California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:21-cv-01116
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Feb 15, 2021
Terminated:Sep 11, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 14, 2021 2:45 AM PDT
Defendant
Sara J. Baack
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sean Boyle
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark T. Carges
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Jason E. Child
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
John G. Connors
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Douglas S. Merritt
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Patricia B. Morrison
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stephen G. Newberry
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Graham V. Smith
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Splunk Inc.
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Elisa A. Steele
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sri Viswanath
Represented By
Sara B. Brody
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Thomas James Herron
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Ryan
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alex Wolk
Represented By
Laurence Matthew Rosen
The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, September 11, 2023
44 44 6 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 09/11 7:00 PM
ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar Granting 43 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant To FED. R. CIV. P. 23.1(c) and 41(a). (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2023
43 43 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 09/08 2:11 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 23.1(c) and 41(a) filed by Sara J. Baack, Sean Boyle, Mark T. Carges, Jason E. Child, John G. Connors, Douglas S. Merritt, Patricia B. Morrison, Stephen G. Newberry, Graham V. Smith, Splunk Inc., Elisa A. Steele, Sri Viswanath. (Ryan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 18, 2023
42 42 notice Notice of Change In Counsel Tue 07/18 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Thomas James Herron (Herron, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
41 41 order Protective Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 11/30 10:33 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER: Motions terminated: 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED [AND PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Sean Boyle, Stephen G. Newberry, Graham V. Smith, Mark T. Carges, Sara J. Baack, Jason E. Child, Elisa A. Steele, Splunk Inc., Douglas S. Merritt, Sri Viswanath, Patricia B. Morrison, John G. Connors. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 30, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
40 40 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 11/18 4:43 PM
Declaration of Nicole M. Ryan REGARDING STIPULATED [AND PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER filed bySara J. Baack, Sean Boyle, Mark T. Carges, Jason E. Child, John G. Connors, Douglas S. Merritt, Patricia B. Morrison, Stephen G. Newberry, Graham V. Smith, Splunk Inc., Elisa A. Steele, Sri Viswanath.(Ryan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
39 39 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 11/18 4:37 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED [AND PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Sara J. Baack, Sean Boyle, Mark T. Carges, Jason E. Child, John G. Connors, Douglas S. Merritt, Patricia B. Morrison, Stephen G. Newberry, Graham V. Smith, Splunk Inc., Elisa A. Steele, Sri Viswanath. (Ryan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 18, 2022
38 38 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 04/18 4:27 PM
ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 37 Stipulation.(mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
37 37 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 04/14 4:27 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Stay of Action filed by Alex Wolk. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2022
36 36 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 04/07 1:59 PM
ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 35 . Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearance s: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at JSTCRD@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 9, 2022 by 2:00 p.m. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscou rts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 7, 2022. (mll, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
35 35 5 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 04/21 4:25 PM
ORDER REGARDING STAY OF ACTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 34 Stipulation.(mllS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 04/21 10:33 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Stay of Action filed by Alex Wolk, Splunk Inc., Douglas S. Merritt, Jason E. Child, Sara J. Baack, Sean Boyle, Mark T. Carges, John G. Connors, Patricia B. Morrison, Stephen G. Newberry, Graham V. Smith, Elisa A. Steele, and Sri Viswanath. (Rosen, Laurence) Modified on 4/21/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 16, 2021
33 33 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 04/16 9:00 AM
STIPULATION EXTENDING NOMINAL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE DEADLINE filed by Splunk Inc.. (Ryan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
32 32 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Wed 04/07 4:39 PM
STIPULATION Extending Nominal Defendant's Response Deadline filed by Splunk Inc.. (Ryan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 16, 2021
31 31 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Tue 03/16 12:10 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/15/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (mllS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
30 30 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/16 9:48 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2021.(jmlS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 03/16 8:09 AM
ORDER RELATING CASES re (28 in 4:21-cv-01116-YGR) Notice (Other) filed by Alex Wolk, Motions terminated: (55 in 4:20-cv-08600-JST) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Alexander Wolk. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2021. (mllS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 09, 2021
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/09 6:09 PM
NOTICE by Alex Wolk of the Filing of the Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related in 4:20-cv-08600 (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
27 27 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by Sri Viswanath waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:52 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by Elisa A. Steele waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by Graham V. Smith waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:50 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by Stephen G. Newberry waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:49 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by Patricia B. Morrison waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:47 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by Douglas S. Merritt waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by John G. Connors waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by Jason E. Child waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by Mark T. Carges waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by Sean Boyle waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/09 2:41 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Alex Wolk. Service waived by Sara J. Baack waiver sent on 3/4/2021, answer due 5/3/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 08, 2021
16 16 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 03/08 7:18 PM
STIPULATION EXTENDING NOMINAL DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE DEADLINE filed by Splunk Inc.. (Ryan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 03/08 6:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Sara J. Baack, Sean Boyle, Mark T. Carges, Jason E. Child, John G. Connors, Douglas S. Merritt, Patricia B. Morrison, Stephen G. Newberry, Graham V. Smith, Splunk Inc., Elisa A. Steele, Sri Viswanath identifying Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Douglas S. Merritt, Elisa A. Steele, Graham V. Smith, Jason E. Child, John G. Connors, Mark T. Carges, Patricia B. Morrison, Sara J. Baack, Sean Boyle, Splunk Inc., Sri Viswanath, Stephen G. Newberry. (Brody, Sara)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 03/08 6:53 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Sara J. Baack, Sean Boyle, Mark T. Carges, Jason E. Child, John G. Connors, Douglas S. Merritt, Patricia B. Morrison, Stephen G. Newberry, Graham V. Smith, Splunk Inc., Elisa A. Steele, Sri Viswanath (Brody, Sara)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/08 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas James Herron (Herron, Thomas)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/08 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Marie Ryan (Ryan, Nicole)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/08 6:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sara B. Brody (Brody, Sara)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 03, 2021
10 10 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/03 10:20 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/3/2021.(anjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
9 9 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 03/02 4:22 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 03/02 4:03 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alex Wolk.. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/18 9:39 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alex Wolk. Splunk Inc. served on 2/17/2021, answer due 3/10/2021. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 02/16 5:48 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 02/16 5:44 PM
Summons Issued as to Sara J. Baack, Sean Boyle, Mark T. Carges, Jason E. Child, John G. Connors, Douglas S. Merritt, Patricia B. Morrison, Stephen G. Newberry, Graham V. Smith, Splunk Inc., Elisa A. Steele, Sri Viswanath. (anjS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 02/16 9:17 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/2/2021. (haS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 15, 2021
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 02/15 2:35 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Alex Wolk (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Mon 02/15 2:33 PM
Proposed Summons. (Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
1 1 52 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/15 2:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Sara J. Baack, Sean Boyle, Mark T. Carges, Jason E. Child, John G. Connors, Douglas S. Merritt, Patricia B. Morrison, Stephen G. Newberry, Graham V. Smith, Splunk Inc., Elisa A. Steele, Sri Viswanath ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15576705.). Filed byAlex Wolk.(Rosen, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet