Crystallex International Corp v. Bolivarian Republic of Venezue
Original Case: 1:17-mc-00151
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01289 |
Type | civil / private / federal question |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 09, 2023 11:05 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellant
BOLIVARIAN REPUBLIC OF VENEZUELA
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellee
CITGO PETROLEUM CORP
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellee
PDV HOLDING INC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellee
PETROLEOS DE VENEZUELA SA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
CRYSTALLEX INTERNATIONAL CORP
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jan 18 2022
PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: SHWARTZ, PORTER and FISHER, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 29. Judge: PORTER Authoring. [21-1276, 21-1277, 21-1289] |
Docket last updated: 07/09/2023 11:05 AM EDT |
Wednesday, February 17, 2021 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Bolivarian Republic of Venezuela in District Court No. 1-17-mc-00151. (AMR) | ||
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice of Appeal | ||
Att: 2 40 pgs District Court Opinion | ||
Att: 3 2 pgs District Court Order | ||
Att: 4 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Standing Order Excess Pagination | ||
Att: 6 3 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
2 pgs CLERK ORDER consolidating the Appeals at Nos. 21-1276 21-1277 and 21-1289 for scheduling, joint appendix, Appellee’s brief, and Disposition. 21-1276 21-1277 21-1289 (AMR) |