Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:21-cv-00288
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2021
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:21-cv-00298
Last checked: Monday Aug 16, 2021 6:16 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JOHN S. SADO
Represented By
JARED M REAMS
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
JEFF H ECKLAND
Eckland & Blando Llp - Minneapolis Mn
contact info
VINCE C REUTER
Eckland & Blando - Minneapolis Mn
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, March 08, 2021
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/08 8:20 AM
SHORT FORM AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JOHN S. SADO. (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 04, 2021
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/04 10:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCE C REUTER on behalf of JOHN S. SADO (REUTER, VINCE)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/04 10:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JARED M REAMS on behalf of JOHN S. SADO (REAMS, JARED)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/04 10:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEFF H ECKLAND on behalf of JOHN S. SADO (ECKLAND, JEFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 17, 2021
7 7 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/17 2:19 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaints due by 3/9/2021 .) (djb)
Related: [-]
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 02/17 10:24 AM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00298. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 16, 2021
5 5 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-94) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers.(kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
4 4 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 21-cv-298 (JRT/KMM). (lmb) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 3M Company, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Holding LLC, Aearo Intermediate LLC,, Aearo LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC re2 Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal, (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
2 2 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant 3M Company. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number N/A (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8459272) filed by Aearo LLC, Aearo Holding LLC, 3M Occupational Safety LLC, Aearo Technologies LLC, 3M Company, Aearo Intermediate LLC,. No summons requested. (Hulse, Benjamin) [Transferred from Minnesota on 2/17/2021.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet