New Jersey District Court
Judge:Madeline Cox Arleo
Referred: Jose R Almonte
Case #: 2:21-cv-02854
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 17, 2021 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
THERMO FISHER SCIENTIFIC, INC.
81 Wyman Street
WALTHAM, MA 02451
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER R. CARTON
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Defendant
FISHER SCIENTIFIC COMPANY L.L.C.
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER R. CARTON
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Defendant
LIFE TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER R. CARTON
Bowman And Brooke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GENE TOX WORLDWIDE LLC
Represented By
JOHN W. LEARDI
Buttaci Leardi & Werner LLC
contact info
FRANK XAVIER WUKOVITS
Buttaci Leardi & Werner LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
142 142 order Text Order Thu 05/01 6:39 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' letters dated April 25, 2025 at ECF Nos.140 -141 ,89 - 90 , respectively. No later than May 9, 2025, the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer to comprehensively discuss the issues raised within the parties' letters. Should the issues not resolve, no later than May 16, 2025, the parties shall submit one joint discovery dispute letter in accordance with the format specified within the Court's[LINK:Case Management Order] . In light of the outstanding disputes, expert discovery deadlines shall be extended as follows: Affirmative reports shall be due by May 21, 2025; Responding reports by June 20, 2025; and expert discovery shall close on July 21, 2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jose R. Almonte on 4/28/2025. (akw, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
141 141 misc Letter Fri 04/25 4:36 PM
Letter from Nicole P. Allocca re140 Letter. (ALLOCCA, NICOLE)
Related: [-]
140 140 misc Letter Fri 04/25 1:55 PM
Letter from John W. Meyer, Esq.. (MEYER, JOHN)
Related: [-]