Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:21-cv-00511
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 17, 2021 5:00 AM EDT
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
DuPont de Nemours Inc
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Represented By
Martha N Donovan
Norris Mclaughlin PA
contact info
Margaret Raymond-Flood
Norris Mclaughlin PA
contact info
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Martha N Donovan
Norris Mclaughlin PA
contact info
Margaret Raymond-Flood
Norris Mclaughlin PA
contact info
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Represented By
Delia G Frazier
Dla Piper Llp Us - Atlanta
contact info
John R Wellschlager
Dla Piper Llp Us Md
contact info
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Defendant
AGC Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
3M Company, The
Plaintiff
City of Tempe
Represented By
Cristina Sanchez
Baron & Budd Pc - Dallas Tx
contact info
Scott Summy
Baron & Budd PC
contact info
Joseph C Tann
Law Office Of Joseph C Tann PLLC
contact info
Grant Woods
Gallagher And Kennedy
contact info
Darren D Sumich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
David A Parsiola
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Philip F Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Andrew J Cvitanovic
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Christina Cossich
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Brandon J Taylor
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info
Cary L McDougal
Baron And Budd PC
contact info
Carla Burke Pickrel
Baron & Budd, P.C.
contact info
Luana N Smith
Cossich Sumich Parsiola And Taylor LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/16 12:19 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice between Plaintiffs and Tyco, Chemguard, ChemDesign, and Released Parties by Tyco Fire Products LP.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Case List
Thursday, May 15, 2025
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/15 6:03 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by BASF Corp.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 07/09 7:39 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by 3M Company, The.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Bulger, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, April 07, 2021
4 4 misc Status Report Wed 04/07 4:53 PM
STATUS REPORT - Defendant BASF Corporation's General Denial and Preliminary Statement of Affirmative Defenses by BASF Corporation, BASF Corporation, BASF Corp. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Holian, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 18, 2021
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 02/18 4:34 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), City of Tempe v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-511-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Arizona (Phoenix Division) (sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 02/18 4:31 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/18 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-9657284.), filed by City of Tempe. Service due by 5/19/2021(sshe, )
Related: [-]