Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:21-mj-00330
Case Filed:Feb 11, 2021
Last checked: Saturday Feb 13, 2021 1:31 AM CST
Defendant
Julian Alaniz Perez (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Laredo
contact info
Plaintiff
USA


Docket last updated: 02/13/2021 2:41 AM CST
Thursday, February 11, 2021
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Julian Alaniz Perez (1), filed (Zapata). Initial Appearance set for 2/12/2021 at 01:35 PM before Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos (dmoralesadi, 5)
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Julian Alaniz Perez, filed.(dmoralesadi, 5)
Related: [-]
3 3 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on February 11, 2021 at 04:57 PM as to Julian Alaniz Perez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher dos Santos) Parties notified. (dmorales, 5)
Related: [-]