39 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Andres Gutierrez (2) (Emmans, Robin) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
40 40 NOTICE of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court (USM Action Required) - Text entry - no PDF document - as to Andres Gutierrez (2). Due to the filing of Defendant's Waiver of a Preliminary Hearing at ECF No.39 , the hearing set for 2/2/2021 at 3:00 PM is Cancelled. A Status Hearing is set for 2/11/2021 at 01:00 PM in Richland Courtroom 326 via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. Defendant to appear by video from Benton County Jail. Due to the Court's General Order 2021-1, Yakima Administrative Order 20-13 and Richland Administrative Order 20-10 limiting public access to the courthouse, members of the public and press may listen to the proceedings by using the following conference call line, 866-590-5055, access code 5864120#. Hearing content provided via videoconference or teleconference dial-in access MUST NOT be recorded or rebroadcast. Parties on the line MUST MUTE THEIR PHONES. (PH, Case Administrator) [4:21-mj-07015-MKD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 09, 2021
41 41 4 pgs INDICTMENT as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1) counts 1, 2, Andres Gutierrez (2) counts 1, 2. (AY, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
43 43 1 pgs Charges and Penalties - FORFEITURE NOTICE - as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1). (AY, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
44 44 Charges and Penalties - FORFEITURE NOTICE - as to Andres Gutierrez (2). (AY, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
45 45 NOTICE of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court - Text entry - no PDF document - as to Andres Gutierrez (2). Due to the filing of an Indictment, the Status Hearing set for 2/11/2021 is now an Arraignment on Indictment set for 2/11/2021 at 01:00 PM in Richland Courtroom 326 via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. Defendant to appear by video conference from Benton County Jail. Due to the Court's General Order 2021-1, Yakima Administrative Order 20-13 and Richland Administrative Order 20-10 limiting public access to the courthouse, members of the public and press may listen to the proceedings by using the following conference call line, 866-590-5055, access code 5864120#. Hearing content provided via videoconference or teleconference dial-in access MUST NOT be recorded or rebroadcast. Parties on the line MUST MUTE THEIR PHONES. (PH, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
46 46 NOTICE of Cancellation and Notice of Hearing - By Court - Text entry - no PDF document - as to Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1). Due to the filing of an Indictment, the Status Hearing is now an Arraignment on Indictment set for 2/11/2021 at 02:00 PM in Richland Courtroom 326 via Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke. Defendant to appear by video from the Benton County Jail. Due to the Court's General Order 2021-1, Yakima Administrative Order 20-13 and Richland Administrative Order 20-10 limiting public access to the courthouse, members of the public and press may listen to the proceedings by using the following conference call line, 866-590-5055, access code 5864120#. Hearing content provided via videoconference or teleconference dial-in access MUST NOT be recorded or rebroadcast. Parties on the line MUST MUTE THEIR PHONES. (PH, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
47 47 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Attorney Douglas McKinley has withdrawn. Attorney Ken Therrien is substituted on behalf of defendant Arturo Tejeda-Gomez (1) (Attorney Kenneth D Therrien added to party Arturo Tejeda-Gomez(pty:dft))(Therrien, Kenneth)
Related: [-]